JENKINS et al v. BUTTS COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Plaintiff: PREMESSA JENKINS and JUVENILE
Defendant: BUTTS COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT and GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00047
Filed: February 7, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff's claim against Defendant Georgia Department of Education is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of standing and 21 Motion to Dismiss Complaint is DENIED as moot. The stay of discovery is lifted in this case. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 9/18/2013. (tlh)
November 25, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 44 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Further, Jenkins's claims asserted against the School District in her amended complaint are REMANDED to the ALJ for further proceedings consistent with this Order. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 11/25/2013. (tlh)
March 12, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER: The Court finds that the Plaintiff's Complaint passes § 1915A frivolity review. Accordingly, the Plaintiff can proceed with her claims against Defendants Butts County School District and Georgia Department of Education. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 3/12/2013. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JENKINS et al v. BUTTS COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PREMESSA JENKINS
Represented By: Ronny E. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUVENILE
Represented By: Ronny E. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUTTS COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]