ROGERS et al

Plaintiff: STEPHEN J. ROGERS, LINDA L. ROGERS, DONALD E. DURAN, JUDITH DURAN, DENISE RIZZO, ALL PLAINTIFFS and Murphy
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00273
Filed: May 1, 2007
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Mary Ellen Coster Williams
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
June 28, 2010 210 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
December 20, 2010 337 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION: Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 328 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
February 24, 2011 349 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION denying 310 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
October 31, 2011 377 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION granting 195 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 289 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 304 Motion to Strike. Status Conference set for 11/14/2011 at 11:00 ET.. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Copy to parties.
February 9, 2012 418 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (tb1) Copy to parties.
March 26, 2012 468 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION denying 429 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Copy to parties.
September 25, 2012 548 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 220 Cross-Motions The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 10/15/2012. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Copy to parties.
February 19, 2013 585 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 527 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Calamaras' claim. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Copy to parties.
January 15, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER . Plaintiffs shall file a notice to the Court and Parties by February 2, 2009. Plaintiffs and Defendant shall file supplemental briefing by February 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (ms4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ROGERS et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN J. ROGERS
Represented By: Mark Fernlund Hearne, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA L. ROGERS
Represented By: Mark Fernlund Hearne, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD E. DURAN
Represented By: Mark Fernlund Hearne, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH DURAN
Represented By: Mark Fernlund Hearne, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE RIZZO
Represented By: Mark Fernlund Hearne, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Carol Lee Draper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]