FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. EDDINGS et al

Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: MICHAEL A EDDINGS, LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL A EDDINGS PC and APEX TITLE INC
Case Number: 4:2012cv00072
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: Muscogee
Presiding Judge: Clay D. Land
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Blankenship and Blalock for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 03/13/2013.(aaf)
December 10, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Clay D. Land on 12/10/2013. (CGC)
January 23, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion for Final Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 01/23/2014. (CGC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. EDDINGS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: FRANK REID OLSON
Represented By: TODD H SURDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL A EDDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL A EDDINGS PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX TITLE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.