LITMAN v. Mabus et al

Defendant: Ray Mabus and JOSIE DRISTY
Plaintiff: JOHNNY LITMAN
Case Number: 1:2013cv00043
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Dougherty
Presiding Judge: W. Louis Sands
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint within 14 days from the entry of this Order.Ordered by U.S. District Judge W. Louis Sands on 10/25/13 (wks)
February 21, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint within 14 days from the entry of this Order. All claims against Josie Dristy in her individual capacity are dismissed. Defendant's renewed motion (Doc. 21) is denied as moot. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 2/21/14 (wks) Modified on 2/21/2014 (wks).
October 22, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part as to Plaintiff's Counts One, Two and Five of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint and Plaintiff's ADEA and Rehabilitation Act hostile work environment claims in Count Three and denying in part 25 Motion to Dis miss Complaint as to Count Four of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint and Plaintiff's Title VII hostile work environment claim in Count Three. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 10/22/2014. (bcl) Modified on 10/22/2014 (bcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LITMAN v. Mabus et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Mabus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSIE DRISTY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY LITMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]