SIMPSON et al v. SANDERSON FARMS INC et al

Defendant: KARINA FONDON, JENNIFER HARRISON BUSTER, ARISTIDES CARRLES, JANIE PERALES, SANDERSON FARMS INC, PERRY HAUSER, JEFF BLACK and DEMISHIA CROFT
Plaintiff: MELISSA SIMPSON and SABRINA ROBERTS
 
Case Number: 7:2012cv00028
Filed: February 16, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Colquitt
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2012 61 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE in its entirety until further order of the Court. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 6/27/2012. (nbp)
September 13, 2012 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Plaintiffs have until 10/5/2012 to file an amended complaint if they so choose. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 9/13/2012. (nbp)
February 5, 2013 85 Featured Case ORDER granting 74 Motion to Dismiss; granting 76 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing case with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 2/5/2013. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SIMPSON et al v. SANDERSON FARMS INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARINA FONDON
Represented By: Amy Combs Bender
Represented By: Benton J. Mathis, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER HARRISON BUSTER
Represented By: JOSEPH COLLINS WOHNER, JR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARISTIDES CARRLES
Represented By: Clifford M. Kirbo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANIE PERALES
Represented By: RICKY DANIEL COLLUM
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDERSON FARMS INC
Represented By: JOSEPH COLLINS WOHNER, JR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRY HAUSER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF BLACK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEMISHIA CROFT
Represented By: JOSEPH COLLINS WOHNER, JR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA SIMPSON
Represented By: MATTHEW GALIN
Represented By: HOWARD W FOSTER
Represented By: JOSEPH P DURHAM, JR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRINA ROBERTS
Represented By: MATTHEW GALIN
Represented By: HOWARD W FOSTER
Represented By: JOSEPH P DURHAM, JR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]