MLR INVESTMENT GROUP LLC et al v. PATE INSURANCE AGENCY INC

Plaintiff: GILBERTO MARTINEZ and MLR INVESTMENT GROUP LLC
Defendant: PATE INSURANCE AGENCY INC
 
Case Number: 7:2012cv00118
Filed: August 29, 2012
 
Court: Georgia Middle District Court
Office: Valdosta Office
County: Lowndes
Presiding Judge: Hugh Lawson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss Complaint; denying 16 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. The parties are to submit a Rules 16 and 26 discovery report no later than January 4, 2013. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on December 19, 2012. (mbh)
May 1, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and reserving ruling in part 29 Motion to Quash. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/1/2013. (nbp)
May 15, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Quash. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 5/15/2013. (nbp)
October 10, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk is directed to enter final judgment and terminate the case. Ordered by Judge Hugh Lawson on 10/10/2013. (nbp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MLR INVESTMENT GROUP LLC et al v. PATE INSURANCE AGENCY INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERTO MARTINEZ
Represented By: GLENN LOEWENTHAL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MLR INVESTMENT GROUP LLC
Represented By: GLENN LOEWENTHAL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATE INSURANCE AGENCY INC
Represented By: J. Holder Smith, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]