SKINNER v. DEREBAIL et al

Plaintiff: MANASSEH ROYDREGO SKINNER
Defendant: Sheriff Sproul, DEREBAIL, Major Haggerty and Major Lewis
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00044
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Dougherty
Referring Judge: Thomas Q Langstaff
Presiding Judge: W. Louis Sands
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 6 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's Objection 9 is overruled. Defendant's Haggerty, Lewis and Sproul are dismissed from the case. Ordered by Judge W. Louis Sands on 5/31/2013. (bcl)
December 16, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 21 Motion for TRO; adopting 27 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W. Louis Sands on 12/16/2013. (bcl)
June 11, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 50 Report and Recommendations. It is ordered and adjudged that Plaintiff shall take nothing by his Complaint and judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendant. Ordered by U.S. District Judge W LOUIS SANDS on 6/11/2014. (bcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SKINNER v. DEREBAIL et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANASSEH ROYDREGO SKINNER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Sproul
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREBAIL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Haggerty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]