Parker v. Mentor Corporation

Plaintiff: Barbara Parker, Richard Parker, Cheryl Ann Olson and Edwin Olson
Defendant: Mentor Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2007cv00088
Filed: August 21, 2007
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Athens Office
County: Clarke
Presiding Judge: Clay D. Land
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying denying (76) Motion to Quash in case 4:08-md-02004-CDL and all associated cases. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 12/01/2009. (CGC)
December 1, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying (90) Motion Establish Authenticity of ObTape Samples in case 4:08-md-02004-CDL and all associated cases. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 12/1/2009. (CGC)
January 14, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part (124) Motion to Quash in case 4:08-md-02004-CDL. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 01/14/2010 (CGC). Associated Cases: ALL CASES.
March 3, 2010 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (60) Motion to Consolidate Cases in 4:08-md-2004. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 03/03/2010. (CGC) Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 3:07-cv-00088-CDL, 3:07-cv-00101-CDL, 3:07-cv-00102-CDL, 3:07-cv-00130-CDL, 3:07-cv-00135-CDL
April 1, 2010 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 153 Motion to Disqualify Expert Witness Catherine Ortuno in case 4:08-md-02004-CDL. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 04/01/2010. (CGC) Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 3:07-cv-00088-CDL, 3:07-cv-00101-CDL, 3:07-cv-00102-CDL, 3:07-cv-00130-CDL, 4:08-cv-05000-CDL, 4:08-cv-05003-CDL, 4:08-cv-05010-CDL.
April 22, 2010 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Partly resolves Doc. 154 in 4:08-md-2004 -- denies SJ as to design defect claims (spread to 3:07-cv-88; 3:07-cv-101; 3:07-cv-102; 3:07-cv-130). Remaining FDA claims will be ruled on in forthcoming order.Partly resolves Doc. 156 in 4:08-md-2004 -- grants in part and denies in part motion to exclude expert witness testimony (spread to 3:07-cv-88; 3:07-cv-101; 3:07-cv-102; 3:07-cv-130; 4:08-cv-5000; 4:08-cv-5003; 4:08-cv-5010)Remaining Daubert motions will be ruled on in fort hcoming order.Completely resolves (grants in part and denies in part these MSJs)Doc. 140 in 3:07-cv-88 (Parker Plaintiffs); Doc. 142 in 3:07-cv-88 (Olson Plaintiffs); Doc. 114 in 3:07-cv-101 (Plaintiffs Stafford and Pinkney); Doc. 110 in 3:07- cv-102 (Crowther Plaintiffs); Doc. 111 in 3:07-cv-102 (Booth Plaintiffs); Doc. 112 in 3:07-cv-102 (Tucker Plaintiffs); Doc. 105 in 3:07-cv-130 (Plaintiff Mills); Doc. 106 in 3:07-cv-130 (Dover Plaintiffs); Doc. 108 in 3:07-cv-130 (Merritt Plaintiffs) ; Doc. 109 in 3:07-cv-130 (Looper Plaintiffs)Doc. 110 in 3:07-cv-130 (Turner Plaintiffs)Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 4/22/2010 Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 3:07-cv-00088-CDL, 3:07-cv-00101-CDL, 3:07-cv-00102-CDL, 3:07-cv-00130-CDL, 4:08-cv-05000-CDL, 4:08-cv-05003-CDL, 4:08-cv-05010-CDL(esl)
April 23, 2010 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deferring ruling on the FDA evidence contained in (154) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:08-md-02004-CDL 143 Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-00088-CDL; (116) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-00101-CDL; (114) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-00102-CDL; (107) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-00130-CDL]. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 4/23/2010. Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 3:07-cv-00088-CDL, 3:07-cv-00101-CDL, 3:07-cv-00102-CDL, 3:07-cv-00130-CDL(esl) Modified on 4/23/2010 (esl).
April 27, 2010 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony from Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Witnesses in case 4:08-md-02004-CDL.Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 04/27/2010 (CGC). Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 3:07-cv-00088-CDL, 3:07-cv-00101-CDL, 3:07-cv-00102-CDL, 3:07-cv-00130-CDL, 4:08-cv-05000-CDL, 4:08-cv-05003-CDL, 4:08-cv-05010-CDL
April 29, 2010 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 163 Motion to exclude certain testimony of Mentor's proposed expert witnesses; denying 164 Motion to exclude testimony of Michael Chernick, Ph.D.; denying 165 Motion to exclude certain testimony of Mentor's proposed expert witnesses. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 04/29/2010. (CGC) Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 3:07-cv-00088-CDL, 3:07-cv-00101-CDL, 3:07-cv-00102-CDL, 3:07-cv-00130-CDL, 4:08-cv-05000-CDL, 4:08-cv-05003-CDL, 4:08-cv-05010-CDL
August 3, 2010 247 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17) Ordered by JPMDL on 7/27/2010. (Attachments: # 1 cover letter) Associated Cases: ALL CASES (esl)
January 22, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER clarifying interpretation of Rule 34(b)(2)(E)(i). Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 1/22/2009 Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 3:07-cv-00088-CDL, 3:07-cv-00101-CDL, 3:07-cv-00102-CDL, 3:07-cv-00130-CDL, 3:07-cv-00135-CDL(esl)
July 10, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part / denying in part 48 Motion to Compel (48 in 4:08-md-02004-CDL). Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 7/9/2009. Associated Cases: ALL (See NEF for specifics)(esl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Parker v. Mentor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Parker
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Parker
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Ann Olson
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Olson
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Corporation
Represented By: James Joseph Ward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]