FIRST BENEFITS INC et al v. AMALGAMATED LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant: AMALGAMATED LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: UNION SERVICES OF AMERICA LLC and FIRST BENEFITS INC
Case Number: 5:2013cv00037
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 11 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and DISMISSING AS MOOT 7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/6/2013. (tlh)
March 26, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 28 Motion to Compel. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/26/2014. (tlh)
December 8, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 49 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 12/8/2014. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIRST BENEFITS INC et al v. AMALGAMATED LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMALGAMATED LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNION SERVICES OF AMERICA LLC
Represented By: Lee M. Gillis, Jr.
Represented By: RYAN DAVID DIXON
Represented By: Gordon Grant Greenwood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST BENEFITS INC
Represented By: Gordon Grant Greenwood
Represented By: Lee M. Gillis, Jr.
Represented By: RYAN DAVID DIXON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]