THOMAS v. HUMPHREY et al

Defendant: MEDICAL CARE PROVIDERS, JOHN DOE, CARL HUMPHREY, YOUNG, EDWARD HALE BURNSIDE, MERRY GORE, PETERSON and HILL
Plaintiff: LAMARCUS THOMAS
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00108
Filed: March 26, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Referring Judge: Charles H Weigle
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 6/27/2013. (tlh)
March 19, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 64 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 43 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Humphrey and the Plaintiff's claims for damages against the Defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED. The Plaintiff's denial-of-medical-care claims against Defendants Burnside and Gore shall be allowed to go forward. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/19/2014. (tlh)
April 28, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 73 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 67 Motion for TRO and DENYING 67 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/28/2014. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: THOMAS v. HUMPHREY et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL CARE PROVIDERS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL HUMPHREY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOUNG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD HALE BURNSIDE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRY GORE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETERSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAMARCUS THOMAS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]