CHO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: DAE EEK CHO
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00153
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Macon Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: Marc Thomas Treadwell
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's battery and invasion of privacy FTCA claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's false arrest, assault, false imprisonment, and intentional and neglig ent infliction of emotional distress FTCA claims shall go forward. Plaintiff's claims for violations of the Fourth and Fifth Amendments are DISMISSED with prejudice, and Defendants John and/or Jane Does are DISMISSED as parties to this action. Plaintiff's Civil Rights Act of 1964 claim is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Plaintiff is ORDERED to recast her complaint to sufficiently allege her remaining claims and the facts supporting each claim within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell on 9/19/2013. (tlh)
March 20, 2014 23 Featured Case ORDER DENYING re 22 Supplement to Complaint filed by DAE EEK CHO. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/20/2014. (tlh)
April 4, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 24 Motion to Transfer Case. Ordered by U.S. District Judge MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/4/2014. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CHO v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAE EEK CHO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]