KLAYMAN v. OBAMA et al Featured Case

Defendant: NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, ROGER VINSON, LOWELL C. MCADAMS, KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC HOLDER, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff: LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE and MARY ANN STRANGE
Case Number: 1:2013cv00851
Filed: June 6, 2013
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Leon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2014 128 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis,, ;USCA Case Number 14-5207. (jf, )
October 20, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 126 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to file an affidavit accompanying the motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis, for which there is a form available on the D.C. Circuit Court of Appeals' web site, in which Plaintiff must affirm the inability to prepay the docket fees for the appeal because of Plaintiff's poverty. Once such affidavit is filed, the Court shall reconsider the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/20/2014. (lcrjl1)
October 20, 2014 127 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to (29 in 1:14-cv-00092-RJL) Notice of Appeal, filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON ; USCA Case Number 14-5207. ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that these cases be held in abeyance pending the district court's resolution of appellant's motions for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. (kb)
September 8, 2014 126 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (jf, )
August 28, 2014 USCA Case Number 14-5209 for 124 Notice of Appeal, filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. (kb)
August 25, 2014 125 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 124 Notice of Appeal,. (jf, )
August 22, 2014 124 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to ( in 1:13-cv-00851-RJL, 14 in 1:14-cv-00092-RJL, 78 in 1:13-cv-00881-RJL) Leave to File Denied, (105 in 1:13-cv-00851-RJL, 8 in 1:14-cv-00092-RJL, MINUTE ORDER in 1:13-cv-00881-RJL) Leave to File Denied by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (jf, ) Modified on 8/25/2014 (jf, ). Modified on 8/25/2014 (jf, ).
August 22, 2014 123 RESPONSE re 122 MOTION to Intervene by Applicant Frederick Banks filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney)
August 8, 2014 122 MOTION to Intervene by FREDERICK BANKS (jf, )
July 30, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 66 Government Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Against the Government Defendants Pending Appeal of Preliminary Injunction. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that all proceedings against the Government Defendants in the above-captioned action are hereby STAYED pending the Government Defendants' appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit from this Court's December 16, 2013, preliminary injunction in Case No. 13-cv-851. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/30/2014. (lcrjl1, )
July 30, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Government Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints in Light of Memorandum Opinion Issued Today 51 is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Status Conference 63 is DENIED as moot. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement the Record Concerning Recent Anonymous NSA Public Disclosures Over Metadata Collection 79 is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion For Entry of Default and to Strike Government Defendants' Answer To Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint 85 is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Motion to Join and/or Motion to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON 93 is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that MOTION to Join and for Leave by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN 95 is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants' Compliance With FRCP Rule 26 103 is DENIED. And it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Compel Defendants' Compliance With FRCP Rule 26 104 is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/30/2014. (lcrjl1, )
July 29, 2014 121 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Non-party John Stritzinger's Motion for Pro Hace Vice, Motion for Electronic Filing, and Motion to Modify Judgment or Motion for Teleconference Hearing Prior to Appeal This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. (td, )
July 2, 2014 120 NOTICE of New Case Authority by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Riley v. California (case law))(Klayman, Larry)
May 21, 2014 119 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Motion to Reconsider Admission, Motion to Compel, and Quash This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. "Leave to file denied" Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/20/2014. (jf, )
May 19, 2014 118 REPLY to opposition to motion re 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Klayman, Larry)
May 9, 2014 117 Memorandum in opposition to re 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Government Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Shea Declaration), # 2 Exhibit (March 20, 2014, FISC Order), # 3 Exhibit (Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
May 8, 2014 116 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Movant John Stritzinger's motion to reconsider admission, motion to compel and quash This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/8/14. (td, )
May 5, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 5/9/2014. (tb, )
May 1, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 106 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remove Stay on Preliminary Injunction Order of December 16, 2013. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/1/2014. (lcrjl1, )
May 1, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 115 Government Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Government Defendants shall have until 5/9/2014 to file their response to 108 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/1/2014. (lcrjl1, )
May 1, 2014 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
April 30, 2014 114 REPLY to opposition to motion re 106 MOTION To Remove Stay On Preliminary Injunction Order Of December 16, 2013 re 48 Memorandum & Opinion, 49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Klayman, Larry)
April 28, 2014 113 Memorandum in opposition to re 106 MOTION To Remove Stay On Preliminary Injunction Order Of December 16, 2013 re 48 Memorandum & Opinion, 49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney)
April 28, 2014 112 NOTICE Praecipe by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Motion To Strike and for Sanctions, # 2 Exhibit 2 -- Opposition to Motion to Strike and for Sanctions, # 3 Exhibit 3 -- Reply in Support of Motion to Strike and for Sanctions)(Klayman, Larry)
April 28, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 52 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 55 Motion to Dismiss. In light of the parties' 75 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), in which the parties jointly stipulated to the voluntary dismissal without prejudice of any and all claims by Plaintiffs against Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Lowell C. McAdam, it is hereby ORDERED that 55 Verizon Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT; and it is further ORDERED that 52 Government Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Claims Against the Verizon Defendants, or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment, is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/28/2014. (lcrjl1, )
April 24, 2014 111 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED by David Andrew Christenson - Summary Judgment. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. "Leave to filed DENIED" Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 04/24/2014. (jf, ) Modified on 4/24/2014 (jf, ).
April 18, 2014 110 Memorandum in opposition to re 103 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance With FRCP Rule 26 filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CMO, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney)
April 16, 2014 109 REPLY to opposition to re (95 in 1:13-cv-00851-RJL, 69 in 1:13-cv-00881-RJL) MOTION for Joinder filed by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN. "Leave to file Granted" signed by Judge Richard J. Leon (jf, )
April 15, 2014 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Not in Dispute, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
April 11, 2014 107 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit 1 by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE re 106 MOTION To Remove Stay On Preliminary Injunction Order Of December 16, 2013 re 48 Memorandum & Opinion, 49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Klayman, Larry)
April 11, 2014 106 MOTION To Remove Stay On Preliminary Injunction Order Of December 16, 2013 re 48 Memorandum & Opinion, 49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
April 8, 2014 105 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON, Motion for Emergency Stay This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file Denied". Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (zrdj)
April 7, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 102 Plaintiffs' Motion for Telephonic Status Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/7/2014. (lcrjl1, )
April 1, 2014 104 Amended MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance With FRCP Rule 26 by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Email from Obama Justice Department, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
April 1, 2014 103 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Compliance With FRCP Rule 26 by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
March 26, 2014 102 MOTION for Telephonic Status Conference by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Associated Press article about Jimmy Carter, # 2 Exhibit 2 -- Transcript of President Obama's Remarks from March 25, 2014, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
March 24, 2014 101 Memorandum in opposition to re 93 MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Intervene Filed by David Andrew Christenson filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dearinger, Bryan)
March 24, 2014 100 Memorandum in opposition to re 95 MOTION for Joinder (Motion to Intervene) filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dearinger, Bryan)
March 20, 2014 99 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 85 MOTION For Entry Of Default And To Strike Government Defendants Answer To Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint re 83 Answer to Amended Complaint, filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Return Receipt for the Honorable Roger VInson)(Klayman, Larry)
March 19, 2014 98 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Motion for pro hac vice, electronic filing and modify judgment This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. "Leave to file Denied" Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/19/2014. (jf, )
March 14, 2014 97 REPLY to opposition to motion re 85 MOTION For Entry Of Default And To Strike Government Defendants Answer To Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint re 83 Answer to Amended Complaint, filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Klayman, Larry)
March 10, 2014 96 Memorandum in opposition to re 85 MOTION For Entry Of Default And To Strike Government Defendants Answer To Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint re 83 Answer to Amended Complaint, (Government Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Answer) filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dearinger, Bryan)
March 7, 2014 94 NOTICE Regarding Order of the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Dearinger, Bryan)
March 6, 2014 95 MOTION to Join and for Leave by TIMOTHY DEMITRI BROWN (jf, )
March 5, 2014 92 REPLY to opposition to motion re 85 MOTION For Entry Of Default And To Strike Government Defendants Answer To Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint re 83 Answer to Amended Complaint, filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Klayman, Larry)
March 5, 2014 91 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- John Stewart Stritzinger, Motion to Seal This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file Denied". Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/5/2014. (zrdj)
March 5, 2014 90 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- John Stewart Stritzinger, Motion For Pro Hac Vice, Motion For Electronic Filing, and Motion to Modify Judgment or Motion for Teleconference Hearing Prior to Appeal This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file Denied". Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/5/2014. (zrdj, )
March 4, 2014 89 REPLY to opposition to motion re 79 MOTION to Supplement the Record filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Klayman, Larry)
February 28, 2014 88 Memorandum in opposition to re 85 MOTION For Entry Of Default And To Strike Government Defendants Answer To Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint re 83 Answer to Amended Complaint, filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROGER VINSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of proceedings)(Whitman, James)
February 27, 2014 87 Memorandum in opposition to re 79 MOTION to Supplement the Record filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dearinger, Bryan)
February 26, 2014 93 MOTION to Join, MOTION to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (jf, ).
February 25, 2014 86 NOTICE Praecipe by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Reply filed by the Government Defendants)(Klayman, Larry)
February 20, 2014 85 MOTION For Entry Of Default And To Strike Government Defendants Answer To Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint re 83 Answer to Amended Complaint, by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Affidavit Demonstrating Proper Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
February 20, 2014 84 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on 2/3/14; Date of Issuance:2/20/14. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 3/13/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2014.(Gels, Patty)
February 14, 2014 83 ANSWER to 77 Amended Complaint, (Government Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint) by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 77 Amended Complaint, filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, MARY ANN STRANGE, CHARLES STRANGE.(Gilligan, James)
February 10, 2014 82 REPLY to opposition to motion re 68 MOTION to Dismiss (The Government Defendants' Partial Motion To Dismiss and Memorandum in Support) filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gilligan, James)
February 10, 2014 81 NOTICE of Filing of Proposed Order by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE re 79 MOTION to Supplement the Record (Klayman, Larry)
February 10, 2014 80 NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit 1 by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE re 79 MOTION to Supplement the Record (Klayman, Larry)
February 10, 2014 79 MOTION to Supplement the Record by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Klayman, Larry)
February 10, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/14/2014. (tb, )
February 10, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Government Defendants' Answer to the Amended Complaint in (Klayman I) is due by 2/14/2014. (jth)
February 10, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 78 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File the Government Defendants' Answer in Klayman I. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Government defendants' answer is due 2/14/2014. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/10/2014. (lcrjl1, )
February 10, 2014 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 77 Amended Complaint, by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
February 10, 2014 77 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third Amended Complaint) against KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ROGER VINSON with Jury Demand filed by MARY ANN STRANGE, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE.(Klayman, Larry)
February 7, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER striking 76 Third Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint be stricken from the record. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall re-file their amended complaint consistent with the Court's instructions at the February 3, 2014 status conference. Plaintiffs previously withdrew certain legal claims in their 74 Opposition to Government Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss, and based on that representation this Court denied as moot 68 Government Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss (with respect to 13-cv-851 only). Accordingly, amendments to plaintiffs' complaint shall not include the addition of new defendants, new facts, or new legal claims. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/7/2014. (lcrjl1, )
February 5, 2014 76 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 2/7/2014.....AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third Amended Complaint) against KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, LOWELL C. MCADAMS, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ROGER VINSON with Jury Demand filed by MARY ANN STRANGE, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE.(Klayman, Larry) Modified on 2/10/2014 (znmw, ).
February 3, 2014 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 2/3/2014 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Government Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss 68 DENIED as moot with respect to 13-cv-851. Government defendants' answer in 13-cv-851 is due 2/10/2014. (Court Reporter Patty Gels) (tb) Modified on 2/10/2014 (tb).
January 31, 2014 75 STIPULATION of Dismissal by LOWELL C. MCADAMS, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS. (Boynton, Brian)
January 30, 2014 74 RESPONSE re 68 MOTION to Dismiss (The Government Defendants' Partial Motion To Dismiss and Memorandum in Support) filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Klayman, Larry)
January 28, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: At the status conference scheduled for 2/3/2014 at 2:30 PM, the Court will hear oral argument from the parties, including the Verizon Defendants, regarding whether 73 Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Verizon Defendants without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A) should be effective. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/28/2014. (lcrjl1, )
January 24, 2014 USCA Case Number 14-5016 for 67 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, MARY ANN STRANGE, CHARLES STRANGE. (jf, )
January 23, 2014 73 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Verizon Communications and Lowell C. McAdam (Klayman, Larry)
January 23, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 1/16/2014. (tb, )
January 23, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 1/30/2014. (tb, )
January 22, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/3/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (tb, )
January 21, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 46 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/21/2014. (lcrjl1, )
January 21, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 16 Government Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunctions. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/21/2014. (lcrjl1, )
January 21, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 15 Motion for Leave to Take Deposition. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/21/2014. (lcrjl1, )
January 21, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 52 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment, Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Verizon Defendants, and 55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs' responses are due by 1/30/2014, but further extensions on this motion will not be entertained. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/21/2014. (lcrjl1, )
January 21, 2014 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, 62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 52 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment, Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Verizon Defendants, and 55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc; and it is further ordered that plaintiffs' responses are due by 1/16/2014. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/21/2014. (lcrjl1, )
January 16, 2014 72 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, 52 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment, Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Verizon Defendants MOTION for Summary Judgment by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
January 15, 2014 71 NOTICE Praecipe Regarding Class Actions by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Klayman, Larry)
January 15, 2014 70 Memorandum in Opposition re 66 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Against the Government Defendants Pending Appeal of Preliminary Injunction filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Transcript of Oct. 31, 2013, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript of Nov. 18, 2013)(Klayman, Larry) Modified event title on 1/16/2014 (znmw, ).
January 13, 2014 69 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 67 Notice of Cross Appeal,. (znmw, )
January 10, 2014 68 MOTION to Dismiss (The Government Defendants' Partial Motion To Dismiss and Memorandum in Support) by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
January 10, 2014 67 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 48 Memorandum & Opinion, 49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-3588427. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Klayman, Larry)
January 10, 2014 USCA Case Number 14-5004 for 64 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, KEITH B. ALEXANDER, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR., BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (jf, )
January 8, 2014 66 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Against the Government Defendants Pending Appeal of Preliminary Injunction by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
January 6, 2014 65 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by the Government re 64 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw, )
January 3, 2014 64 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 48 Memorandum & Opinion, 49 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, KEITH B. ALEXANDER. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Berman, Marcia)
December 30, 2013 63 MOTION Status Conference by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Fox News article, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
December 24, 2013 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, 52 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment, Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Verizon Defendants MOTION for Summary Judgment by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
December 18, 2013 61 Memorandum in opposition to re 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify Class Action filed by LOWELL C. MCADAMS, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boynton, Brian)
December 17, 2013 60 MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify Class Action by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
December 17, 2013 59 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on 10/31/13; Date of Issuance:12/17/13. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 202-354-3236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 1/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2014.(Gels, Patty)
December 17, 2013 58 ERRATA Substituting Corrected Version of Exhibit D by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 52 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment, Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Verizon Defendants MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Patton, Rodney)
December 17, 2013 57 ERRATA Attaching Corrected Exhibit D by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 52 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment, Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Verizon Defendants MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Patton, Rodney)
December 16, 2013 56 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Extension of Time by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OF THE UNITED STATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) Modified on 12/17/2013 (rdj).
December 16, 2013 55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by LOWELL C. MCADAMS, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jane A. Schapker, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Randolph)
December 16, 2013 54 NOTICE of Lodging of Classified Declaration of Acting Deputy Director of the National Security Agency for In Camera and Ex Parte Review by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 52 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment, Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Verizon Defendants (Patton, Rodney)
December 16, 2013 53 NOTICE of Lodging of Classified Certification and Declaration of the Deputy Attorney General for in Camera and Ex Parte Review by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 52 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment, Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Verizon Defendants (Patton, Rodney)
December 16, 2013 52 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment, Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Verizon Defendants by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Patton, Rodney). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 12/17/2013 (znmw, ).
December 16, 2013 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints in Light of Memorandum Opinion Issued Today by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Marcia)
December 16, 2013 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Berman on behalf of KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Berman, Marcia)
December 16, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion entered this date, it is hereby ordered that 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED as to plaintiff's Larry Klayman and Charles Strange and DENIED as to plaintiff Mary Ann Strange; it is further ordered that the Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Klayman v. Obama in Civil Action 13-881 is DENIED; and it is further ordered that this Order is STAYED pending appeal. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/16/13. (tb, )
December 16, 2013 48 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/16/13. (tb, )
December 4, 2013 47 Memorandum in opposition to re 46 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
December 2, 2013 46 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
November 30, 2013 45 Memorandum in opposition to re 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify Class Action filed by LOWELL C. MCADAMS, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boynton, Brian)
November 26, 2013 44 MEMORANDUM by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Binder Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 -- Binder Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 -- Gov't Opposition in In Re Epic)(Klayman, Larry)
November 26, 2013 43 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Government Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunctions) filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gilligan, James)
November 26, 2013 42 NOTICE of Filing of Bench Briefs by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Bench Brief on Jurisdiction, # 2 Exhibit 2 -- Bench Brief on Admissibility of Snowden Statements)(Klayman, Larry)
November 26, 2013 41 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on 11/18/13; Date of Issuance:11/26/13. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patty Gels, Telephone number 2023543236, Court Reporter Email Address : Patty_Gels@dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 12/17/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2014.(Gels, Patty)
November 26, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/16/2013. (tb, )
November 25, 2013 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify Class Action by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
November 25, 2013 39 NOTICE of Filing of Transcript by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Transcript of ACLU v. Clapper Proceeding)(Klayman, Larry)
November 23, 2013 38 AFFIDAVIT of David M. Siler by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (znmw, )
November 23, 2013 37 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, LOWELL C. MCADAMS, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, ROGER VINSON filed by MARY ANN STRANGE, LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE.(znmw, )
November 23, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that the Government Defendants and the Verizon Defendants shall have up to and including 12/16/2013 to file their responses to the complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/23/2013. (lcrjl1, )
November 23, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the Supplemental Affidavit of David M. Siler is accepted for filing. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/23/2013. (lcrjl1, )
November 23, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is accepted for filing. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/23/2013. (lcrjl1, )
November 21, 2013 36 Memorandum in opposition to re 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct 4 Amended Complaint filed by LOWELL C. MCADAMS, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boynton, Brian)
November 21, 2013 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
November 18, 2013 Minute Entry: Preliminary Injunction Heaing held on 11/18/2013 before Judge Richard J. Leon: Motion heard and taken under advisement. Supplemental briefs are due by COB on 11/26/2013. Defendant's response to plaintiffs' 33 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint due by 11/22/2013. (Court Reporter Patty Gels) (tb, )
November 17, 2013 34 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Affidavit of David Siler, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
November 17, 2013 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct 4 Amended Complaint by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
November 15, 2013 32 NOTICE of Filing of Amended Proposed Order by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Klayman, Larry)
November 15, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, 29 Government Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to Plaintiffs' Two Motions for Preliminary Injunctions. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/15/2013. (lcrjl1, )
November 14, 2013 31 REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Senator Grassley, # 2 Exhibit 2 -- Supplemental Affidavit of Larry Klayman, # 3 Exhibit 3 -- NSA Touhy Request, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
November 13, 2013 30 Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify Class Action filed by LOWELL C. MCADAMS, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boynton, Brian)
November 13, 2013 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Two Preliminary Injunction Motions by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney)
November 12, 2013 28 Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Edward Felton by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE. (jf, )
November 12, 2013 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify Class Action by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
November 12, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief with Extended Pages and a Supplemental Declaration. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the page limit for Plaintiffs' reply is enlarged from 25 to 50 pages; and it is further ordered that the Supplemental Declaration of Professor Edward W. Felten is accepted for filing. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/12/2013. (lcrjl1, )
November 12, 2013 26 Unopposed MOTION For Leave To File Reply Brief With Extended Pages And A Supplemental Declaration by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Supplemental Declaration of Professor Edward Felton, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
November 12, 2013 25 Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Declaration of James J. Gilligan), # 2 Exhibit (Exhibit A), # 3 Exhibit (Exhibit B), # 4 Exhibit (Exhibit C), # 5 Exhibit (Exhibit D), # 6 Exhibit (Exhibit E), # 7 Exhibit (Exhibit F), # 8 Exhibit (Exhibit G), # 9 Exhibit (Exhibit H), # 10 Exhibit (Exhibit I), # 11 Exhibit (Exhibit J), # 12 Exhibit (Exhibit K), # 13 Exhibit (Exhibit L), # 14 Exhibit (Exhibit M), # 15 Exhibit (Exhibit N), # 16 Exhibit (Exhibit O), # 17 Exhibit (Exhibit P), # 18 Exhibit (Exhibit Q), # 19 Exhibit (Exhibit R), # 20 Exhibit (Exhibit S), # 21 Exhibit (Exhibit T), # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
November 8, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the page limit for Government Defendants' combined opposition is enlarged from 45 to 65 pages. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/8/2013. (lcrjl1, )
November 8, 2013 24 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In The Combined Opposition to Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Motions by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney)
November 6, 2013 23 Supplemental Declaration re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LARRY E. KLAYMAN. (znmw, )
November 6, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 22 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED and the Declaration of Professor Edward W. Felten is accepted for filing. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/6/2013. (lcrjl1, )
November 3, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 10 Government Defendants' Motion for Stay of Deadline to Respond to Complaint in Light of Lapse in Appropriations. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/3/2013. (lcrjl1, )
November 1, 2013 22 MOTION For Leave to File Supplemental Declaration re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Declaration of Professor Edward Felten, # 2 Exhibit 2 -- Washington Post Article, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
October 31, 2013 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 10/31/2013 before Judge Richard J. Leon: Plaintiff counsel not present. Transcript of the hearing will be sent to plaintiff counsel. Response to Preliminary Injunction Motion due by 11/11/2013. Reply due by 11/14/2013. Oral arugment set for 11/18/2013 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels) (tb, )
October 31, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of 19 Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/31/2013. (lcrjl1, )
October 31, 2013 21 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Continue, by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
October 31, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 19 Motion to Continue. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2013 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/31/2013. (lcrjl1, )
October 31, 2013 20 Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify Class Action filed by LOWELL C. MCADAMS, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boynton, Brian)
October 30, 2013 19 MOTION to Continue Status Conference Concerning Preliminary Injunction by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
October 30, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2013 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/30/2013. (lcrjl1, )
October 30, 2013 18 NOTICE of Consent by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE re 17 MOTION For Leave of Court to Appear Telephonically re Set Hearings (Klayman, Larry)
October 30, 2013 17 MOTION For Leave of Court to Appear Telephonically re Set Hearings by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
October 30, 2013 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
October 30, 2013 15 MOTION For Leave of Court To Take FRCP Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Government's Opposition to ACLU's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
October 29, 2013 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify Class Action by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
October 29, 2013 Minute Order. Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2013 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (lcrjl1, )
October 29, 2013 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 -- Affidavit of Larry Klayman, # 3 Exhibit 2 -- Affidavit of Charles Strange, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
October 21, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant LOWELL C. MCADAMS response to the amended complaint is due by 12/2/2013. (jth)
October 20, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re 4 Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and defendant LOWELL C. MCADAMS shall have up to and including 12/2/2013 to respond to plaintiffs' amended complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/20/2013. (lcrjl1, )
October 17, 2013 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LOWELL C. MCADAMS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Randolph)
October 15, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/2/2013. (tb, )
October 15, 2013 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re 4 Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and defendant Verizon Communications Inc. has up to and including 12/2/2013 to respond to plaintiffs' amended complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/15/13. (lcrjl1, )
October 14, 2013 11 Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify Class Action filed by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Randolph)
October 11, 2013 10 MOTION to Stay (Government Defendants' Motion for a Stay of Deadline to Respond to the Complaint in Light of Lapse in Appropriations) by KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
October 11, 2013 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS. (Moss, Randolph)
October 10, 2013 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Randolph)
September 30, 2013 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Certify Class Action by LARRY E. KLAYMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry)
June 12, 2013 6 Featured Case STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/12/13. (lcrjl1)
June 12, 2013 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Whitman on behalf of NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Whitman, James)
June 9, 2013 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN, CHARLES STRANGE, MARY ANN STRANGE.(Klayman, Larry) Modified filers on 6/10/2013 (znmw, ).
June 7, 2013 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET (Amended) by LARRY E. KLAYMAN re 1 Complaint, filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN.(Klayman, Larry)
June 7, 2013 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (8) Issued as to KEITH B. ALEXANDER, ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, LOWELL C. MCADAMS, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, ROGER VINSON (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Memorandum in Support, # 7 Summons, # 8 Consent Notice)(ls, )
June 6, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (ls, )
June 6, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3352655) filed by LARRY E. KLAYMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Mr. Obama, # 3 Summons Mr. Holder, # 4 Summons Mr. Alexander, # 5 Summons Mr. McAdam, # 6 Summons Mr. Vinson, # 7 Summons Verizon Communications, # 8 Summons Department of Justice, # 9 Summons National Security Agency)(Klayman, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLAYMAN v. OBAMA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
Represented By: James R. Whitman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER VINSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWELL C. MCADAMS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH B. ALEXANDER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC HOLDER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: James R. Whitman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY E. KLAYMAN
Represented By: Larry E. Klayman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES STRANGE
Represented By: Larry E. Klayman(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY ANN STRANGE
Represented By: Larry E. Klayman(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]