KEN CORBETT FARMS LLC v. TJ PRODUCE INC

Defendant: TJ PRODUCE INC
Plaintiff: KEN CORBETT FARMS LLC
 
Case Number: 7:2012cv00087
Filed: July 16, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Echols
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
 
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file a status report no later than February 26, 2013. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on February 12, 2013. (mbh)
March 1, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER denying 14 Motion for Default Judgment. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 3/1/2013. (nbp)
May 28, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER of Settlement. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/28/2013. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: KEN CORBETT FARMS LLC v. TJ PRODUCE INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ PRODUCE INC
Represented By: Erin K. Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEN CORBETT FARMS LLC
Represented By: Gregory A. Voyles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]