NICHOLSON v. HEAD et al

Plaintiff: NEVILLE NICHOLSON
Defendant: FREDERICK J HEAD and GEO CORPORATION
Case Number: 5:2013cv00146
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
Referring Judge: Charles H Weigle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 6/26/2013. (tlh)
August 14, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claim for denial of access to a law library and his claim against Defendant GEO Corporation is DISMISSED. The Plaintiff's claim against Defendant CEO Zoley is DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 8/14/2013. (tlh)
June 2, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 6/2/2014. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NICHOLSON v. HEAD et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEVILLE NICHOLSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDERICK J HEAD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]