Bishop v. Hall

Petitioner: Joshua Daniel Bishop
Respondent: Hilton Hall
 
Case Number: 5:2008cv00091
Filed: March 28, 2008
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Referring Judge: Claude W. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for Discovery. Petitioner has thirty (30) days from this date to complete discovery. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 12/01/2008. (nbp)
March 17, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting deadlines for briefs on outstanding issues. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/17/2009. (nbp)
July 24, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER addressing claims of default. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 7/24/2009. (nbp)
May 4, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying petition for writ of habeas corpus. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/4/2010. (nbp)
February 3, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/3/2011. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bishop v. Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Daniel Bishop
Represented By: Thomas H. Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hilton Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]