December 13, 2018 |
Filing 165
NOTICE of Satisfaction as to Attorneys' Fees and Costs by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Burdin, Douglas)
|
November 13, 2018 |
Filing 164
STIPULATION and ORDER as to attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/13/18. (lcrcl2)
|
November 13, 2018 |
Filing 163
STIPULATION re (158 in 1:14-cv-00670-RCL) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 28 USC 2412(d) and Incorporated Proposed Order by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Gelatt, Andrea)
|
October 5, 2018 |
Filing 162
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Motion for Attorneys' Fees by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Gelatt, Andrea)
|
August 8, 2018 |
Filing 161
STATUS REPORT Regarding Attorneys' Fees by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelatt, Andrea)
|
May 16, 2018 |
Filing 160
ORDER granting (159) Motion to Stay in case 1:14-cv-00670-RCL. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/10/18. (lsj)
|
April 27, 2018 |
Filing 159
Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #158 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 28 USC 2412(d) by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burdin, Douglas)
|
April 27, 2018 |
Filing 158
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 28 USC 2412(d) by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Bolt in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burdin, Douglas)
|
March 30, 2018 |
Filing 157
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/29/18. (lsj)
|
March 30, 2018 |
Filing 156
ORDER denying #154 Motion for Leave to File to Submit a Surreply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/29/18. (lsj)
|
March 28, 2018 |
Filing 155
Memorandum in opposition to re #154 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Harris, Michael)
|
March 27, 2018 |
Filing 154
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Surreply, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Robert)
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing 153
REPLY re #148 Supplemental Memorandum, #146 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS, ZIMBABWE CONSERVATION TASK FORCE. (Best, Jennifer)
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing 152
REPLY re #146 to Supplemental Brief on Tanzania Claims filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas) Modified to add link on 3/19/2018 (znmw).
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing 151
REPLY re #146 to Supplemental Brief on Zimbabwe Claims filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas) Modified to add link on 3/19/2018 (znmw).
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing 150
REPLY re #146 Supplemental Memorandum, Submitted by Federal Defendants filed by AFRICA NETWORK FOR ANIMAL WELFARE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC., HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES. (Sanerib, Tanya)
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing 149
REPLY re #146 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Gelatt, Andrea)
|
March 2, 2018 |
Filing 148
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #139 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, #141 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, ECF 139 Regarding Zimbabwe Elephant Claims filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
March 2, 2018 |
Filing 147
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #139 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, #141 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, ECF 139 Regarding Tanzania Elephant Claims filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
March 2, 2018 |
Filing 146
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #139 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, #141 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, ECF 139 filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greg Sheehan, #2 Exhibit A to Sheehan Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Robert)
|
March 2, 2018 |
Filing 145
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #139 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, #141 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, ECF 139 filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS, ZIMBABWE CONSERVATION TASK FORCE. (Harris, Michael)
|
March 2, 2018 |
Filing 144
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #141 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, ECF 139 filed by AFRICA NETWORK FOR ANIMAL WELFARE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC., HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES. (Frostic, Anna)
|
February 27, 2018 |
Filing 142
ORDER granting (141) Motion to Modify. Opening Brief due by 3/2/2018; Reply Brief due by 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/26/18. (lsj)
|
February 22, 2018 |
Filing 141
Unopposed MOTION to Modify Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing, ECF 139 by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelatt, Andrea)
|
January 10, 2018 |
Filing 140
RESPONSE re #138 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (See Docket Entry #139 to view document). (znmw)
|
January 10, 2018 |
Filing 139
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Robert)
|
January 2, 2018 |
Filing 138
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D.C. Circuit Opinion)(Burdin, Douglas)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing 137
JOINT APPENDIX Volume V by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing 136
JOINT APPENDIX Volume IV by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing 135
JOINT APPENDIX Volume III by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing 134
JOINT APPENDIX Volume II by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing 133
JOINT APPENDIX Volume I by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
July 21, 2017 |
Filing 132
REPLY to opposition to motion re #126 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Williams, Robert)
|
July 21, 2017 |
Filing 131
REPLY to opposition to motion re #125 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Intervenor-Defendants filed by AFRICA NETWORK FOR ANIMAL WELFARE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC., HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES. (Sanerib, Tanya)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing 130
REPLY to opposition to motion re #126 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , #119 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tanzania Claims, #125 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing 129
Memorandum in opposition to re #126 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , #125 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
May 30, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of proposed intervenors' motion for reconsideration #124 and no objection by any parties, the motion is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Africa Network for Animal Welfare and the Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. are permitted to intervene in this matter as intervenor-defendants. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/30/17. (DMK)
|
May 22, 2017 |
Filing 128
Memorandum in opposition to re #119 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tanzania Claims filed by HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frostic, Anna)
|
May 22, 2017 |
Filing 127
Memorandum in opposition to re #119 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tanzania Claims filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Robert)
|
May 22, 2017 |
Filing 126
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Robert)
|
May 22, 2017 |
Filing 125
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frostic, Anna)
|
May 9, 2017 |
Filing 124
MOTION for Reconsideration re #121 Order on Motion to Intervene, Partial and, MOTION to Expedite by AFRICA NETWORK FOR ANIMAL WELFARE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanerib, Tanya)
|
May 2, 2017 |
Filing 123
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES (ONLY). (znmw)
|
May 2, 2017 |
Filing 122
ANSWER to #82 Third Amended Complaint by HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES (ONLY). Related document: #82 Third Amended Complaint filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL.(znmw)
|
May 2, 2017 |
Filing 121
ORDER granting in part and denying in part #114 Motion to Intervene. The motion to intervene [Dkt. # 114] is GRANTED is as to The Humane Society of the United States and Humane Society International and DENIED as to the Africa Network for Animal Welfare and the Center for Biological Diversity. The Court notes that it expects the intervenors to meet the current briefing schedule set in the case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/2/17. (DMK)
|
April 10, 2017 |
Filing 120
REPLY to opposition to motion re #114 MOTION to Intervene filed by AFRICA NETWORK FOR ANIMAL WELFARE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC., HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES. (Frostic, Anna)
|
April 7, 2017 |
Filing 119
MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tanzania Claims by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Johnson Declaration), #2 Exhibit 2 (Sakuta Declaration), #3 Exhibit 3 (Tarpley Declaration), #4 Exhibit 4 (Petty Declaration), #5 Exhibit 5 (Rhyne Declaration), #6 Exhibit 6 (Hurt Declaration), #7 Exhibit 7 (Angelides Declaration), #8 Exhibit 8 (Goodenow Declaration), #9 Exhibit 9 (Cox Declaration), #10 Statement of Facts, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Burdin, Douglas)
|
April 3, 2017 |
Filing 118
Memorandum in opposition to re #114 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
March 22, 2017 |
Filing 117
RESPONSE re #114 MOTION to Intervene filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Gelatt, Andrea)
|
March 22, 2017 |
Filing 116
NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Sanerib on behalf of AFRICA NETWORK FOR ANIMAL WELFARE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC., HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES (Sanerib, Tanya)
|
March 22, 2017 |
Filing 115
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Uhlemann on behalf of AFRICA NETWORK FOR ANIMAL WELFARE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC., HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES (Uhlemann, Sarah)
|
March 20, 2017 |
Filing 114
MOTION to Intervene by The Humane Society of the United States, Africa Network for Animal Welfare, HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Answer, #3 Declaration of Iris Ho, #4 Declaration of Josphat Ngonyo, #5 Declaration of Brendan Cummings, #6 Declaration of Brett Hartl, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Corporate Disclosure)(Frostic, Anna)
|
March 8, 2017 |
Filing 113
Amended ANSWER to Complaint re #81 Third Amended Complaint (Third Amended Complaint, ECF 82) by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Gelatt, Andrea) Modified to add link on 3/9/2017 (znmw).
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing 112
ORDER granting #109 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/22/2017. (lcrcl2)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing 111
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Pendleton Williams on behalf of All Defendants (Williams, Robert)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing 110
ORDER granting #108 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/21/2017. (lcrcl2)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing 109
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #106 Bill of Costs by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burdin, Douglas)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/7/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/22/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/19/2017. Replies due by 7/21/2017. Joint Appendix due by 8/4/2017. (zlsj)
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing 108
Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burdin, Douglas)
|
February 15, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #107 Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleading to Third Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that federal defendants shall file their amended pleading to plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by March 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/15/17. (DMK)
|
February 14, 2017 |
Filing 107
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Response by DANIEL M. ASHE, S. M. R. JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelatt, Andrea)
|
February 10, 2017 |
Filing 106
BILL OF COSTS by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
February 1, 2017 |
Filing 105
MANDATE of USCA as to #69 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. USCA Case Number 15-5170. (Attachments: #1 judgment filed December 6, 2016)(zrdj)
|
December 30, 2016 |
Filing 104
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. Attorney Jeremy Evan Clare terminated. (Clare, Jeremy)
|
December 1, 2016 |
USCA Case Number 16-5362 for #102 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (zrdj)
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing 103
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #102 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (znmw)
|
November 29, 2016 |
Filing 102
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #100 Memorandum & Opinion, #101 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,, by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4759416. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing 101
ORDER granting in part and denying in part (87) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 14-0670-RCL; granting in part and denying in part (32) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 15-1026-RCL; granting in part and denying in part (90) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 14-00670-RCL; granting in part and denying in part (34) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 15-01026-RCL. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/2016. (tg)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing 100
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/2016. (tg)
|
June 20, 2016 |
Filing 99
SEALED Exhibit AR Document filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
|
June 20, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER granting (98) Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal in case 1:14-cv-00670-RCL; granting (42) Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal in case 1:15-cv-01026-RCL. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter on the docket under seal [98-1], attachment 1 to the motion in case 1:14-cv-00670-RCL, and [42-1], attachment 1 to the motion in case 1:15-cv-01026-RCL. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/20/16. (DMK)
|
June 17, 2016 |
Filing 98
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AR Document, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Seidman, Anna)
|
June 17, 2016 |
Filing 97
JOINT APPENDIX by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Vol. I - April 2014 AR, #2 Appendix Vol. II - April 2014 AR, #3 Appendix Vol. I - March 2015 AR, #4 Appendix Vol. II - March 2015 AR, #5 Appendix Vol. III - March 2015 AR, #6 Appendix Vol. IV - March 2015 AR, #7 Appendix Vol. V. - March 2015 AR, #8 Appendix Vol. VI - March 2015 AR, #9 Appendix Vol. VII - March 2015 AR, #10 Appendix Vol. VIII - March 2015 AR, #11 Appendix Vol. IX - March 2015 AR, #12 Appendix Vol. X - March 2015 AR, #13 Appendix Vol. XI - March 2015 AR)(Seidman, Anna)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 96
REPLY to opposition to motion re (34 in 1:15-cv-01026-RCL) Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , (90 in 1:14-cv-00670-RCL) Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrected Filing, Replaces ECF 39 and 95) filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Flax, Meredith)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing 95
REPLY to opposition to motion re (34 in 1:15-cv-01026-RCL) Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , (90 in 1:14-cv-00670-RCL) Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Flax, Meredith)
|
May 12, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: The federal defendants' summary judgment reply is due 6/03/2016 and plaintiffs' filing of the Joint Appendix is due 6/17/2016. (ad)
|
May 11, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part federal defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in case 1:14-cv-00670-RCL (94) and 1:15-cv-01026-RCL (38). It is ORDERED that federal defendants' summary judgment reply is due June 3, 2016 and plaintiffs' filing of the Joint Appendix is due June 17, 2016. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/16.(DMK)
|
May 10, 2016 |
Filing 94
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelatt, Andrea)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing 93
REPLY to opposition to motion re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing 92
Memorandum in opposition to re #90 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Federal Defendants filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
April 1, 2016 |
Filing 91
RESPONSE re #90 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Harris, Michael)
|
March 25, 2016 |
Filing 90
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Flax, Meredith)
|
March 25, 2016 |
Filing 89
Memorandum in opposition to re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flax, Meredith)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Filing 88
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 11-18-14; Page Numbers: 1-62. Date of Issuance:3-23-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa M. Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 4/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2016.(Foradori, Lisa)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing 87
MOTION for Summary Judgment by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15)(Clare, Jeremy)
|
February 1, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER granting (86) Motion in case 1:14-cv-00670-RCL; granting (31) Motion in case 1:15-cv-01026-RCL. It is ORDERED that plaintiffs' opening brief in support of their motion for summary judgment shall not exceed 65 pages, federal defendants' combined opening brief in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment/opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall not exceed 55 pages, and federal defendants' reply brief shall not exceed 35 pages. It is further FURTHER ORDERED that the page limits set out in the Local Rules shall apply to all other briefs. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/1/16. (DMK)
|
January 31, 2016 |
Filing 86
Unopposed MOTION to File Overlarge Summary Judgment Briefs by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burdin, Douglas)
|
November 9, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report, it is ORDERED that federal defendants will file an amended certified list of the contents of the 2015 administrative record and provide the parties with updated compact discs by November 20, 2015; plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is due by February 18, 2016; federal defendants' combined Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is due by March 25, 2016; defendant-intervenors' combined Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is due by April 1, 2016; plaintiffs' combined Summary Judgment Reply and Opposition to federal defendants' and defendant-intervenors' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment is due by April 29, 2016; federal defendants' Summary Judgment Reply is due by May 20, 2016; defendant-intervenors' Summary Judgment Reply is due by May 27, 2016; and plaintiffs will file the Joint Appendix pursuant to LCvR 7(n) by June 3, 2016. It is further ORDERED that defendant-intervenors may incorporate by reference any arguments of the federal defendants but shall not repeat any of their arguments. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/9/15. (DMK)
|
November 6, 2015 |
Filing 85
Joint STATUS REPORT by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Flax, Meredith)
|
October 23, 2015 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #84 Status Report; emailed to andrea.gelatt@usdoj.gov, cc'd 15 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Corrected error notice: In future, documents should contain both case numbers 14-670 and 15-1026. (znmw, )
|
October 23, 2015 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #84 Status Report; emailed to andrea.gelatt@usdoj.gov, cc'd 15 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Incorrect case number; Please file an errata with an amended case caption/number (znmw, )
|
October 22, 2015 |
Filing 84
Joint STATUS REPORT by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Gelatt, Andrea)
|
October 22, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the status report filed by the parties on this date, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report by November 6, 2015 providing either (1) a schedule for resolving motions regarding the contents of the administrative record in the 2015 case, 1:15-cv-1026-RCL, or a schedule for consolidated summary judgment briefing for both the 2015 case and 2014 case, 1:14-cv-670-RCL, or (2) a motion for an additional extension so the parties may continue discussions about the administrative record issues. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/22/15. (DMK)
|
September 15, 2015 |
Filing 83
ANSWER to #82 Amended Complaint by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. Related document: #82 Amended Complaint filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL.(Flax, Meredith)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing 82
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE filed by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA.(zrdj)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing 81
ORDER; granting #77 Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/31/2015. (hs)
|
August 19, 2015 |
Filing 80
REPLY to opposition to motion re #77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
August 14, 2015 |
Filing 79
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Notice of Filing Amended Certified Lists of Contents of Administrative Records) by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - April 2014 Certified List, #2 Exhibit 2 - July 2014 Certified List, #3 Exhibit 3 - April 2014 Certification Statement, #4 Exhibit 4 - July 2014 Certification Statement)(Flax, Meredith)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing 78
RESPONSE re #77 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Gelatt, Andrea)
|
July 31, 2015 |
Filing 77
MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burdin, Douglas)
|
July 21, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #76 Motion for Joint Consolidated Briefing Schedule. It is ORDERED that the briefing schedule in Civ. No. 14-cv-00670 (RCL) ("the 2014 case") and Civ. No. 15-cv-01026 (RCL) ("the 2015 case") shall be as follows: On or before September 15, 2015, federal defendants will file a certified list of the contents of the Administrative Record ("AR") for the 2015 case and will provide copies of the AR for the 2015 case to all parties. On or before October 15, 2015, plaintiffs will notify federal defendants if plaintiffs consider the AR for the 2015 case to be complete. On or before October 22, 2015, the parties will file a joint status report informing the Court of their positions on the AR for the 2015 case. If the parties agree that the AR is complete, they will also provide the Court with a new, proposed schedule that will consolidate the briefing for the 2014 case and the 2015 case. If the parties do not agree, the status report will include a schedule for resolving the AR disagreement. On or before September 15, 2015, federal defendants will file their answer or other response to the complaint in the 2015 case. If federal defendants file a motion to dismiss all or part of the complaint instead of an answer, plaintiffs will move to sever the cases so that summary judgment briefing of the 2014 case may proceed independently of any briefing on any motions to dismiss the 2015 case. On or before August 15, 2015, Friends of Animals and Zimbabwe Conservation Task Force will file a motion to intervene, if they seek to intervene in the 2015 case. Plaintiffs will inform the parties and the Court if they oppose the motion to intervene by August 20, 2015. If so, plaintiffs will file any opposition brief by August 31, 2015, and movants will file any reply by September 11, 2015. On or before August 15, 2015, plaintiffs will file a motion to amend the 2014 Complaint to include the Endangered Species Act, 16 U.S.C. 1538(c)(2) claim that is already part of the 2015 case. Any response and reply briefs filed with respect to the motion to amend shall follow the briefing schedule set by LCvR 7. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/21/15. (DMK) Modified on 7/21/2015 to reflect that the correct case number for the "2015" case is 15-cv-01026. (jth).
|
July 21, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #74 motion to amend in light of the minute order of this date granting the joint motion for brief schedule #76 . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/21/15. (DMK)
|
July 21, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2015 (hs)
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing 76
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Jeremy)
|
July 17, 2015 |
Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Status Conference held on 7/17/2015. (Court Reporter Lisa Foradori) (hs)
|
July 9, 2015 |
Filing 75
MINUTE ORDER. The status hearing previously set for July 20, 2015 at 10:00 am is now set for July 17, 2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth to discuss the schedule in this case and to discuss case number 15-cv-1026-RCL, Safari Club Int'l v. Jewell. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 9, 2015 (lcrcl2).
|
July 9, 2015 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (hs)
|
July 8, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. A status hearing is set for July 20, 2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth to discuss the schedule in this case and to discuss case number 15-cv-1026-RCL, Safari Club Int'l v. Jewell. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/8/15. (DMK)
|
July 7, 2015 |
Filing 74
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #73 Meet and Confer Statement on Proposed Briefing Schedule by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion to File Amended Proposed Briefing Schedule, #2 Amended Proposed Briefing Schedule, #3 Text of Proposed Order on Amended Proposed Briefing Schedule)(Seidman, Anna)
|
July 6, 2015 |
Filing 73
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Proposed Joint Briefing Schedule)(Seidman, Anna)
|
June 29, 2015 |
Filing 72
ORDER; denying #64 Motion to Compel Supplementation of the Administrative Record/Admit Extra-Record Evidence by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. Proposed schedule for the filing of summary judgment briefs due by 7/6/2015, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/29/2015. (hs)
|
June 29, 2015 |
Filing 71
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/29/2015. (hs)
|
June 16, 2015 |
USCA Case Number 15-5170 for #69 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (md)
|
June 5, 2015 |
Filing 70
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #69 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (rdj)
|
June 4, 2015 |
Filing 69
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #47 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, #48 Memorandum & Opinion by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-4124042. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Seidman, Anna)
|
April 21, 2015 |
Filing 68
REPLY to opposition to motion re #64 MOTION to Compel Supplementation of the Administrative Record/Admit Extra-Record Evidence filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Seidman, Anna)
|
April 14, 2015 |
Filing 67
Memorandum in opposition to re #64 MOTION to Compel Supplementation of the Administrative Record/Admit Extra-Record Evidence filed by DANIEL M. ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Timothy Van Norman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Flax, Meredith)
|
April 10, 2015 |
Filing 66
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #65 Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability ; USCA Case Number 14-5152. (znmw, )
|
April 9, 2015 |
Filing 65
ORDER granting #53 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/9/15. (DMK)
|
March 31, 2015 |
Filing 64
MOTION to Compel Supplementation of the Administrative Record/Admit Extra-Record Evidence by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Van Norman E-mail, #3 Exhibit Stromayer E-mail, #4 Exhibit April FOIA Request, #5 Exhibit July FOIA Request, #6 Exhibit October 14, 2014 e-mail, #7 Exhibit October 31, 2014 e-mail, #8 Exhibit March 4, 2015 e-mail, #9 Exhibit March 11, 2015 e-mail, #10 Exhibit March 16, 2015 e-mail, #11 Exhibit March 19, 2015 e-mail, #12 Exhibit FOIA Response Cover Letter, #13 Exhibit DOI Standardized Guidance, #14 Exhibit FWS Directive)(Seidman, Anna)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing 63
ANSWER to #49 Amended Complaint by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS, ZIMBABWE CONSERVATION TASK FORCE. Related document: #49 Amended Complaint filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL.(rdj)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing 62
ORDER granting #45 Motion to Intervene as of right. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/12/15. (DMK)
|
February 17, 2015 |
Filing 61
REPLY to opposition to motion re #53 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Burdin, Douglas)
|
February 10, 2015 |
Filing 60
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified List of the Contents of the Administrative Record for July 2014 Zimbabwe Enhancement Finding, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certification of the Administrative Record for the July 2014 Zimbabwe Enhancement Finding)(Flax, Meredith)
|
February 6, 2015 |
Filing 59
Memorandum in opposition to re #53 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flax, Meredith)
|
February 5, 2015 |
Filing 58
SURREPLY to re #45 MOTION to Intervene filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (rdj)
|
February 5, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #57 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter plaintiffs' sur-reply, filed as attachment 1 to the motion [57-1], on the docket. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/5/15. (DMK)
|
February 4, 2015 |
Filing 57
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply to Proposed Defendant Intervenors Reply on their Motion to Intervene by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lodged Sur-reply, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burdin, Douglas)
|
January 27, 2015 |
Filing 56
ORDER for Joint Briefing Schedule. Administrative Record due by 2/10/2015. (See Image for Details) Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/27/15. (mpt)
|
January 27, 2015 |
Filing 55
REPLY to opposition to motion re #45 MOTION to Intervene filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS, ZIMBABWE CONSERVATION TASK FORCE. (Harris, Michael)
|
January 26, 2015 |
Filing 54
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seidman, Anna)
|
January 22, 2015 |
Filing 53
MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seidman, Anna)
|
January 20, 2015 |
Filing 52
Memorandum in opposition to re #45 MOTION to Intervene filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seidman, Anna)
|
January 12, 2015 |
Filing 51
ANSWER to #49 Amended Complaint by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. Related document: #49 Amended Complaint filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL.(Flax, Meredith)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing 50
MEMORANDUM re #45 MOTION to Intervene filed by ZIMBABWE CONSERVATION TASK FORCE, FRIENDS OF ANIMALS, #46 MOTION to Stay re #45 MOTION to Intervene filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS, ZIMBABWE CONSERVATION TASK FORCE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed answer, #2 Declaration of Johnny Rodrigues, #3 Declaration of Priscilla Feral, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Michael)
|
January 5, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit by January 26, 2015 a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/5/15. (DMK)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 1/26/2015. (tg, )
|
December 26, 2014 |
Filing 49
AMENDED COMPLAINT against DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE filed by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA.(rdj)
|
December 26, 2014 |
Filing 48
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/26/14. (DMK)
|
December 26, 2014 |
Filing 47
ORDER granting #34 plaintiffs' motion to amend; denying defendants' motion to dismiss #11 ; granting in part and denying in part defendants' motions to dismiss #36 . See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/26/14. (DMK)
|
December 24, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER granting proposed defendant-intervenors' unopposed motion to stay briefing on the motion to intervene [45-1]. It is ORDERED that briefing on the motion to intervene #45 is stayed for 10 days from the date of this Court's order resolving defendants' motions to dismiss [11, 36]. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/24/14. (DMK)
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing 46
ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Stay re #45 MOTION to Intervene by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Michael) Modified on 12/23/2014 (zjf, ).
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing 45
MOTION to Intervene by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS, Zimbabwe Conservation Task Force (Harris, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2014: #1 Exhibit Motion to Stay) (jf, ).
|
December 23, 2014 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #46 MOTION to Stay re #45 MOTION to Intervene was entered in error as a premature filing and added to entry #45 (jf, )
|
November 18, 2014 |
Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Motions Hearing held on 11/18/2014 re: Defendants' #11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Plaintiff's #34 Motion to Amend/Correct #13 the Amended Complaint; and Defendants' #36 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss. All Motions were Heard and Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter Lisa Foradori) (jth)
|
November 17, 2014 |
Filing 44
Case reassigned by consent to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Amy Berman Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (gt, )
|
November 17, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Motions Hearing scheduled for Tuesday, November 18, 2014, at 10:00 AM will take place in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/17/14. (DMK)
|
November 17, 2014 |
Set/Reset Hearings: The Motions Hearing is reset for 11/18/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (jth)
|
November 7, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Stay Order entered in this case on October 30, 2014 be Lifted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a Motions Hearing be scheduled for Tuesday, November 18, 2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/7/2014. (jth)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing 43
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine A. Hill on behalf of All Defendants (Hill, Christine)
|
October 30, 2014 |
NOTICE of Hearing: A Telephone Conference Call is scheduled in this case for 10/30/2014 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. The parties will be notified separately of the procedures on how to enter the call. (jth)
|
October 30, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER STAYING CASE. For the reasons stated during the telephone conference held on this date and upon further consideration of the matters discussed on the record, the case is stayed pending the resolution of the appeal in this matter, No. 14-5152. The parties shall notify the Court promptly upon the issuance of any order by the Court of Appeals or the filing of any motion dismissing the appeal. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/30/14. (DMK) Modified on 10/30/2014 to refelct that this is a minute/paperless order (jth).
|
October 30, 2014 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Telephone Conference Call held on 10/30/2014. The Motions Hearing presently scheduled for Friday, October 31, 2014, is cancelled. (Court Reporter Janice Dickman) (jth)
|
October 9, 2014 |
NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: Motions Hearing is scheduled for 10/31/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Re: Defendants' #11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Plaintiffs' #34 Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint, Defendants' #36 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss. (jth)
|
September 19, 2014 |
Filing 42
REPLY to opposition to motion re #36 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss and Partial Opposition to Motion to Amend/Correct filed by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Flax, Meredith)
|
September 5, 2014 |
Filing 41
REPLY to opposition to motion re #34 MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Amended Complaint , filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Letter of Bryan Arroyo)(Seidman, Anna) Modified on 9/8/2014 (jf, ).
|
September 5, 2014 |
Filing 40
Memorandum in opposition to re #36 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss and Partial Opposition to Motion to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Letter of Bryan Arroyo)(Seidman, Anna) Modified on 9/8/2014 (jf, ).
|
August 29, 2014 |
Filing 39
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Amended) by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Certified List of the Contents of the Administrative Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Record Certification for Amended Certified List)(Flax, Meredith)
|
August 15, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is ORDERED that plaintiffs' combined reply in support of their motion for leave to file a second amended complaint #34 and opposition to defendants' supplemental motion to dismiss #36 is due by September 5, 2014. It is further ORDERED that defendants' reply in support of their supplemental motion to dismiss is due by September 19, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/15/14. (DMK)
|
August 14, 2014 |
Filing 38
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend (Dkt 34) by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Jeremy)
|
August 8, 2014 |
Filing 37
Memorandum in opposition to re #34 MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Amended Complaint (Partial Opposition) filed by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Flax, Meredith)
|
August 8, 2014 |
Filing 36
Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Flax, Meredith) Modified on 8/11/2014 (jf, ).
|
August 8, 2014 |
Filing 35
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified List of the Contents of the Administrative Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Record Certification)(Flax, Meredith)
|
August 1, 2014 |
Filing 34
MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Amended Complaint by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Press Release, #2 Proposed Second Amended and Supplemented Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Seidman, Anna)
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing 33
NOTICE of Publication of July Zimbabwe Finding in the Federal Register by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Attached -- 79 Fed. Reg. 44,459 (July 31, 2014))(Flax, Meredith)
|
July 16, 2014 |
USCA Case Number 14-5152 for #29 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (erd)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants to file a Certified List of the Contents of the Administrative Record by 8/8/2014. Defendants' Supplement to the Motion to Dismiss is now due by 8/8/2014, Plaintiffs' Opposition and Supplemental Materials gleaned from the Record that Support their previously filed Responses to the Motion to Dismiss are due by 9/5/2014, Defendants' reply is due by 9/19/2014. (jth)
|
June 23, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER. Notwithstanding the Court's view that LCvR 7(n)(1) was amended for the convenience of the Court and addresses cases at the summary judgment stage, it is ORDERED that defendants file a certified list of the contents of the administrative record by August 8, 2014. It is further ORDERED that defendants' supplement to the motion to dismiss is now due by August 8, 2014, plaintiffs' opposition to the supplemental motion to dismiss and the submission of any materials gleaned from the record that support their previously filed responses to the motion to dismiss are due by September 5, 2014, and defendants' reply is due by September 19, 2014. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs' #28 motion for reconsideration and #28 cross-motion to compel is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/23/14.(DMK)
|
June 20, 2014 |
Filing 32
Memorandum in opposition to re #28 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, and Motion to Compel Production of the Administrative Record and incorporated Notice regarding Minute Order of June 18, 2014 filed by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of Bryan Arroyo)(Gelatt, Andrea)
|
June 20, 2014 |
Filing 31
NOTICE re MINUTE ORDER filed on 06/18/2014 by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE re Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of Bryan Arroyo)(Gelatt, Andrea) Modified on 6/23/2014 (jf, ).
|
June 18, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that defendants shall file notice by Friday, June 20, 2014 advising the Court how long it will take to compile the administrative record. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/18/14. (DMK)
|
June 18, 2014 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' to file notice by 6/20/2014 advising the Court how long it will take to compile the administrative record. (jth)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing 30
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #29 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (jf, )
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing 29
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #24 Memorandum & Opinion by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-3751258. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Seidman, Anna)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing 28
MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, and Cross Motion to Compel Production of the Administrative Record by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Brian Arroyo, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Seidman, Anna). Added Cross MOTION to Compel (jf)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Any supplement to defendants' Motion to Dismiss is due by 7/3/2014; Plaintiffs' Opposition to any supplement is due by 7/24/2014; defendants' reply to the supplement is due by 8/7/2014. (jth)
|
June 16, 2014 |
Filing 27
SURREPLY to re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (jf, )
|
June 16, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #26 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a surreply in support of their opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter on the docket the surreply attached to plaintiffs' motion [26-2]. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/16/14. (DMK)
|
June 16, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #25 defendants' motion for relief from LCvR 7(n). It is ORDERED that defendants are relieved from complying with LCvR 7(n) pending a ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss but that they are required to begin the process of compiling the administrative record for this case in the meantime. It is further ORDERED that any supplement to defendants' motion to dismiss is due July 3, 2014, plaintiffs' opposition to that supplement is due July 24, 2014, and defendants' reply to the supplement is due August 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/16/14. (DMK)
|
June 13, 2014 |
Filing 26
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Croos-Motion to Dismiss by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Surreply)(Seidman, Anna)
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing 25
MOTION for Relief from LCvR 7(n) by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flax, Meredith)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 24
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #4 motion for preliminary injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/6/14.(DMK)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing 23
REPLY to opposition to motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 - 1997 Tanzania Enhancement Finding)(Flax, Meredith)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 22
Memorandum in opposition to re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seidman, Anna)
|
May 23, 2014 |
Filing 21
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA. (Conte, Christopher)
|
May 21, 2014 |
Filing 20
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Evan Clare on behalf of SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Clare, Jeremy)
|
May 21, 2014 |
Filing 19
SURREPLY to re #14 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (jf, )
|
May 21, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendants' response to plaintiff's motion for leave to file [Dkt. # 18] and unopposed request to file a surreply, it is ORDERED that defendants are granted leave to file a surreply in support of their opposition to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter the surreply [Dkt. # 18-1] on the docket. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/21/14. (DMK)
|
May 21, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations with Preliminary Injunction Reply Brief. The supplemental declarations submitted with plaintiff's reply brief [Dkt. # 14] are treated as filed. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/21/14. (DMK)
|
May 21, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER that the Hearing on Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction presently scheduled for Wednesday, May 28, 2014, at 10:00 AM is cancelled. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/21/2014. (jth)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing 18
RESPONSE re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations and Federal Defendants' Unopposed Request to File a Surreply filed by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed surreply, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gelatt, Andrea)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing 17
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Scott Burdin on behalf of SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Burdin, Douglas) (Main Document 17 replaced on 5/21/2014) (jf, ).
|
May 19, 2014 |
Filing 16
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/28/2014., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/28/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/27/2014.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt Proof of Service Documents)(Seidman, Anna)
|
May 19, 2014 |
Filing 15
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Conte on behalf of NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA (Conte, Christopher)
|
May 16, 2014 |
Filing 14
REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Edson Chidziya, #2 Declaration Charles Jonga, #3 Declaration Anna Seidman, #4 Exhibit Foia Request, #5 Exhibit Directors Memo)(Seidman, Anna)
|
May 16, 2014 |
Filing 13
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL.(Seidman, Anna)
|
May 15, 2014 |
Filing 12
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Declaration Edson Chidziya, #2 Declaration Charles Jonga, #3 Declaration Anna M. Seidman, #4 Exhibit FOIA Request, #5 Exhibit Memorandum to Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service)(Seidman, Anna)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing 11
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Timothy Van Norman, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Rosemarie Gnam, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Interim Suspension on Importation of Zimbabwean Elephant Trophies, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Flax, Meredith)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing 10
Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Timothy Van Norman, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Rosemarie Gnam, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Interim Suspension on Importation of Zimbabwean Elephant Trophies, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Flax, Meredith)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing 9
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/28/2014. (Seidman, Anna)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing 8
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/28/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/27/2014. (Seidman, Anna)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing 7
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DANIEL ASHE served on 4/25/2014; SALLY JEWELL served on 4/28/2014; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 4/25/2014; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 4/25/2014 (Seidman, Anna)
|
May 2, 2014 |
Filing 6
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Gelatt on behalf of All Defendants (Gelatt, Andrea)
|
May 2, 2014 |
Filing 5
NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith L. Flax on behalf of DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Flax, Meredith)
|
May 2, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER. As discussed during the teleconference with counsel for the parties held on this date, it is ORDERED that defendants' opposition to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is due by 5/13/14, plaintiff's reply is due by 5/16/14, and a motion hearing is set for 5/28/14 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3. The parties' briefs, at this juncture, should address only the issues of irreparable harm and subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/2/14. (DMK) Modified on 5/2/2014 to reflect that the correct date of the motion hearing is 5/28/2014 (jth).
|
May 2, 2014 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Telephone Conference Call in Chambers held on 5/2/2014. (NO COURT REPORTER) (jth)
|
May 2, 2014 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 5/13/14; Plaintiff's Reply is due by 5/16/14; Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 5/28/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
|
April 30, 2014 |
Filing 4
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Request for Hearing, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit April 4, 2014 Press Release, #6 Exhibit Question and Answer Page, #7 Exhibit Letter from Robert Gabel, #8 Exhibit Zimbabwe Enhancement Finding, #9 Exhibit Letter from Edson Chidziya, #10 Exhibit FWS Questions to Zimbabwe, #11 Exhibit ZPWMA Response, #12 Exhibit IUCN Report, #13 Exhibit Tanzania NDF, #14 Exhibit Tanzania Enhancement Finding, #15 Exhibit Goodenow Declaration, #16 Exhibit Beardmore Declaration, #17 Exhibit Didado Declaration, #18 Exhibit Cheek Declaration, #19 Exhibit Bailey Declaration, #20 Exhibit Rawson Declaration, #21 Exhibit Ingersoll Declaration, #22 Exhibit Holdridge Declaration, #23 Exhibit Berry Declaration, #24 Exhibit Buch Declaration, #25 Exhibit Grieb Declaration, #26 Exhibit Condon Declaration, #27 Exhibit Nice Declaration, #28 Exhibit Cooley Declaration, #29 Exhibit Monsen Declaration, #30 Exhibit Netzley Declaration, #31 Exhibit Capozza Declaration, #32 Exhibit Rhyne Declaration, #33 Exhibit Bridges Declaration, #34 Exhibit Taylor Declaration, #35 Exhibit Dinger Declaration, #36 Exhibit Whaley Declaration, #37 Exhibit Perry Declaration, #38 Exhibit McCall Declaration, #39 Exhibit Vick Declaration, #40 Exhibit McDonnold Declaration, #41 Exhibit Dennison Declaration, #42 Exhibit Pole Declaration, #43 Exhibit Oosterhuis Declaration, #44 Exhibit Carter Declaration, #45 Exhibit Barth Declaration, #46 Exhibit Pieters Declaration, #47 Exhibit Cooke Declaration, #48 Exhibit Duckworth Declaration, #49 Exhibit De Vries Declaration, #50 Exhibit Tarpley Declaration, #51 Exhibit Petty Declaration, #52 Exhibit Johnson Declaration, #53 Exhibit Sakuta Declaration, #54 Exhibit Hurt Declaration, #55 Exhibit Angelides Declaration, #56 Exhibit Adams Declaration, #57 Exhibit Res. Conf. 2.11 (Annex 1), #58 Exhibit Res Conf. 2.11)(Seidman, Anna)
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing 3
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Seidman, Anna)
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing 2
SUMMONS Issued (6) Electronically as to DANIEL ASHE, SALLY JEWELL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Notice of Consent)(kb)
|
April 21, 2014 |
Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (kb)
|
April 21, 2014 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3691517) filed by SAFARI CLUB INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Form, #2 Summons (6), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seidman, Anna)
|