CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. ALL PLUMBING, INC. SERVICE, PARTS, INSTALLATION et al

Defendant: KABIR SHAFIK, FDS RESTAURANT, INC. and ALL PLUMBING, INC. SERVICE, PARTS, INSTALLATION
Plaintiff: CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00851
Filed: May 21, 2012
 
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/22/13. (lcckk2)
October 18, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/18/2013.(lcckk3)
August 18, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 18, 2014. (lcckk1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. ALL PLUMBING, INC. SERVICE, PARTS, INSTALLATION et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KABIR SHAFIK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDS RESTAURANT, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL PLUMBING, INC. SERVICE, PARTS, INSTALLATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Thomas Simpson Garrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]