OBAMA FOR AMERICA v. DEMSTORE.COM et al Featured Case

Counter_defendant: OBAMA FOR AMERICA
Plaintiff: OBAMA FOR AMERICA
Defendant: DEMSTORE.COM and WASHINGTON PROMOTIONS & PRINTING, INC.
Counter_claimant: WASHINGTON PROMOTIONS & PRINTING, INC.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00889
Filed: June 1, 2012
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Emmet G. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2012 19 Featured Case STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/25/12. (clv, )
July 23, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to supplement due by 7/18/2012. Responses due by 7/25/2012 Replies due by 7/27/2012. (clv, )
July 18, 2012 18 Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal by OBAMA FOR AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Order of Dismissal)(Reingold, Barry). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 7/19/2012 (jf, ).
July 15, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 17 the parties' consent motion to reset briefing schedule. Plaintiff's motion to supplement its briefing regarding ownership of the 2012 Rising Sun Logo shall be due by no later than July 18, 2012; Defendants' response shall be due by no later than July 25, 2012; and Plaintiff's reply shall be due by no later than July 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 15, 2012. (lcegs6)
July 14, 2012 17 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule Reset by OBAMA FOR AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Elisabeth)
July 11, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 16 the parties' consent motion to waive preliminary injunction bond. Based upon the consent of the parties, and in the Court's discretion, the Court will hereby WAIVE the bond requirement. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 11, 2012. (lcegs6)
July 11, 2012 16 Consent MOTION for Bond Waiver by OBAMA FOR AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Elisabeth)
July 10, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's motion to supplement its briefing due by 7/16/2012; defendant's response due by 7/23/2012; Plaintiff's reply due by 7/27/2012; supplemental briefs regarding the amount of security to be posted is due by 12:00 p.m. on 7/11/2012. (clv, )
July 9, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction with respect to the 2008 Rising Sun Trademark. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to supplement its briefing regarding the ownership of the 2012 Rising Sun Logo shall be due by no later than July 16, 2012; Defendants' response shall be due by no later than July 23, 2012; and Plaintiff's reply shall be due by no later than July 27, 2012. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are directed to file, by no later than 12:00 p.m. on July 11, 2012, supplemental briefs of no more than five (5) pages regarding the amount of security to be posted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c). It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Oral Motion to Stay the injunction pending appeal is DENIED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 9, 2012. (lcegs6)
July 9, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction hearing held on 7/9/2012. Defendant oral motion to stay pending appeal denied. Order to be Presented. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (clv, )
June 28, 2012 14 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OBAMA FOR AMERICA by WASHINGTON PROMOTIONS & PRINTING, INC..(Culver, Michael)
June 25, 2012 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by OBAMA FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental of Jeremy Buxbaum, # 2 Exhibit 1 of Supplemental Declaration of Jeremy Buxbaum, # 3 Exhibit 2 of Supplemental Declaration of Jeremy Buxbaum, # 4 Declaration Supplemental of Meaghan Burdick, # 5 Declaration of Ann Marie Habershaw)(Reingold, Barry)
June 18, 2012 12 Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WASHINGTON PROMOTIONS & PRINTING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Steve Schwat, # 2 Exhibit 1 trademark registrations, # 3 Exhibit 2 webpage, # 4 Exhibit 3 webpage, # 5 Exhibit 4 June 12 2007 letter, # 6 Exhibit 5 Illinois Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 6 webpages, # 8 Exhibit 7 sales records, # 9 Exhibit 8 emails, # 10 Exhibit 9 webpages, # 11 Declaration David Rothschild, # 12 Exhibit emails, # 13 Declaration Michael Culver, # 14 Exhibit 1 webpages, # 15 Exhibit 2 webpages, # 16 Exhibit 3 webpages, # 17 Exhibit 4 webpages, # 18 Exhibit 5 Office Action, # 19 Exhibit 6 Office Action, # 20 Exhibit 7 Application 85322309, # 21 Exhibit 8 Office Action, # 22 Exhibit 9 Office Action)(Cohen, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 11 defendants' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Michael Culver is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 13, 2012. (lcegs6)
June 13, 2012 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Culver, :Firm- Millen White Zelano & Branigan PC, :Address- 2200 Clarendon Blvd., Suite 1400, Arlington, VA 22201. Phone No. - 703-243-6333. Fax No. - 703-243-6410 by WASHINGTON PROMOTIONS & PRINTING, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Culver, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2012 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Ronald Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (Cohen, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant response due by 6/18/2012; Plaintiff reply due by 6/25/2012. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/9/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (clv, )
June 12, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 6/12/2012. Order to be Presented. (Court Reporter CATALINA KERR.) (clv, )
June 12, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' agreement during the telephonic status conference held with all counsel on June 12, 2012, the parties are hereby directed to comply with the following briefing schedule on 9 plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction: defendants' opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction shall be filed by no later than June 18, 2012. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed by no later than June 25, 2012. A hearing on the motion will be held on July 9, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. The parties are further directed to deliver to the chambers of the Honorable Emmet G. Sullivan two copies of their pleadings and exhibits as well as binders containing one copy of the principal points and authorities relied upon by the parties (i.e., counsel should provide copies of principal cases, statutes, regulations, etc., but need not provide copies of cases relied upon merely for the standard of review or other well-established principles). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 12, 2012. (lcegs6)
June 11, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Due to unforeseen circumstances involving the conclusion of a two-week jury trial before the Court, the telephone conference previously scheduled for June 11, 2012 is hereby rescheduled for June 12, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. The Court regrets any inconvenience to the parties. The parties are directed to be prepared to discuss (1) a briefing schedule on 9 plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, (2) whether the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction should be consolidated with a trial on the merits pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a)(2), and (3) the chances of settlement. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 11, 2012. (lcegs6)
June 7, 2012 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by OBAMA FOR AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Jeremy Buxbaum, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Buxbaum, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Buxbaum, # 5 Declaration Meaghan Burdick, # 6 Text of Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Reingold, Barry)
June 5, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Elisabeth C. Frost is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 5, 2012. (lcegs6)
June 5, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jeremy L. Buxbaum is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 5, 2012. (lcegs6)
June 5, 2012 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. William C. Rava is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 5, 2012. (lcegs6)
June 5, 2012 8 Electronic Summons (2)Issued as to DEMSTORE.COM, WASHINGTON PROMOTIONS & PRINTING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Consent Notice)(ls, )
June 4, 2012 7 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Summonses by OBAMA FOR AMERICA re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Summons for Demstore.com, # 2 Corrected Summons for Washington Promotions & Printing)(Reingold, Barry)
June 4, 2012 6 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Complaint by OBAMA FOR AMERICA re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Reingold, Barry)
June 1, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (ls, )
June 1, 2012 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elisabeth C. Frost, :Firm- Perkins Coie LLP, :Address- 700 13th Street, N.W., Suite 600, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202/654-6256. Fax No. - 202/654-6211 by OBAMA FOR AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elisabeth C. Frost in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reingold, Barry)
June 1, 2012 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeremy L. Buxbaum, :Firm- Perkins Coie LLP, :Address- 131 S. Dearborn Street, Suite 1700, Chicago, IL 60603. Phone No. - 312/324-8646. Fax No. - 312/324-9400 by OBAMA FOR AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeremy L. Buxbaum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reingold, Barry)
June 1, 2012 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William C. Rava, :Firm- Perkins Coie LLP, :Address- 1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900, Seattle, WA 98101. Phone No. - 206/359-6338. Fax No. - 206/359-9000 by OBAMA FOR AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William C. Rava in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reingold, Barry)
June 1, 2012 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OBAMA FOR AMERICA. (Reingold, Barry)
June 1, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against DEMSTORE.COM, WASHINGTON PROMOTIONS & PRINTING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-2955966) filed by OBAMA FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons Demstore.com, # 5 Summons Washington Promotions)(Reingold, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OBAMA FOR AMERICA v. DEMSTORE.COM et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: OBAMA FOR AMERICA
Represented By: Jeremy L. Buxbaum
Represented By: Elisabeth C. Frost
Represented By: William C. Rava
Represented By: Barry J. Reingold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OBAMA FOR AMERICA
Represented By: Barry J. Reingold
Represented By: William C. Rava
Represented By: Elisabeth C. Frost
Represented By: Jeremy L. Buxbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEMSTORE.COM
Represented By: Jeffrey Ronald Cohen
Represented By: Michael Steven Culver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON PROMOTIONS & PRINTING, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Ronald Cohen
Represented By: Michael Steven Culver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: WASHINGTON PROMOTIONS & PRINTING, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Ronald Cohen
Represented By: Michael Steven Culver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]