DIRECTV LLC v. WELLS et al

Defendant: JAZZMIN WELLS, TRIPOLIE S WELLS and STANLEY WELLS
Plaintiff: DIRECTV LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00028
Filed: February 27, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: W. Louis Sands
 
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants are Ordered to provide a more definite statement of their counterclaims within 14 days of the entry and filing of this Order. Ordered by Judge W. Louis Sands on 5/20/2013. (bcl)
September 30, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to provide a more definite statement of their counterclaims within 14 days of the entry and filing of this Order. Defendants' Request for Appointment of Counsel 40 is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Judge W. Louis Sands on 9/30/2013. (bcl)
October 17, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Compel. Defendants shall file initial disclosures and responses to written discovery not later than 11/7/2013. Defendants shall also file a written memorandum not later than 11/7/2013. Ordered by Judge W. Louis Sands on 10/17/2013. (bcl)
November 13, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W. Louis Sands on 11/13/2013. (bcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DIRECTV LLC v. WELLS et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAZZMIN WELLS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIPOLIE S WELLS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANLEY WELLS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIRECTV LLC
Represented By: ROBERT E CAMPBELL
Represented By: JOHN H JAMNBACK
Represented By: JEREMY E ROLLER
Represented By: SCOTT T WILSDON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]