Sallie (DEATH PENALTY) v. Humphrey

Petitioner: William C Sallie
Respondent: Carl Humphrey
Case Number: 5:2011cv00075
Filed: February 28, 2011
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 4 Motion to Dismiss Petitioner's Habeas Petition as Untimely; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 52 Motion for an Order Ruling that Petitioner's Habeas Petition is Timely. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 9/6/2012. (tlh)
March 25, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 116 Petitioner's Application for Authorization of Funds for Investigative Funds. The Court authorizes $7,500.00 "to obtain future investigative services." The Court orders Petitioner to file any motion to amend his habeas petition and/or motion to stay these habeas proceedings within 45 days from the date of this Order. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/25/2013. (tlh)
July 26, 2013 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 125 Motion to Stay and Abey Proceedings. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 7/26/2013. (tlh)
August 6, 2013 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 148 Motion for Reconsideration re 146 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by WILLIAM C SALLIE. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/6/2013. (tlh)
August 6, 2013 150 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED ORDER DENYING 125 Motion to Stay and Abey Proceedings. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/6/2013. (tlh)
July 15, 2014 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 160 Motion for Reconsideration. However, the Court VACATES its 158 March 11, 2014 Order and enters this Order so that all relevant arguments can be addressed together. The result is the same; Sallie's 151 motion to amend his second amended habeas petition is DENIED. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/15/2014. (tlh)
July 15, 2014 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The claims in his second amended habeas petition are DENIED as untimely. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/15/2014. (tlh)
July 15, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court DENIES Sallies initial and renewed motions 52 159 for an order ruling his initial petition timely filed or, alternatively, granting an evidentiary hearing and GRANTS Respondent's motion to dismiss 4 . COA is DENIED. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/15/2014. (tlh)
June 9, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 4 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as Untimely. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 6/9/2011. (tlh)
July 26, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to supplement Petition. Petitioner's supplemental petition shall be filed by 8/15/2011. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 7/26/2011. (tlh)
July 29, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING 6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court now AMENDS the March 4, 2011 Order to show that Mr. Kammer and Ms. Salchow were appointed effective February 1, 2011. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 07/29/2011. (tlh)
August 12, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing counsel. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/12/2011. (tlh)
August 26, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 32 Order appointing counsel. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/26/2011. (tlh)
November 1, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court WITHHOLDS ruling on both 4 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as Untimely and 52 Petitioner's Motion for Order Ruling Habeas Petition Timely Filed or, alternatively, Granting Evidentiary H earing. In view of the Courts Scheduling Order, the Court DENIES AS MOOT 54 Respondent's Motion to Strike as Untimely Petitioners Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support for order Ruling Habeas Petition Timely Filed. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 11/1/2011. (tlh)
November 18, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 59 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 11/18/2011. (tlh)
March 4, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and GRANTING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/4/2011. (tlh)
April 4, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing counsel. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 4/4/2012. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sallie (DEATH PENALTY) v. Humphrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William C Sallie
Represented By: Kirsten Salchow
Represented By: Brian S. Kammer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carl Humphrey
Represented By: Beth Attaway Burton
Represented By: Richard Tangum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]