Cambridge University Press et al v. Patton et al Featured Case

Publisher lawsuit against public university that makes electronic copies of some course readings available to students without paying royalty fees.

Plaintiff: Oxford University Press, Inc., Cambridge University Press and Sage Publications, Inc.
Defendant: Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert, Carl V. Patton and Ronald Henry
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv01425
Filed: April 15, 2008
 
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Evans
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2013 481 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal (Exhibits - 8 Boxes; 1 Envelope consisting of one (1) book, exhibit with Deposition 171 ), to US Court of Appeals re 449 Notice of Appeal, 465 Notice of Appeal, Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 12-14676-FF; 12-15147-EE. (fem)
April 26, 2013 480 FORTHWITH LETTER from USCA re 449 Notice of Appeal, filed by Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc., Cambridge University Press, 465 Notice of Appeal, filed by Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc., Cambridge University Press. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 12-14676-FF; 12-15147-EE. Appeal Record due by 5/6/2013. (fem)
April 25, 2013 479 Featured Case ORDER of USCA GRANTING appellants' motion for extension of time to file its reply brief, up to and including May 20, 2013. USCA Case No. 12-14676-FF; 12-15147-FF. (fem) Modified on 4/25/2013 to modify docket text.(fem).
December 18, 2012 478 Certified copy of ORDER of USCA DENYING Defendants-appellees's motion to dismiss for lack of Subject matter; GRANTING defendants-appellees' alternative motion to consolidate appeal 12-14676-FF with Appeal No. 12-15147-FF re: 449 Notice of Appeal, filed by Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc., Cambridge University Press, 465 Notice of Appeal, filed by Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc., Cambridge University Press Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 12-14676-FF. (fem)
November 21, 2012 477 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. of Withdrawing Exhibits (Rains, John)
November 20, 2012 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, 449 Notice of Appeal, 465 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 12-14676-FF; 12-15147-EE. The record on appeal is available electronically with the exception of: Exhibits 476 (8 Boxes); Exhibit 122 (1 book) with 171 Deposition. (fem) Modified on 12/19/2012 to correct docket text.(fem).
November 8, 2012 476 EXHIBITS received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in Exhibit room. Exhibits are from Bench Trial held May 17, 2011. (anc)
October 26, 2012 Wire Received and Deposited per Order: $ 3,271,275.00 (anc)
October 24, 2012 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Ashby re 474 and 475 Orders (anc) Modified on 10/24/2012 (anc).
October 23, 2012 475 Featured Case ORDER AUTHORIZING WIRE TRANSFER directing the the Clerk of the Court accept on behalf of Plaintiffs the sum of $3,271,275 to be wire transferred for deposit in the Commercial Registry of the Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 10/22/2012. (anc)
October 23, 2012 474 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 473 Motion to Stay Execution of the Judgment Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pending Appeal. IT IS ORDERED that stay of execution of the portion of the Judgment awarding Defendants attorneys' fees and costs pending appeal is conditioned on Plaintiffs depositing $3,271,275 in the Commercial Registry of the Northern District of Georgia within two business days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 10/22/2012. (anc)
October 18, 2012 473 MOTION to Stay Execution of the Judgment Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pending Appeal, Notice of Unopposed Bond Amount with Brief In Support by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay of Execution of the Judgment Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pending Appeal, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Authorizing Wire Transfer)(Rains, John)
October 18, 2012 472 Court Reporter notification that transcripts have been filed in District Court re 465 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Montrell Vann (fem)
October 17, 2012 471 Court Reporter notification that transcripts are on file re 465 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Andy Ashley (fem) Modified on 10/18/2012 (fem).
October 15, 2012 470 USCA Acknowledgment of 465 Notice of Appeal, filed by Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc., Cambridge University Press. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 12-15147-F (fem)
October 15, 2012 469 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re 465 Notice of Appeal. (Rains, John) All transcripts are on file. Modified on 10/15/2012 (fem).
October 5, 2012 468 Court Reporter Notification that transcript has been filed in District Court re 465 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Montrell Vann (fem)
October 5, 2012 467 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/14/2012, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Montrell Vann, Telephone number 404-215-1549. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Notice of Transcript Filing) (mv)
October 3, 2012 466 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 465 Notice of Appeal, (fem)
October 2, 2012 465 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 463 Clerk's Judgment,,,,,,,,, 462 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,,,, by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E-4186479. Transcript Order Form due on 10/16/2012 (Rains, John)
October 1, 2012 464 AO 121 form completed and sent to Copyright Office with copy of judgment (anc)
October 1, 2012 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Ashby re 463 Clerk's Judgment, 462 Order, 461 Order (anc)
September 30, 2012 Civil Case Terminated. (anc)
September 30, 2012 463 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered awarding Defendants, as prevailing parties, their reasonable attorneys' fee in the amount of $2,861,348.71 and costs in the amount of $85,746.39. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Oxford University Press, Inc. on its claim that Defendants infringed its copyright in The Power Elite. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Sage Publications, Inc. on its claims that Defendants infringed its copyrights in The Sage Handbook of Qualitative Research (Second Edition), The Sage Handbook of Qualitative Research (Third Edition) and Utilization-Focused Evaluation: The New Century Text (Third Edition). As to all of Plaintiffs' other claimed copyright infringements, as are referenced in the Court's Order of May 11, 2012, judgment is entered in Defendants' favor. Injunctive relief is entered as follows: Defendants are hereby ORDERED and DIRECTED to maintain copyright policies for Georgia State University which are not inconsistent with the Court's Orders of May 11, 2012 and August 10, 2012. Defendants are ORDERED and DIRECTED to disseminate to faculty and relevant staff at Georgia State the essential points of this Court's aforesaid rulings. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing these Orders. Declaratory relief is entered as follows: (1) The requirement that excerpts be "decidedly small" to tip factorthree in Defendants' favor applies to the aggregate of all excerpts from a book which areassigned during the term of the course; (2) The holdings of this case do not apply to booksintended solely for instruction of students enrolled in a class. These books would need to beevaluated by a different fair use analysis; (3) The fair use protection outlined in the Court'sOrder of May 11, 2012 is conditioned on strict reliance with measures calculated to protect copyright of excerpts from unwarranted distribution; (4) Although in limited fact situations fair use may apply even where an unpaid excerpt is not "decidedly small", as explained in the Order of August 10, 2012, significant caution is called for before determining that such a use is fair use. (anc)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
September 30, 2012 462 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 455 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Detailed Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 505, the Court awards Defendants $2,861,348.71 in attorneys' fees and $85,746.39 in costs. The Court finds there are no remaining issues to be decided. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter final judgment, as follows: Plaintiff Oxford University Press, Inc. shall have judgment in its favor on its claim that Defendants infringed its copyright in The Power Elite. Plaintiff Sage Publications, Inc. shall have judgment in its favor on its claims that Defendant infringed its copyrights in The Sage Handbook of Qualitative Research (Second Edition), The Sage Handbook of Qualitative Research (Third Edition) and Utilization-Focused Evaluation: The New Century Text (Third Edition). As to all of Plaintiffs' other claimed copyright infringements, as are referenced in the Court's Order of May 11, 2012, judgment shall be entered in Defendants' favor. Injunctive relief is entered as follows: Defendants are hereby ORDERED and DIRECTED to maintain copyright policies for Georgia State University which are not inconsistent with the Court's Orders of May 11, 2012 and August 10, 2012. Defendants are ORDERED and DIRECTED to disseminate to faculty and relevant staff at Georgia State the essential points of this Court's aforesaid rulings. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing these Orders. Declaratory relief is entered as follows: (1) The requirement that excerpts be "decidedly small" to tip factor three in Defendants' favor applies to the aggregate of all excerpts from a book which are assigned during the term of the course; (2) The holdings of this case do not apply to books intended solely for instruction of students enrolled in a class. These books would need to be evaluated by a different fair use analysis. (3) The fair use protection outlined in the Court's Order of May 11, 2012 is conditioned on strict reliance with measures calculated to protect copyright of excerpts from unwarranted distribution. (4) Although in limited fact situations fair use may apply even where an unpaid excerpt is not "decidedly small", as explained in the Order of August 10, 2012, significant caution is called for before determining that such a use is fair use. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 9/30/2012. (anc)
September 30, 2012 461 Featured Case ORDER DENYING the 459 Motion to Join Parties. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 9/30/2012. (anc)
September 28, 2012 459 Consent MOTION for Joinder by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rains, John)
September 28, 2012 Submission of 455 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Detailed Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (anc)
September 27, 2012 458 RESPONSE in Opposition re 455 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Detailed Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John)
September 26, 2012 460 Court Reporter notification that transcripts have been filed in District Court as to Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. re 449 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Andy Ashley (fem)
September 26, 2012 457 USCA Acknowledgment of 449 Notice of Appeal, filed by Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc., Cambridge University Press. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 12-14676-FF. (fem)
September 24, 2012 456 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re 449 Notice of Appeal. All necessary transcripts are on file. (Rains, John) Modified on 9/25/2012 (fem).
September 17, 2012 455 FILED UNDER SEAL MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Detailed Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costsby J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (anc) Modified on 9/17/2012 (anc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2012: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2) (anc).
September 17, 2012 454 NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal of Motion for Leave to Supplement the Detailed Request for Attorneys' Fees by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Askew, Anthony) Modified on 9/18/2012 in order to update docket text (anc).
September 17, 2012 Submission of 441 Order, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (anc)
September 11, 2012 453 NOTICE Of Filing of Defendants' Third Supplemental Statement to Defendants' 444 Detailed Request for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Other Costs by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Nancy Seamans, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Askew, Anthony) Modified on 9/12/2012 in order to correct document link (anc).
September 11, 2012 452 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 449 Notice of Appeal, (fem)
September 10, 2012 451 FILED UNDER SEAL OBJECTIONS to Defendants' 444 Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (anc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2012: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5) (anc).
September 10, 2012 450 NOTICE Of Filing UNDER SEAL of Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Request for Attorneys Fees and Costs by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John) Modified on 9/11/2012 in order to update docket text (anc).
September 10, 2012 449 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 441 Order, Set Submission Deadline, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E-4144347. Transcript Order Form due on 9/24/2012 (Rains, John)
September 7, 2012 448 FILED UNDER SEAL Second Supplemental Statement to Defendants' Detailed Request for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Other Costs re 441 Order filed by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (anc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2012: # 1 Exhibit A) (anc). Modified on 9/7/2012 (anc).
September 7, 2012 447 NOTICE Of Filing UNDER SEAL of Defendants' Second Supplemental Statement to Defendants' Detailed Request for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Other Costs by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Askew, Anthony)
September 6, 2012 446 FILED UNDER SEAL Supplemental Statement to Defendants' Detailed Request for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Other Costs re 441 Order filed by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (anc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2012: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, part C-1, # 3 Exhibit 1, part C - 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 part 1, # 6 Exhibit 3, part 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, part 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5) (anc). Modified on 9/6/2012 (anc).
September 6, 2012 445 NOTICE Of Filing UNDER SEAL of Defendants' Supplemental Statement to Defendants' Detailed Request for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Other Costs and Exhibits 1-5 by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Kristen Lynn, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Askew, Anthony)
August 24, 2012 444 FILED UNDER SEAL Memorandum in Support for an Award of Attorneys' Fees re 441 Order filed by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (jtj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2012: # 1 Memorandum Part 2, # 2 Memorandum Part 3, # 3 Memorandum Part 4, # 4 Memorandum Part 5, # 5 Exhibit B Part 1, # 6 Exhibit B Part 2, # 7 Exhibit B Part 3, # 8 Exhibit B Part 4, # 9 Exhibit 2 Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 2 Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 2 Part 3, # 12 Exhibit 3) (jtj).
August 24, 2012 443 NOTICE Of Filing of Exhibit 4 in Support of Defendants Memorandum in Support of Detailed Request for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Askew, Anthony)
August 24, 2012 442 NOTICE Of Filing UNDER SEAL of the Memorandum in Support of Detailed Request for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Exhibits 1-3 and 5-7 by Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Askew, Anthony)
August 10, 2012 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Ashby re 441 Order (anc)
August 10, 2012 441 Featured Case ORDER that Defendants are hereby ORDERED AND DIRECTED to maintain copyright policies for Georgia State University which are not inconsistent with the Court's 423 Order of May 11, 2012 and this Order. Defendants are also ORDERED AND DIRECTED to disseminate to faculty and relevant staff at Georgia State the essential points of this Court's rulings. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing these Orders. The Court exercises its discretion to award to Defendants their reasonable attorneys' fees. Other costs will also be taxed in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs to the extent permitted by statute. Defendants are DIRECTED to file a detailed request for an award of attorneys' fees and other costs no later than August 24, 2012. Plaintiffs may file any objections no later than September 10, 2012. The parties are encouraged to confer to determine if objections can be mutually resolved, either in whole or in part. A hearing to resolve objections is hereby set for September 14, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit the file on September 11, 2012. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 8/10/2012. (anc)
July 10, 2012 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Ashby re 439 Order (anc)
July 10, 2012 440 SUR-REPLY to 426 Post-Trial Proposed Declaratory Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(anc)
July 10, 2012 439 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 438 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Injunctive Relief. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Sur-Reply attached as Exhibit A to the Motion. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 7/10/2012. (anc)
July 5, 2012 438 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Injunctive Relief by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Defendants' Sur Reply, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Defendants' Sur Reply, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Defendants' Sur Reply, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Defendants' Sur Reply)(Schaetzel, Stephen)
June 29, 2012 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Ashby 437 Order (anc)
June 29, 2012 437 Featured Case ORDER on Court's 431 Order to Show Cause, Counsel for Defendants, Kristen A. Swift, shall not be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 6/28/2012. (anc)
June 25, 2012 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Ashby re 436 Reply (anc)
June 22, 2012 436 REPLY to the 426 Post-Trial Proposed Declaratory Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(anc)
June 22, 2012 435 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 434 Motion for Leave to File Reply. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Reply, attached as Exhibit A to the Motion. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 6/22/2012. (anc)
June 21, 2012 434 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Reply Brief)(Rains, John)
June 21, 2012 433 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 431 Order to Show Cause, filed by Kristen Lynn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Lynn, Kristen)
June 18, 2012 Submission of 423 Order, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (anc)
June 15, 2012 432 RESPONSE re 426 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Post-Trial Proposed Declaratory Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by J. L. Albert, C. Dean Alford, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Askew, Anthony) Modified on 6/21/2012 in order to update docket text (anc).
June 14, 2012 431 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order that, having been suspended from the bar of this court by order of Hon. Timothy C. Batten, Sr., on November 22, 2011, counsel for the defendants, Kristen A. Swift, show cause in writing within 10 days of date of entry of this order why the Clerk should not strike her name as counsel of record from the docket. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 6/13/2012. (anc)
June 14, 2012 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Ashby re 430 and 431 Orders (anc) Modified on 6/14/2012 in order to update docket text (anc).
June 13, 2012 430 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 428 Motion to Maintain Certain Trial Exhibits Under Seal at the Conclusion of this action. See Order for specific exhibits. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 6/13/2012. (anc)
June 12, 2012 429 PROPOSED ORDER re: 428 MOTION To Maintain Certain Trial Exhibits Under Seal . (Rains, John)
June 8, 2012 428 MOTION To Maintain Certain Trial Exhibits Under Seal by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John)
June 5, 2012 427 NOTICE of Automatic Substitution of Defendant C. Dean Alford in his official capacity as member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia in place of Wanda Yancey Rodwell by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John) Modified on 6/7/2012 in order to update docket text (anc).
May 31, 2012 426 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Post-Trial Proposed Declaratory Judgment and Permanent Injunction re 423 Order filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rains, John) Modified on 6/1/2012 in order to update docket text (anc).
May 25, 2012 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Ashby re 425 Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney (anc)
May 24, 2012 425 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 424 Motion to Withdraw Attorney. Attorney Courtney Suzanne Werner terminated as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/24/2012. (anc)
May 21, 2012 424 MOTION to Withdraw Courtney Suzanne Werner as Attorneyby J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Werner, Courtney)
May 11, 2012 Clerks Certificate of Mailing Laura Elisabeth Ashby re 423 Order (anc)
May 11, 2012 423 Featured Case ORDER with Court's Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law following non-jury trial. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file, within twenty (20) days of entry of this Order, the proposed text of any injunctive and declaratory relief they seek, together with the rationale supporting their request. Alternative proposals are acceptable. Defendants may state their opposition, if any, and may propose one or more alternative orders, within fifteen (15) days after Plaintiffs' filing. If Defendants object to Plaintiffs' proposal(s) or if Defendants suggest one or more alternative order(s), the rationale shall be stated. These filings shall not exceed thirty (30) pages each. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-submit the file thirty six (36) days after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/11/2012. (anc)
May 3, 2012 422 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 24, 2012 through August 13, 2012, by Edward Bryan Krugman. (Krugman, Edward)
December 8, 2011 421 Defendant's Exhibit List by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr.. (anc)
December 8, 2011 420 Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc... (anc)
December 8, 2011 419 Joint Exhibit List by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Cambridge University Press, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Oxford University Press, Inc., Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Sage Publications, Inc., Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr.. (anc)
October 18, 2011 418 NOTICE of Change of Address for Matthew P. Warenzak, counsel for J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Warenzak, Matthew)
September 21, 2011 417 NOTICE of the DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TRIAL TESTIMONY OF PROFESSOR JENNIFER MCCOY re 395 Transcript by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr , (Schaetzel, Stephen) Modified on 9/22/2011 to correct docket text. (jtj)
August 1, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Gary re 416 Order (ank)
August 1, 2011 416 Featured Case ORDER that the 413 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The time for all parties to file response briefing to proposed post-trial findings of fact and conclusions of law is extended until 6 pm Eastern Standard Time, Saturday, July 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 8/1/2011. (ank)
July 30, 2011 415 RESPONSE re 409 Proposed Findings of Fact, and Conclusions of Law filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Schaetzel, Stephen)
July 30, 2011 414 RESPONSE to 411 Proposed Conclusions of Law and 410 Proposed Findings of Fact, filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John) Modified on 8/1/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
July 29, 2011 413 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Briefing on Proposed Post Trial Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re: 409 Proposed Findings of Fact, 412 Proposed Findings of Fact, 411 Proposed Order, 392 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 410 Proposed Findings of Fact, by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Schaetzel, Stephen)
July 22, 2011 412 FILED UNDER SEAL Executive Summary and Plaintiffs' Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2011: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D, # 5 Appendix E) (ank). Modified on 7/25/2011 (ank). (verified by rvb on 7/25/2011)
July 22, 2011 411 Proposed Conclusions of Law re: 410 Proposed Findings of Fact. (Schaetzel, Stephen) Modified on 7/26/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
July 22, 2011 410 Proposed Findings of Fact by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Schaetzel, Stephen)
July 22, 2011 409 Proposed Findings of Fact by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Redacted, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D, # 5 Appendix E, # 6 Brief Plaintiffs' Post-Trial Conclusions of Law)(Rains, John)
July 22, 2011 408 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Manual Filing Under Seal by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
July 14, 2011 407 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 27, 2011, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem)
July 14, 2011 406 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 26, 2011, (Volume 8, Bench trial) before Judge Orinda Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem)
July 14, 2011 405 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 25, 2011, Volume 7, Bench Trial, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem)
July 14, 2011 404 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 24, 2011, Volume 6, Bench Trial, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem)
July 14, 2011 403 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 23, 2011, (Volume 5, Bench Trial) before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem)
July 14, 2011 400 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 18, 2011, (Volume 2, Bench Trial) before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem)
July 14, 2011 399 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 17, 2011, (Volume 1, Bench Trial) before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem)
July 14, 2011 398 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/7/11, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber D Bull, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 notice of filing transcript) (dxj)
July 14, 2011 397 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/6/11, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber D Bull, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 notice of filing transcript) (dxj)
July 14, 2011 396 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/3/11, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber D Bull, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 notice of filing transcript) (dxj)
July 14, 2011 395 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/2/11, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber D Bull, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 notice of filing transcript) (dxj)
July 14, 2011 394 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/1/11, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber D Bull, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 notice of filing transcript) (dxj)
July 14, 2011 393 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 31, 2011, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber D Bull, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 notice of filing transcript) (dxj)
July 12, 2011 402 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 20, 2011, (Volume 4, Bench Trial) before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem)
July 12, 2011 401 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 19, 2011, (Volume 3, Bench Trial) before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem)
July 11, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Gary re 392 Order (ank)
July 11, 2011 392 Featured Case ORDER that the 391 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The time for all parties to file post-trial findings of fact and conclusions of law is extended for one week, until and including July 22, 2011. The time for all parties to file any response is correspondingly extended until and including July 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 7/11/2011. (ank)
July 10, 2011 391 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Post Trial Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law with Brief In Support by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Schaetzel, Stephen)
June 7, 2011 390 DEPOSITION of DAPHNE GREENBERG, PH.D. taken on APRIL 21, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
June 7, 2011 389 DEPOSITION of DENIS CHARLES GAINTY, PH.D., with Errata taken on APRIL 20, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
June 7, 2011 388 FILED UNDER SEAL DEPOSITION of DEBRA MARINIELLO taken on JUNE 30, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2011: # 1 word index, # 2 Errata) (ank). Modified on 6/8/2011 (ank).
June 7, 2011 385 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial concluded on 6/7/2011. Deposition of Debra Mariniello, taken June 30, 2009 and Errata Pages from the Deposition, filed. Videotape Deposition of Daphne Greenberg, Ph.D.taken April 21, 2011, filed. Videotaped deposition of Denis Charles Gainty, PhD. taken April 20, 2011, filed. Amended videotaped deposition of Denis Charles Gainty, Ph.D., taken April 20, 2011, filed. Closing arguments of counsel. Proposed Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law shall be filed no later than July 15, 2011. Reply briefs shall be filed no later than July 22, 2011. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Debra Bull)(ank)
June 7, 2011 384 RESPONSE to 361 Plaintiffs' Revised List of Works at Issue filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bates, Mary) Modified on 6/8/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
June 7, 2011 383 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Introducing Deposition Testimony (Rains, John)
June 7, 2011 382 Notice of Introducing Deposition Testimony - Mariniello Excerpts by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Schaetzel, Stephen) Modified on 6/8/2011 in order to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ank).
June 7, 2011 381 Notice of Introducing Deposition Testimony- Greenberg Excerpts by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Schaetzel, Stephen) Modified on 6/8/2011 in order to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ank).
June 7, 2011 380 Notice of Introducing Deposition Testimony - Gainty Excerpts by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Schaetzel, Stephen) Modified on 6/8/2011 in order to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ank).
June 6, 2011 379 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 6/6/2011. Defendants evidence continues: 15) Kenneth D. Crews, continues;P-1014, D-911, 325, ADMITTED; D-313 and 331, REJECTED; 16)William Potter sworn; D-130, 132, 129, 128, P-1004, ADMITTED;D-497, 501, 504, 505, 518, 513, ADMITTED; D-490, 495, 496,REJECTED; D-335, 545, 610, 532, 765, and 1, Defendants rest.ADMITTED; P-509, 1015, ADMITTED. Plaintiffs rebuttal, completed. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 2:00 p.m.,June 7, 2011. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Debra Bull)(ank)
June 3, 2011 378 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 6/3/2011. Defendants evidence continues: 15) Kenneth D. Crews, continues;D-320 and P-1012, ADMITTED. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:30 a.m.,June 6, 2011. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerk's Office. (Court Reporter Debra Bull)(ank)
June 2, 2011 377 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 6/2/2011. Defendants evidence continues: 11.) Deborah Mariniello, by deposition, cont., D-14, 69, 65, 66, 67, 78, ADMITTED; 12) Jennifer McCoy, by deposition; D-381, 383, 384, 385, 386, 387, ADMITTED; 13) Daphne Greenberg, by deposition; D-464, 605, 909, 740, ADMITTED; previously admitted Defendants exhibits 381, 383, 387, struck as duplicative; D-528, ADMITTED; 14) Nancy Seamans, sworn; D-145, 520, ADMITTED; 15) Kenneth D. Crews, sworn; D- 910, ADMITTED. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:30 a.m.,June 3, 2011. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Debra Bull)(ank)
June 2, 2011 376 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Warenzak on behalf of J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Warenzak, Matthew)
June 2, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Gary re 375 Order Allowing Audio/Visual Equipment in the Courtroom (ank)
June 2, 2011 375 Featured Case ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM. This Court's 293 order dated May 9, 2011 allowing audio visual/computer equipment to be brought to Courtroom 1908 and this Court's 307 order dated May 12, 2011 allowing named individuals to bring cell phones and other personal electronic devices to Courtroom 1908 that was in effect until June 6, 2011 are hereby extended to be in effect through MONDAY, JUNE 13, 2011. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 6/2/2011. (ank)
June 1, 2011 374 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 6/1/2011. Defendants evidence continues: 8) John Murphy, conts.; D-808, P-1011, 1005, ADMITTED; 9) John Stewart Duffield, sworn; D-503, ADMITTED; 10) Laura Burtle, sworn; 11) Deborah Mariniello, by deposition. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:30 a.m.,June 2, 2011. (Court Reporter Debra Bull)(ank)
June 1, 2011 373 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. of Introducing Deposition Testimony (Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 372 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Part 4 of Exhibit 705 and Exhibit 710 to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of the Admission of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 4 of 705, # 2 Exhibit 710)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 371 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Part 2 and Part 3 of Exhibit 705 to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of the Admission of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 2 of 705, # 2 Exhibit Part 3 of 705)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 370 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Part 3 of Exhibit 704 and Part 1 of Exhibit 705 to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of the Admission of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 3 of 704, # 2 Exhibit Part 1 of 705)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 369 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Part 1 and 2 of Ehxibit 704 to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of the Admission of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 704, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 704)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 368 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Part 3 and 4 of Exhibit 703 to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of the Admission of Plaitniffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 3 of 703, # 2 Exhibit Part 4 of 703)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 367 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Part 1 and 2 of Exhibit 703 to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of the Admission of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 703, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 703)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 366 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Part 3 and 4 to Exhibit 702 to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of the Admission of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 3 of 702, # 2 Exhibit Part 4 of 702)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 365 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Part 1 and 2 of Exhibit 702 to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of the Admission of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 702, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 702)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 364 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Part 3 and 4 of Exhibit 701 to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of the Admission of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 3 of 701, # 2 Exhibit Part 4 of 701)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 363 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Exhibit 701, Parts 1 and 2 to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of Admission of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 701, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 701)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 362 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Proffer in Support of The Admission of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits 700 - 705 and 710 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 700, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 700)(Rains, John)
June 1, 2011 361 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Revised Filing Concerning Plaintiff Works Alleged to be Infringed at GSU During the 2009 Maymester, Summer 2009, and Fall 2009 Academic Terms (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rains, John)
May 31, 2011 360 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 5/31/2011. Defendants evidence continues: 7) Anne Kruger, sworn; D-514, ADMITTED; 8) John Murphy, sworn; D-788, 538, ADMITTED. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:30 a.m., June 1, 2011. (Court Reporter Debra Bull)(ank)
May 30, 2011 358 NOTICE by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Cambridge University Press, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Oxford University Press, Inc., Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Sage Publications, Inc., Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker Joint Notice of Introducing Deposition Testimony of Mark P. Becker (Rains, John)
May 27, 2011 359 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 5/27/2011. Defendants evidence continues: 2) Janet Gabler-Hover, continues; D-213, ADMITTED; 3) Melinda Hartwig, sworn; D-436, 509, ADMITTED; 4) Patricia Dixon, sworn; D-749, 140, 428, 429, 347, 348 and 346, ADMITTED; 5) Denis Gainty, by deposition (portions); 6) Margaret Moloney, sworn; D-773, 519, ADMITTED. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 11:00a.m., May 31, 2011. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerk's Office. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ank)
May 26, 2011 387 FILED UNDER SEAL DEPOSITION of MARK BECKER, PH.D. taken on APRIL 22, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2011: # 1 word index) (ank). Modified on 6/8/2011 (ank).
May 26, 2011 357 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 5/26/2011. Plaintiffs evidence continues: 15) Mark Becker, by deposition; P-970, 971, 972, 973,974, and 1002, 27, 28, 233, 342, 436, ADMITTED; P-322, 343 and 509, DEFERRED;P-522, 528, 530, 533 thru 537, 539, 540, 542, 545, 549 thru 550, 553 thru 555, 557thru 558, 563, 570, 592, 597 thru 603, 606, 608 613 656 thru 662, ADMITTED;P-700 thru 705 and 710, REJECTED; P-733, 869, 871, 872, 877, 885 thru 886, 896,899 thru 901, 904, 906, 907, 913, 914, ADMITTED; P-931, 932, DEFERRED; P-938,941, 942, 946, 947, 949, 950 thru 955, 957, 959, 960, 965, 977 thru 979 and D-195, ADMITTED; Plaintiffs rest. Defendants renewed motion to dismiss, DENIED.Defendants Motion for Directed Verdict, Granted in Part, as to the contributoryinfringement claim. Defendants evidence: Deposition of Mark Becker, filed UNDERSEAL; 1) Charles R. Hankla, sworn; P-950, D-623, 776, 480, 777, 481, ADMITTED;2) Janet Gabler-Hover, sworn; D-599, ADMITTED. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:30 a.m., May 27,2011. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ank)
May 26, 2011 355 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Of Introducing Deposition Testimony (Rains, John)
May 25, 2011 356 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 5/25/2011. Plaintiffs' evidence continues: 11) YouJin Kim, continues; 12) Nathaniel Leo Orr, sworn; P-523, 524 and D-521, ADMITTED; 13) Marni Ellen Davis, sworn; P-512, D-769, 473, 474, P-944, 945, ADMITTED; 14) Patricia Dixon, by deposition. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:30 a.m., May 26,2011. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ank)
May 25, 2011 354 TRIAL BRIEF on Eleventh Amendment Immunity Issues by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Quicker, Katrina)
May 24, 2011 353 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 5/24/2011. Plaintiffs evidence continues: 9) Jodi Kaufmann, conts., P-626, 586, ADMITTED; P-626 STRUCK; P-975, Joint 1, 2 and 3 ADMITTED; P-675, 758, 763, 764, 776, ADMITTED; 10) Jennifer Esposito, sworn; P-547, D-739, P-513, P-564, 565, 566, 567, 639, 643, ADMITTED; 11) You Jin Kim, sworn; P-519, 34, 595, 596, 647, 648, 654, 655, 649 thru 653, ADMITTED. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:30 a.m., May 25,2011. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ank)
May 24, 2011 352 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Evidentiary Proffer in Support of the Trial Testimony of Jodi Kaufmann (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 806, # 2 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 804, # 3 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 723, # 4 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 803, # 5 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 995, # 6 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 996, # 7 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 997, # 8 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 998, # 9 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 999, # 10 Exhibit Trial Exhibit 710A)(Krugman, Edward)
May 23, 2011 351 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 5/23/2011. Plaintiffs evidence continues: 7) Paula Christopher, sworn; P-858, ADMITTED; 8) James D. Palmour, by deposition; 9) Jodi Kaufmann, sworn; P-517, 518, 571 thru 585,587 thru 591, 593, 594, 625, 628, 629 and D-512. Joint-4, ADMITTED. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 11:00 a.m., May 24, 2011. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ank)
May 23, 2011 350 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. of Introducing Deposition Testimony of Nancy Seamans (Rains, John)
May 23, 2011 349 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. of Introducing Deposition Testimony of James D. Palmour (Rains, John)
May 20, 2011 348 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 5/20/2011. Plaintiffs evidence continues: P-993, ADMITTED; 4) Tracey Armstrong, sworn; P 3,4,346, 347, ADMITTED; D-68, 66, 67, 906. ADMITTED; 5) Nancy Seamans, by deposition, P-748, 749 and 752, ADMITTED; 6) Marjorie Denise Dimsdale, sworn; D-160,510,515,522,524, ADMITTED. Hearing not concluded, Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:30 a.m. May 23, 2011. Exhibits retained by tHe Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ank)
May 19, 2011 347 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 5/19/2011. Plaintiffs evidence continues: 2) Carol Richmond, continues; P-323 ADMIITTED;P-47,48, 134, 135, 136, ADMITTED; 3) Niko Pfund, sworn; P-460,368,ADMITTED; P-448, 344, 345, 349, 351, 353 thru 362, 366, 367,369 thru 374, 388thru 391, 393, 394, 406 thru 409, 418 thru 426, 432, 437,438, 441 thru 450, 455, 451,456,457,461 thru 463, 467 thru 480, 452, 453, 427, 428, 433, 434, 435, 458 and459, ADMITTED; P-468 thru 472 and 474 thru 476, WITHDRAWN; P-350, 352, 375, 454, 486 and 487, ADMITTED; P-378, REJECTED at this time. Hearing not concluded, Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9;30 a.m., May 20,2011. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ank)
May 18, 2011 346 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial continued on 5/18/2011. Plaintiffs evidence continues: 1) Frank Smith, conts. D-723, ADMITTED; P-I, 2, 184 and D-70 and 89, ADMITTED; 2) Carol Richman, sworn; P-198, 199,200,201, 202, 203, 204, 205, 206, 207, 208, 209, 210, 211, 212, 213, 214, 215, 216, 217, 218, 219, 220, 221, 222, 223, 224, 226, 227, 228, 229, 230, 231, 232, 234, 235, 236, 237, 238, 239, 240, 241, 242, 243, 244, 245, 246, 247, 248, 251, 252, 253, 254, 255, 256, 257, 258, 259, 260, 261, 262, 263, 264, 265, 267, 268, 269, 270, 271, 272, 273, 274, 275, 276, 277, 278, 279, 280, 281, 282, 283, 284, 285, 286, 287, 288, 289, 290, 291,292, 293, 294, 295, 296, 297, 298, 299, 300, 302, 303, 304, 305, 306, 307, 308, 309, 311, 312, 313, 314, 315, 316, 317, 318, 319, 320, 321, 324, 516, ADMITTED. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:30 a.m., May 19, 2011. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ank)
May 17, 2011 345 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Bench Trial begun on 5/17/2011. Opening statements. Plaintiffs evidence: 1) Frank Smith, sworn: Attachment E ofthe PTO, ADMITTED. 1-5, ADMITTED; P-85, 86, 87, 15, 16, 17, 29, 30, 31, 24, 25,26, 20, 21, 22, 35, 36, 125, 126, 127, 44, 45, 46, 39, 40, 41, 108, 109, 110, 111, 103, 104, 105, 142, 143, 144, 145, 119, 120, 121, 122, 79, 80, 81, 82, 147, 148, 149, 150, 151, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12,13, 138, 139, 140, 114, 115, 116, 100, 101, 90, 91, 92, 130, 131, 132, 65, 66, 67, 68, 75, 76, 77, 53, 54, 55, 56, 88, 89, 18, 19, 32, 33, 23, 37, 38, 128, 129, 42, 43, 112, 113, 106, 107, 146, 123, 124, 83, 84, 152, 153, 13, 14, 141, 117, l18, 137, 102, 93, 94, 133, 69, 70, 78, 57, 58, ADMITTED. Defendant's 111, ADMITTED, Deposition of Frank Smith, filed. Hearing not concluded. Court adjourned and will reconvene at 9:30 AM, may 18, 2011. Exhibits retained bythe Court to be forwarded to the Clerk's Office. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ank)
May 17, 2011 344 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 04-01 as to Richard William Miller re 343 Conclusions of Law and 342 Findings of Fact (ank)
May 17, 2011 343 Conclusions of Law by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents, # 2 Conclusions of Law, # 3 Maymester 2009, # 4 Summer 2009, # 5 Fall 2009)(ank)
May 17, 2011 342 Findings of Fact by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents, # 2 Findings of Fact, # 3 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Anggoro, # 4 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Barker, # 5 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Danis, # 6 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Davis, # 7 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Dixon, # 8 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Duffield, # 9 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Esposito, # 10 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Gabler-Hover, # 11 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Gainty, # 12 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Greenberg, # 13 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Hankla, # 14 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Hartwig, # 15 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Harvey, # 16 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Kaufmann, # 17 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Kim, # 18 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Kruger, # 19 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Lasner, # 20 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Lloyd, # 21 Alleged Copyright Infringement - McCombie, # 22 Alleged Copyright Infringement - McCoy, # 23 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Moloney, # 24 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Murphy, # 25 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Ohmer, # 26 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Orr, # 27 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Freeman, # 28 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Perkins, # 29 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Ruprecht, # 30 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Thompson, # 31 Alleged Copyright Infringement - Whitten)(ank)
May 17, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Gary re 341 Order (ank)
May 17, 2011 341 Featured Case ORDER that the 308 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/16/2011. (ank)
May 17, 2011 340 FILED UNDER SEAL Proposed Findings of Fact by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (ank) Modified on 5/17/2011 (ank). (verified by rvb on 5/17/2011)
May 17, 2011 339 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Plaintiffs' Objections To Defendants' Deposition Designations And Counter-Designations (Rains, John)
May 17, 2011 338 Proposed Conclusions of Law by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John) Modified on 5/17/2011 in order to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ank).
May 17, 2011 337 Proposed Findings of Fact by Sage Publications, Inc., Oxford University Press, Inc. and Cambridge University Press. (Rains, John) Modified on 5/17/2011 in order to add filers (ank).
May 17, 2011 336 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Of Manual Filing Under Seal [Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings Of Fact] (Rains, John)
May 17, 2011 335 NOTICE Of Filing Discovery Responses by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Amended And Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set Of Interrogatories To Defendants)(Rains, John)
May 17, 2011 334 DEPOSITION of Louis A. Ruprecht, Jr., Ph.D. taken on April 21, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Dixon 2 (Previously Marked))(Rains, John)
May 17, 2011 333 DEPOSITION of Karen Petruska taken on April 14, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Dixon 2 (Previously Marked))(Rains, John)
May 17, 2011 332 DEPOSITION of N. Lee Orr, Ph.D. taken on February 4, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P-1, # 2 Exhibit P-2, # 3 Exhibit P-3, # 4 Exhibit P-4, # 5 Exhibit P-5, # 6 Exhibit P-6, # 7 Exhibit P-7, # 8 Exhibit P-8, # 9 Exhibit P-9, # 10 Exhibit P-10, # 11 Exhibit P-11, # 12 Exhibit P-12, # 13 Exhibit P-13, # 14 Exhibit P-14, # 15 Exhibit P-15, # 16 Exhibit P-16, # 17 Exhibit Dixon 2 (Previously Marked))(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 331 DEPOSITION of John M. Murphy taken on April 22, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 330 DEPOSITION of Margaret F. Moloney taken on April 15, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Dixson 2 (Previously Marked), # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 329 DEPOSITION of Jennifer McCoy taken on February 3, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P-1, # 2 Exhibit P-2, # 3 Exhibit P-3, # 4 Exhibit P-4, # 5 Exhibit P-5, # 6 Exhibit P-6, # 7 Exhibit P-7, # 8 Exhibit P-8, # 9 Exhibit Dixon 2 (Previously Marked))(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 328 DEPOSITION of Vincent William Lloyd, Ph.D. taken on April 20, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-1, # 2 Exhibit D-2, # 3 Exhibit D-3, # 4 Exhibit D-4, # 5 Exhibit P-5, # 6 Exhibit P-6, # 7 Exhibit P-7, # 8 Exhibit P-8)(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 327 DEPOSITION of Ann Cale Kruger, Ph.D. taken on April 22, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 326 DEPOSITION of Youjin Kim taken on February 4, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P-1, # 2 Exhibit P-2, # 3 Exhibit P-3, # 4 Exhibit P-4, # 5 Exhibit P-5, # 6 Exhibit P-6, # 7 Exhibit P-7, # 8 Exhibit P-8, # 9 Exhibit P-9, # 10 Exhibit P-10, # 11 Exhibit P-11, # 12 Exhibit P-12, # 13 Exhibit P-13, # 14 Exhibit P-14, # 15 Exhibit P-15, # 16 Exhibit P-16, # 17 Exhibit Dixon 2 (Previously Marked), # 18 Exhibit Seamans 17 (Previously Marked))(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 325 DEPOSITION of Charles Hankla taken on April 20, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 324 DEPOSITION of Daphne Greenberg, Ph.D. taken on April 21, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-1, # 2 Exhibit D-2, # 3 Exhibit D-3 - part1, # 4 Exhibit D-3 - part 2, # 5 Exhibit D-4, # 6 Exhibit D-5, # 7 Exhibit P-1)(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 323 DEPOSITION of Denis Charles Gainty, Ph.D. taken on April 20, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-1, # 2 Exhibit D-2, # 3 Exhibit P-1, # 4 Exhibit P-2, # 5 Exhibit P-3)(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 322 DEPOSITION of Carrie Packwood Freeman taken on April 21, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Palmour 37 (Previously Marked), # 5 Exhibit Dixon 2 (Previously Marked))(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 321 DEPOSITION of Jennifer Esposito taken on February 3, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit 14, # 10 Exhibit 15, # 11 Exhibit 16, # 12 Exhibit 17, # 13 Exhibit 18, # 14 Exhibit 19, # 15 Exhibit 20, # 16 Exhibit Dixon 2 (Previously Marked), # 17 Exhibit Seamans 17 (Previously Marked))(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 320 DEPOSITION of John S. Duffield taken on April 14, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Dixson 2 (Previously Marked))(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 319 DEPOSITION of Patricia Dixon, Ph.D. taken on April 20, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant Ex. 20, # 2 Exhibit Defendant Ex. 21, # 3 Exhibit Defendant Ex. 22, # 4 Exhibit 20, # 5 Exhibit 21, # 6 Exhibit 22 -part 1, # 7 Exhibit 22- part2, # 8 Exhibit Plaintiff Ex. 18, # 9 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 1, # 10 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 2, # 11 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 4, # 12 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 8, # 13 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 10, # 14 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 11, # 15 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 12, # 16 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 14, # 17 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 15, # 18 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 16, # 19 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 17, # 20 Exhibit Previously Marked Plaintiff Ex. 17 - Seamans)(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 318 DEPOSITION of Patricia Dixon taken on February 2, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 18, # 18 Exhibit 19, # 19 Exhibit 17 ( Seamans - previously marked))(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 317 DEPOSITION of Marni Davis taken on April 13, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 316 DEPOSITION of Mark P. Becker, Ph.D. taken on April 22, 2011 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Rains, John)
May 16, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Gary re 315 Order (ank)
May 16, 2011 315 Featured Case ORDER that the 313 Motion for Leave to File to File a Motion in Limine is DENIED, as the Motion in Limine is untimely. This Order does not preclude evidentiary objections at trial. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/16/2011. (ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2011: # 1 Order) (ank).
May 16, 2011 314 RESPONSE re 313 MOTION for Leave to File Motion In Limine To Prevent Plaintiffs From Introducing Improper Expert Testimony filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John)
May 14, 2011 313 MOTION for Leave to File Motion In Limine To Prevent Plaintiffs From Introducing Improper Expert Testimonyby J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Richard)
May 14, 2011 312 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard William Miller on behalf of J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Miller, Richard)
May 13, 2011 311 Featured Case ORDER that the Plaintiffs' 291 Motion to Amend their Trial Exhibit List is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs may amend their trial exhibit list to include the document numbered OUP900003-0UP900005 only, as no party objects to this amendment. Plaintiffs may not amend their trial exhibit list to add any of the other documents Plaintiffs seek to add. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/13/2011. (ank)
May 13, 2011 Submission of 291 MOTION to Amend Trial Exhibit List attached to the 278 Proposed Pretrial Order, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
May 13, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Elisabeth Gary re 310 Order and 311 Order (ank) Modified on 5/13/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
May 12, 2011 310 Featured Case ORDER that the 273 Motion in Limine to Overrule Objections to Evidence of Alleged Infringements is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Defendants' first objection is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Defendants' second objection is DENIED. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Defendants' third objection as to all allegedly infringed works for which Plaintiffs have provided copies of valid copyright registration certificates; for the allegedly infringed works for which copyright registration is still pending, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion to OVerrule Defendants' third objection. The 274 Motion in Limine to Preclude the Admission of Recently Created Fair Use Checklists is DENIED. The Court will allow Defendants to seek to authenticate the documents at trial. The 272 Motion in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence in Accordance with Order of September 30, 2010 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are only permitted to introduce evidence of the alleged infringed works identified in Plaintiffs' August 20, 2010 filing and the parties' March 15, 2011 joint filing. The 277 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Infringement of Improperly-Asserted Copyrights is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may not introduce evidence related to alleged copyright infringement of works for which Plaintiffs have not produced a valid copyright registration certificate. Additionally, Plaintiffs may not introduce evidence related to alleged copyright infringement of works for which Plaintiffs have not provided any admissible evidence to show Plaintiffs' ownership of the copyright for the works. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/12/2011. (ank)
May 12, 2011 309 RESPONSE in Opposition to 291 MOTION to Amend Trial Exhibit List attached to the 278 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Mary) Modified on 5/13/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
May 12, 2011 308 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaetzel, Stephen)
May 12, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Elisabeth Gary re 307 Order (ank)
May 12, 2011 307 Featured Case ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM: Individuals outlined in this Order will be allowed to enter the courthouse with cell phones and other personal electronic devices (including devices that include cameras). Proper identification will be required upon entering the security station on the plaza or lower level. Cell phones and other personal electronic devices will be subject to inspection by the United States Marshal's Service. This order shall be effective until the close of business on Monday, June 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/12/2011. (ank)
May 12, 2011 306 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. of Serving Subpoenas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jodi Kaufman, # 2 Exhibit B - Jennifer Esposito, # 3 Exhibit C - William Potter)(Rains, John)
May 12, 2011 305 NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Exhibit 3 to the 300 Response by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit 3)(Rains, John) Modified on 5/13/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
May 12, 2011 304 REPLY BRIEF re 274 MOTION in Limine To Preclude the Admission of Recently Created Fair Use Checklists filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rains, John)
May 12, 2011 303 NOTICE of Appearance by Natasha Horne Moffitt on behalf of J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Moffitt, Natasha)
May 11, 2011 302 REPLY in Support of 277 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED INFRINGEMENT OF IMPROPERLY-ASSERTED COPYRIGHTS filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr(Schaetzel, Stephen) Modified on 5/12/2011 in order to correct event type and filer information (ank).
May 11, 2011 301 REPLY to Response to Motion re 272 MOTION in Limine IRRELEVANT EVIDENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Errata D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Bates, Mary)
May 11, 2011 300 RESPONSE re 279 Order, Proposed Injunctive Relief filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Rains, John)
May 11, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Elisabeth Gary 299 Order (ank)
May 11, 2011 299 Featured Case ORDER that the 295 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude the Admission of Recently Created Fair Use Checklists is GRANTED. The Court will consider Defendants' corrected brief when the Court rules on Plaintiffs' motion in limine to preclude the admission of recently created fair use checklists. The Court also GRANTS Plaintiffs' request to extend Plaintiffs' time to file their reply brief for Plaintiffs' motion in limine to preclude the admission of recently created fair use checklists only. Plaintiffs shall have until 12:00 p.m. onThursday, May12, 2011 to file a reply brief. All other pending reply briefs inthis case are still due no later than Wednesday, May 11, 2011 at 5:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/11/2011. (ank) Modified on 5/12/2011 in order to correct docket text (ank).
May 11, 2011 298 REPLY BRIEF re 273 MOTION in Limine to Overrule Objections to Evidence of Alleged Infringements filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rains, John)
May 11, 2011 297 NOTICE of Appearance by John Weldon Harbin on behalf of Mark P. Becker (Harbin, John)
May 11, 2011 296 RESPONSE re 295 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Corrected Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine to Preclude the Admission of Recently Created Fair Use Checklists filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John)
May 11, 2011 295 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Corrected Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine to Preclude the Admission of Recently Created Fair Use Checklists with Brief In Support by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Bates, Mary)
May 10, 2011 294 Featured Case ORDER that the Defendants are ORDERED to respond to the Plaintiffs' 291 MOTION to Amend Trial Exhibit List attached to the 278 Proposed Pretrial Order by Thursday, 5/12/2011 at 5:00 PM if they wish to respond. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/10/2011. (ank)
May 10, 2011 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Laura Elisabeth Gary re 293 Order on Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom and 294 Order (ank) Modified on 5/10/2011 in order to add docket text (ank).
May 10, 2011 293 Featured Case ORDER that the 284 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom is GRANTED only for the purpose of the presentation of evidence or the perpetuation of a reoord on FRIDAY, MAY 13,2011 AT 9:30 A.M. This order shall be effective until close of business on MONDAY, JUNE 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/9/2011. (ank)
May 10, 2011 Submission of 274 MOTION in Limine To Preclude the Admission of Recently Created Fair Use Checklists, 272 MOTION in Limine IRRELEVANT EVIDENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 30, 2010, 273 MOTION in Limine to Overrule Objections to Evidence of Alleged Infringements, 277 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED INFRINGEMENT OF IMPROPERLY-ASSERTED COPYRIGHTS, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
May 9, 2011 292 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Niko Pfund in Opposition to Defendants' 277 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED INFRINGEMENT OF IMPROPERLY-ASSERTED COPYRIGHTS (ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2011: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16) (ank). Modified on 5/10/2011 (ank). (verified by rvb on 5/10/11)
May 9, 2011 291 MOTION to Amend Trial Exhibit List attached to the 278 Proposed Pretrial Order by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit G-1)(Rains, John) Modified on 5/10/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
May 9, 2011 290 RESPONSE in Opposition re 274 MOTION in Limine To Preclude the Admission of Recently Created Fair Use Checklists filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bates, Mary)
May 9, 2011 289 RESPONSE in Opposition re 273 MOTION in Limine to Overrule Objections to Evidence of Alleged Infringements filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Mary)
May 9, 2011 288 RESPONSE in Opposition re 277 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED INFRINGEMENT OF IMPROPERLY-ASSERTED COPYRIGHTS filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John)
May 9, 2011 287 RESPONSE in Opposition re 272 MOTION in Limine IRRELEVANT EVIDENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc.. (Rains, John)
May 9, 2011 286 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Niko Pfund in Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine and its attached exhibits - FILED UNDER SEAL by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
May 9, 2011 285 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rains, John)
May 9, 2011 284 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rains, John)
May 6, 2011 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Katherine Bates on behalf of J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Bates, Mary)
May 3, 2011 282 Featured Case ORDER for the Defendants to respond to the Plaintiff's motions in limine by Monday, 5/9/2011 at 5:00 PM, if they wish to respond. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' motions in limine by Monday, 5/9/2011 at 5:00 PM, if they wish to respond. The Court ORDERS that reply briefs, if any, shall be filed by Wednesday, 5/11/2011 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/3/2011. (ank)
May 2, 2011 281 NOTICE Of Filing Proposed Order re 277 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED INFRINGEMENT OF IMPROPERLY-ASSERTED COPYRIGHTS by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 5/3/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
May 2, 2011 280 Featured Case CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/2/2011. (ank)
May 2, 2011 279 Featured Case ORDER that the Judge has signed the 278 Proposed Pretrial Order. The Court notes that both parties shall file separate findings of fact and conclusions of law. In addition to these findings of fact and conclusions of law, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to file a verbatim statement of the injunctive order they seek in this case no later than May 11, 2011. Plaintiffs may state several alternative versions if they wish to do so. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 5/2/2011. (ank)
April 29, 2011 278 Proposed Pretrial Order by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Cambridge University Press, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Oxford University Press, Inc., Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Sage Publications, Inc., Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F-1, # 5 Exhibit F-2, # 6 Exhibit G-1, # 7 Exhibit G-2, # 8 Exhibit G-3, # 9 Exhibit H-1, # 10 Exhibit I)(Rains, John)
April 29, 2011 277 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED INFRINGEMENT OF IMPROPERLY-ASSERTED COPYRIGHTS with Brief In Support by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
April 29, 2011 276 FILED UNDER SEAL ATTACHMENT E TO PRETRIAL ORDER by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Cambridge University Press, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Oxford University Press, Inc., Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Sage Publications, Inc., Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr (ank) Modified on 4/29/2011 (ank). (verified by adg on 4/29/11)
April 29, 2011 275 NOTICE Of Filing Pretrial Order by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Cambridge University Press, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Oxford University Press, Inc., Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Neil L. Pruitt, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Sage Publications, Inc., Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr Attachment E Under Seal (Rains, John)
April 29, 2011 274 MOTION in Limine To Preclude the Admission of Recently Created Fair Use Checklistsby Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Rains, John)
April 28, 2011 273 MOTION in Limine to Overrule Objections to Evidence of Alleged Infringementsby Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rains, John)
April 28, 2011 272 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Evidence in Accordance with Order of September 30, 2010 with Brief In Support by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, Larry R. Ellis, Rutledge A. Griffin, Jr, Robert F. Hatcher, C. Thomas Hopkins, Jr, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Larry Walker, Philip A. Wilheit, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 4/29/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
April 25, 2011 271 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. of Automatic Substitution of Defendants (Rains, John)
April 8, 2011 270 NOTICE by Mark P. Becker Notice of Change of Address for Anthony B. Askew (Schaetzel, Stephen)
April 6, 2011 269 Featured Case ORDER that the 268 Motion for Early Pretrial Conference is DENIED. As ordered by this Court in its March 3, 2011 Scheduling Order, theparties are directed to file a pre-trial order with this Court by April 29, 201l. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 4/6/2011. (ank)
April 4, 2011 268 MOTION for Hearing Early Pretrial Conference with Brief In Support by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rains, John)
March 17, 2011 267 Featured Case ORDER that the 239 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The parties are DIRECTED to file a proposed consolidated pre-trial order no later than 4/29/2011. The trial is set for 5/16/2011 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 3/17/2011. (ank)
March 15, 2011 266 NOTICE of Joint Filing Concerning Allegations of Infringement at GSU in Response to 265 Court Order by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Cambridge University Press, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Oxford University Press, Inc., Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Sage Publications, Inc., Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rains, John) Modified on 3/16/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
March 3, 2011 265 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER granting 263 Motion for Extension of Time until March 15, 2011 to file a joint list of all alleged infringements from 2009 Maymester, Summer 2009 term, and Fall 2009 term. The parties shall file a Pre-Tril Order with this Court on April 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 3/3/2011. (tcc)
March 3, 2011 264 NOTICE by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker re 239 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Quicker, Katrina)
March 2, 2011 263 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Joint Filing of Alleged Infringements and Pre-Trial Order by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swift, Kristen)
February 17, 2011 262 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 259 Notice, by William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Quicker, Katrina)
February 10, 2011 261 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 5, 2010, before Judge Orinda D. Evans. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem)
January 26, 2011 260 NOTICE to Take Deposition of YouJin Kim filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
January 25, 2011 259 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 239 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 1/26/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
January 13, 2011 258 REPLY BRIEF re 239 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker. (Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 1/14/2011 in order to update docket text (ank).
January 10, 2011 257 NOTICE by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker (Quicker, Katrina)
January 7, 2011 256 Featured Case ORDER that the 255 Motion for Extension of Time to file a reply brief to the 239 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) is GRANTED. The reply brief shall be filed by or on Monday, 1/10/2011. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 1/7/2011. (ank)
January 6, 2011 255 First MOTION for Extension of Time File a Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina)
December 30, 2010 254 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Molly Perkins filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
December 30, 2010 253 NOTICE to Take Deposition of N. Lee Orr filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
December 30, 2010 252 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jennifer McCoy filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
December 30, 2010 251 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jennifer Esposito filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
December 30, 2010 250 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patricia Dixon filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
December 28, 2010 249 Featured Case ORDER granting 237 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration is GRANTED. Upon reconsideration, Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs' Claim One, construed as an indirect infringement claim, is DENIED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Claim One, construed as a direct infringement claim, is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 12/28/10. (fap)
December 17, 2010 248 NOTICE of intent to file reply brief re re 239 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker (Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 12/20/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
December 17, 2010 247 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(Rains, John)
December 7, 2010 Submission of 239 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c), submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
December 6, 2010 246 RESPONSE in Opposition re 239 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rains, John) Modified on 12/7/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
November 17, 2010 245 Featured Case ORDER that the 243 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing Schedule on the 239 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 12/6/2010 and Defendant's reply shall be filed on or before 1/6/2011. Nothing in this order shal modify any other deadlines set forth in this Court's existing scheduling ordersin this case or this Court's Local Rules. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 11/17/2010. (ank)
November 16, 2010 244 REPLY BRIEF re 237 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration of 235 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John) Modified on 11/17/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
November 16, 2010 243 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Complete Briefing on Defendants' 239 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Cambridge University Press, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Oxford University Press, Inc., Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Sage Publications, Inc., Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rains, John) Modified on 11/17/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
November 9, 2010 Submission of 237 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration of 235 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
November 8, 2010 241 RESPONSE in Opposition re 237 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration of 235 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker. (Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 11/9/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
November 5, 2010 242 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Orinda D. Evans: Scheduling Conference held on 11/5/2010. See Scheduling Order. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(ank)
November 5, 2010 240 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER on the 236 Motion for Scheduling Order and in accordance with the scheduling conference held on Friday, November5, 2010 at 2:00 PM. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall proceed according to the schedule outlined within the order. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 11/5/2010. (ank)
November 4, 2010 239 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c) with Brief In Support by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Brief Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(c))(Quicker, Katrina)
November 1, 2010 238 Featured Case ORDER that a Scheduling Conference is set for 11/5/2010 at 2:00 PM before Judge Orinda D. Evans in Chambers 1988. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 11/1/2010. (ank)
October 20, 2010 237 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration of 235 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John) Modified on 10/21/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
October 20, 2010 236 Joint Proprosed Scheduling Orders Regarding Supplementation of Discovery and Briefing by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Cambridge University Press, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Oxford University Press, Inc., Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Sage Publications, Inc., Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rains, John) Modified on 10/21/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
September 30, 2010 235 Featured Case ORDER that the 201 Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Brief is GRANTED, the Plaintiff's 142 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, and the Defendant's 160 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and determine whether further discovery is needed before resolving the remaining contributory claims. Within 20 days, the parties shall present a proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 9/30/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B) (ank)
September 21, 2010 234 Featured Case ORDER that the 202 Motion to Exclude Dr. Crew's Testimony, the 207 Motion to Exclude the declarations of the Georgia State University Professors, and the 131 Motion to Exclude Mariniello's testimony are all DENIED. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 9/21/2010. (ank)
September 15, 2010 233 RESPONSE re 229 Order (Supplement to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Filing) filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Verification))(Swift, Kristen)
September 2, 2010 232 NOTICE by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Carl V. Patton, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker of Withdrawal of John P. Sheesley (Sheesley, John)
August 31, 2010 231 RESPONSE re 229 Order (Submission of Executed Verification) filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Verification))(Swift, Kristen)
August 30, 2010 230 RESPONSE re 229 Order filed by J. L. Albert, Mark P. Becker, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Risa Palm, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Nancy Seamans, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Maymester 2009), # 2 Exhibit B (Summer 2009), # 3 Exhibit C (Fall 2009), # 4 Exhibit D (Verification))(Quicker, Katrina)
August 25, 2010 229 Featured Case ORDER that the Defendants have until August 30, 2010 to respond to the Plaintiff's 228 Response to the Court's Order. See text of Order for specifications. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 8/25/2010. (ank)
August 20, 2010 228 RESPONSE to 227 Order and 226 Order filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rains, John) Modified on 8/23/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
August 12, 2010 227 Featured Case ORDER that the Plaintiffs are DIRECTED TO FILE, within 10 days of the entry of this Order, the following information: (1) The retail cost of each work identified per number 3 of the 226 Order at the time that work was allegedly infringed and (2) the cost of licensing the excerpts of those works that Plaintiffs allege were electronically distributed to Georgia State University students, per number 6 of the 226 Order. Plaintiffs must include a verification swearing that the information filed is true and accurate. Defendants may object to the materials filed within 10 days of filing. See order for more specific directives. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 8/12/2010. (ank)
August 11, 2010 226 Featured Case ORDER that WITHIN 10 DAYS OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER, the plaintiffs are DIRECTED TO FILE a list of each Georgia State University course taught during the 2009 Maymester, the Summer 2009 semester, or the Fall 2009 semester for which excerps from an allegedly infringed work was assigned, the copyright for which is owned by one of the plaintiffs. The list of courses must be grouped by semester and include all information detailed within the Order. The Court DIRECTS the defendants to respond within 10 days after plaintiffs file material. Response must include all information detailed within the Order. Plaintiffs and defendants must include a verification swearing that the information filed is true and correct. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 8/11/2010. (ank)
July 26, 2010 225 STIPULATION re the University System of Georgia's full current copyright policy filed pursuant to the 224 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Index)(ank)
June 14, 2010 224 Featured Case ORDER that parties are DIRECTED to file, as one docket entry, the full current copyright policy of the University System of Georgia. The policy should be in paper format and should include all relevant information regarding the policy; links to the applicable website or URLs are not sufficient. The Court also DIRECTS the parties to submit a stipulation establishing that the information filed is the full current policy established by Georgia State University. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 6/14/2010. (ank)
June 1, 2010 223 REPLY BRIEF re 207 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Evidentiary Proffers in Declarations of Georgia State University Professors filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John)
May 28, 2010 222 REPLY BRIEF re 202 MOTION to Exclude The Putative Expert Testimony of Kenneth D. Crews filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John)
May 17, 2010 Submission of 207 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Evidentiary Proffers in Declarations of Georgia State University Professors, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
May 13, 2010 221 RESPONSE in Opposition re 207 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Evidentiary Proffers in Declarations of Georgia State University Professors filed by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Swift, Kristen)
May 12, 2010 Submission of 202 MOTION to Exclude The Putative Expert Testimony of Kenneth D. Crews, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
May 12, 2010 220 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following dates: July 27, 2010 through August 18, 2010, by Edward Bryan Krugman. (ank)
May 11, 2010 219 RESPONSE in Opposition re 202 MOTION to Exclude The Putative Expert Testimony of Kenneth D. Crews filed by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Quicker, Katrina)
May 10, 2010 Submission of 201 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment with Incorporated Memorandum of Law, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
May 7, 2010 218 Response to Supplemental Statement of Material Facts re 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John) Modified on 5/10/2010 in order to remove duplicative text (ank).
April 28, 2010 217 Featured Case ORDER that the 203 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The Defendants are allowed through and including 5/11/2010 to move, plead, or otherwise respond to the 202 MOTION to Exclude The Putative Expert Testimony of Kenneth D. Crews. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 4/28/2010. (ank)
April 27, 2010 216 REPLY to Response to Motion re 203 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' 202 Motion to Exclude the Putative Expert Testimony of Kenneth D. Crews filed by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Johnson, Courtney) Modified on 4/29/2010 in order to update text (ank).
April 26, 2010 215 FILED UNDER SEAL DEPOSITION of DEBRA MARINIELLO taken on JANUARY 15, 2010 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2010: # 1 SEALED DEPOSITION, PART 2) (ank). Modified on 4/27/2010 (ank). (verified by pdw on 4/27/10)
April 26, 2010 214 FILED UNDER SEAL DEPOSITION of DEBRA MARINIELLO taken on JUNE 30, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank) Modified on 4/27/2010 (ank). (verified by pdw on 4/27/10)
April 26, 2010 213 Response to Statement of Material Facts re 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Pls.' Supp. L.R. 56.1 SOF) filed by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Quicker, Katrina)
April 26, 2010 212 Statement of Material Facts re 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Supplemental Additional) filed by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Quicker, Katrina)
April 26, 2010 211 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits in Support of the 206 Reply Brief by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 4/27/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
April 26, 2010 210 REPLY to Response to Motion re 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Quicker, Katrina)
April 26, 2010 209 NOTICE Of Filing Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rains, John)
April 26, 2010 208 Declaration of John H. Rains IV re 207 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Evidentiary Proffers in Declarations of Georgia State University Professors, 206 Reply Brief, by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rains, John) Modified on 4/27/2010 in order to update docket text (ank)
April 26, 2010 207 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Evidentiary Proffers in Declarations of Georgia State University Professors with Brief In Support by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Their Motion to Exclude Testimony and Evidentiary Proffers in Declarations of Georgia State University Professors)(Rains, John)
April 26, 2010 206 REPLY BRIEF re 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts in Response to Defendants' Statement of Additional Facts)(Rains, John)
April 26, 2010 205 NOTICE Of Filing Depositions Under Seal by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. June 30, 2009 and January 15, 2010 Depositions of Debra J. Mariniello (Rains, John)
April 26, 2010 Submission of 203 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' 202 Motion to Exclude the Putative Expert Testimony of Kenneth D. Crews, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
April 23, 2010 204 RESPONSE in Opposition to 203 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' 202 Motion to Exclude the Putative Expert Testimony of Kenneth D. Crews filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John) Modified on 4/26/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
April 23, 2010 203 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' 202 Motion to Exclude the Putative Expert Testimony of Kenneth D. Crews with Brief In Support by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Courtney) Modified on 4/26/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
April 13, 2010 202 MOTION to Exclude The Putative Expert Testimony of Kenneth D. Crews with Brief In Support by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion to Exclude the Putative Expert Testimony of Kenneth D. Crews)(Rains, John)
April 9, 2010 201 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Corrected Brief, # 2 Exhibit B, Redline)(Quicker, Katrina)
April 7, 2010 200 Featured Case ORDER granting the 198 Unopposed Motion for a One Day Extension of Time for Defendants to File Exhibits to their Response to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 4/7/2010. (ank)
April 6, 2010 199 NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' Brief In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H to Defendants' Supplemental Statement of Facts)(Quicker, Katrina)
April 6, 2010 198 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Quicker, Katrina)
April 6, 2010 197 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 04-01 as to John H. Rains, IV re 195 Redacted Responses and Objections to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (ank)
April 6, 2010 Submission of 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
April 6, 2010 191 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to the 186 Response by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Oxford University Press, Inc., Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker #4 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit G-2 to Supplemental Statement of Facts)(Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 4/6/2010 in order to add document link and description (ank).
April 6, 2010 190 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits to the 186 Response by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker #3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit G to Supplemental Statement of Facts)(Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 4/6/2010 in order to add document link and description (ank).
March 17, 2010 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Bloom re 180 Order (ank)
March 17, 2010 180 Featured Case ORDER granting 179 Motion for Extension of Time to file briefs in opposition and, if necessary, reply briefs, to the 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court Orders that the briefs in opposition to the motions shall be filed by 4/5/2010 and the reply briefs, if any, shall be filed by 4/26/2010. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 3/16/2010. (ank)
March 15, 2010 179 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Briefs in Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment and, If Necessary, Reply Briefs re: 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Johnson, Courtney)
March 10, 2010 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Bloom re 178 Order on Application for Admission PHV (ank)
March 9, 2010 178 Featured Case ORDER granting 136 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Bloom on behalf of plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 3/9/2010. (ank)
March 9, 2010 177 REPLY to Response to Motion re 131 MOTION to Exclude MOTION to Strike Debra J. Mariniello as an Expert or, In the Alternative, to Exclude and Strike Certain Expert Testimony filed by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Johnson, Courtney)
March 3, 2010 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 136 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Bloom Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002585306). Attorney Jonathan Bloom added appearing on behalf of Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (cdg)
March 3, 2010 Submission of 131 MOTION to Exclude Debra J. Mariniello as an Expert, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Exclude and Strike Certain Expert Testimony of Debra J. Mariniello, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
March 1, 2010 Notification of Docket Correction re 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment. EXHIBIT D PLACED UNDER SEAL at request of defendants' counsel per protective order. (ank)
February 26, 2010 176 DEPOSITION of KENNETH D. CREWS taken on DECEMBER 10, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
February 26, 2010 175 DEPOSITION of JASON REIFLER, Ph.D. taken on JUNE 3, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
February 26, 2010 174 DEPOSITION of NANCY SEAMANS taken on MARCH 10, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
February 26, 2010 173 DEPOSITION of JODI KAUFMANN taken on MAY 6, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
February 26, 2010 172 DEPOSITION of MARJORIE DENISE DIMSDALE taken on MAY 13, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
February 26, 2010 171 DEPOSITION of DIANE BELCHER taken on MAY 7, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
February 26, 2010 170 DEPOSITION of WILLIAM GRAY POTTER taken on MARCH 9, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
February 26, 2010 169 DEPOSITION of LAURA G. BURTLE taken on APRIL 24, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
February 26, 2010 168 DEPOSITION of PAULA CHRISTOPHER taken on JUNE 10, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
February 26, 2010 167 DEPOSITION of JAMES DANIEL PALMOUR taken on APRIL 23, 2009 by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(ank)
February 26, 2010 166 FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibits to the 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2010: # 1 Index, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 3, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 3, Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, Part 3, # 8 Exhibit 3, Part 4, # 9 Exhibit 3, part 5, # 10 Exhibit 3, part 6, # 11 Exhibit 3, part 7, # 12 Exhibit 3, part 8, # 13 Exhibit 3, part 9, # 14 Exhibit 3, part 10, # 15 Exhibit 3, part 11, # 16 Exhibit 3, part 12, # 17 Exhibit 3, part 13, # 18 Exhibit 3, part 14) (ank). Modified on 3/1/2010 (ank). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2010: # 19 Exhibit 4, # 20 Exhibit 4, part 1, # 21 Exhibit 4, part 2, # 22 Exhibit 4, part 3, # 23 Exhibit 4, part 4, # 24 Exhibit 4, part 5, # 25 Exhibit 4, part 6, # 26 Exhibit 4, part 7, # 27 Exhibit 4, part 8, # 28 Exhibit 4, part 9) (ank). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2010: # 29 Exhibit 4, part 10, # 30 Exhibit 4, part 11, # 31 Exhibit 4, part 12, # 32 Exhibit 4, part 13, # 33 Exhibit 4, part 14, # 34 Exhibit 4, part 15, # 35 Exhibit 4, part 16, # 36 Exhibit 4, part 17, # 37 Exhibit 4, part 18, # 38 Exhibit 4, part 19, # 39 Exhibit 4, part 20, # 40 Exhibit 4, part 21, # 41 Exhibit 4, part 22, # 42 Exhibit 4, part 23, # 43 Exhibit 4, part 24, # 44 Exhibit 4, part 25, # 45 Exhibit 4, part 26, # 46 Exhibit 4, part 27, # 47 Exhibit 4, part 28, # 48 Exhibit 4, part 29, # 49 Exhibit 4, part 30, # 50 Exhibit 4, part 31, # 51 Exhibit 4, part 32) (ank). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2010: # 52 Exhibit 5, # 53 Exhibit 5, part 1, # 54 Exhibit 5, part 2, # 55 Exhibit 5, part 3, # 56 Exhibit 5, part 4, # 57 Exhibit 5, part 5, # 58 Exhibit 5, part 6, # 59 Exhibit 5, part 7, # 60 Exhibit 5, part 8, # 61 Exhibit 5, part 9, # 62 Exhibit 5, part 10, # 63 Exhibit 5, part 11, # 64 Exhibit 5, part 12, # 65 Exhibit 5, part 13) (ank). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2010: # 66 Exhibit 7, Part 1, # 67 Exhibit 7, part 2, # 68 Exhibit 10, # 69 Exhibit 11, # 70 Exhibit 20, # 71 Exhibit 47, # 72 Exhibit 50) (ank). Modified on 3/1/2010 (ank). (verified by alc on 3/1/2010)
February 26, 2010 165 FILED UNDER SEAL Statement of Material Facts re 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (ank) . Modified on 3/1/2010 (ank). (Verified by alc on 3/1/2010)
February 26, 2010 164 FILED UNDER SEAL DECLARATION of Frank Smith in support of 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2010: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32) (ank). Modified on 3/1/2010 (ank). (verified on 3/1/2010 by aqq)
February 26, 2010 163 FILED UNDER SEAL DECLARATION of Debra J. Mariniello in support of 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (ank) Modified on 3/1/2010 (ank). (verified on 3/1/2010 by aqq)
February 26, 2010 162 DECLARATION of Robert B.K. Dewar in support of 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (ank)
February 26, 2010 161 DECLARATION of Steven M. Sheffrin in support of Plaintiffs' 142 Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (ank) Modified on 3/1/2010 in order to add document link (ank).
February 26, 2010 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Risa Palm, Frederick E. Cooper, Larry R. Ellis, Larry Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Statement of Material Facts, # 4 Exhibit A to SOF, # 5 Exhibit B to SOF, # 6 Exhibit C to SOF, # 7 Exhibit D to SOF, # 8 Exhibit E to SOF, # 9 Exhibit F to SOF, # 10 Exhibit G to SOF, # 11 Exhibit H to SOF, # 12 Exhibit I to SOF)(Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 3/1/2010 in order to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ank).
February 26, 2010 159 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibits 103 through 107 and Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 103, Part 1 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 103, Part 2 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 104 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 105 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 106 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 107 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit List)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 158 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibits 92 through 102 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 92 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 93 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 94 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 95 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 96 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 97 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 98 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 99 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 100 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 101 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 102 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 157 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibits 81 through 91 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 81 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 82 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 83 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 84 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 85 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 86 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 87 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 88 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 89 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 90 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 91 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 156 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibits 70 through 80 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 70 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 71 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 72 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 73 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 74 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 75 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 76 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 77 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 78 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 79 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 80 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 155 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibits 59 through 69 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 59 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 60 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 61 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 62 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 63 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 64 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit65 1 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 66 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 671 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 68 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 69 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 154 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibit 58 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 58, Part 1 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 58, Part 2 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 58, Part 3 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 58, Part 4 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 153 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibit 57 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 57, Part 1 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 57, Part 2 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 57, Part 3 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 57, Part 4 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 152 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notide of Filing Exhibit 56 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 56, Part 1 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 56, Part 2 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 56, Part 3 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 56, Part 4 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 151 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibit 55 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 55, Part 1 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 55, Part 2 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 55, Part 3 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 55, Part 4 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 150 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of filing Exhibits 50 through 54 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 50 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 51 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 52 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 53 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 54 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 149 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of filing Exhibits 39 through 49 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 39 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 40 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 41 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 42 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 43 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 44 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 45 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 46 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 47 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 48 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 49 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 148 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibits 28 through 38 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 28 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 29 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 30 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 31 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 32 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 33 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 34 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 35 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 36 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 37 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 38 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 147 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibit 27 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 27, Part 11 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 27, Part 2 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 146 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibits 22 through 26 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 22 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 23 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 24 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 25 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 26 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 145 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibit 21 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 21, part 1 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - Part 2 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 21, Part 3 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 144 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibits 11 through 20 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 11 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 12 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 13 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 14 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 15 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 16 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 17 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 18 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 19 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 20 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 143 NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibits 1 through 10 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Plaitniffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Material Facts Plaintiffs' Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
February 26, 2010 141 Statement of Material facts in Support of 142 Motion for Summary Judgment by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, John) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- Modified on 3/1/2010 in order to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ank).
February 26, 2010 140 Request to File Original Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 139 NOTICE Of Filing by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Nofice of Manual Filing of Original Declarations (Rains, John)
February 26, 2010 138 NOTICE Of Filing by Sage Publications, Inc., Cambridge University Press, and Oxford University Press, Inc. Notice of Manual Filing Under Seal (Rains, John) Modified on 3/1/2010 in order to add filers (ank).
February 26, 2010 137 NOTICE Of Filing by Sage Publications, Inc., Cambridge University Press, and Oxford University Press, Inc. Manual Filing of Original Depositions (Rains, John) Modified on 3/1/2010 in order to add filers (ank).
February 26, 2010 136 APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Bloom Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000002585306)by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John)
February 23, 2010 135 FILED UNDER SEAL RESPONSE in Opposition to 131 MOTION to Exclude Debra J. Mariniello as an Expert, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Exclude and Strike Certain Expert Testimony of Debra J. Mariniellofiled by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2010: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K) (ank). Modified on 2/24/2010 (ank). (verified by alc on 2/24/2010)
February 23, 2010 134 NOTICE Of Filing Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' 131 Motion to Exclude Debra J. Mariniello as an Expert by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John) Modified on 2/24/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
February 23, 2010 133 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Automatic Substitution of Defendants (Rains, John)
February 17, 2010 132 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Automatic Substitution of Defendant (Rains, John)
February 10, 2010 131 FILED UNDER SEAL MOTION to Exclude Debra J. Mariniello as an Expert, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Exclude and Strike Certain Expert Testimony of Debra J. Mariniello and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (ank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2010: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (ank). Modified on 2/10/2010 (ank). (verified by alc on 2/10/10)
February 10, 2010 130 NOTICE of Manual Filing Under Seal (Motion to Exclude Debra J. Mariniello As an Expert, or, in the Alternative, to Exclude and Strike Certain Expert Testimony of Debra J. Mariniello and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof and Exhibits) by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans (Swift, Kristen) Modified on 2/10/2010 in order to update docket text (ank).
December 31, 2009 129 Featured Case ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time for Completing Expert Depositions through and including 1/27/2010. Summary Judgment motions and briefs, not to exceed 60 pages, shall be filed by 2/26/2010, opposition briefs, not to exceed 50 pages, shall be filed by 3/22/2010, and reply briefs, if any, shall be filed by 4/8/2010, and shall not exceed 25 pages. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 12/31/2009. (ank)
December 23, 2009 128 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Expert Depositions with Brief In Support by Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swift, Kristen)
November 2, 2009 127 Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Rebuttal Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews, J.D., Ph.D.)(Swift, Kristen)
October 16, 2009 126 FILED UNDER SEAL Complete and Unredacted Expert Report of Debra J. Mariniello in Response to the Report of Kenneth D. Crews by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (ank). Modified on 10/16/2009 (ank). (verified by kt on 10/16/2009)
October 16, 2009 125 NOTICE Of Filing Manual Filing Under Seal by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. re 124 Initial Disclosures, Expert Report of Debra J. Mariniello (Rains, John)
October 15, 2009 124 Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of Robert B.K. Dewar, # 2 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Debra J. Mariniello, # 3 Exhibit C - Expert Report of Steven M. Sheffrin)(Krugman, Edward)
September 14, 2009 123 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER regarding Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 9/14/2009. (ank)
September 11, 2009 122 PROPOSED ORDER Joint Submission of Proposed Scheduling Orders Regarding Expert Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Plaintiffs' Proposed Scheduling Order), # 2 Exhibit B (Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order))(Swift, Kristen)
September 3, 2009 121 Featured Case ORDER denying Plaintiff's 106 Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews. Dr. Crews' report was not timely filed, but that the untimeliness was justified. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 09/02/2009. (rvb)
July 31, 2009 120 Featured Case ORDER granting 119 Motion for Scheduling Order. See Order for Specifics. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 7/30/2009. (ank)
July 20, 2009 119 Joint MOTION for Order on Scheduling with Brief In Support by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Cambridge University Press, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rains, John)
July 10, 2009 118 JOINT NOTICE Of Filing Stipulations by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Cambridge University Press, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rains, John) Modified on 7/13/2009 in order to update docket text (ank).
July 6, 2009 117 NOTICE of Service of Subpoena by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rains, John) Modified on 7/7/2009 in order to update docket text (ank).
July 6, 2009 116 SUR-REPLY in Opposition re 106 MOTION to Exclude The Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews (Surreply in Further Support of Defendants' Opposition) filed by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 7/7/2009 in order to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ank).
July 2, 2009 115 Featured Case ORDER granting 114 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply in support of defendants' opposition to the 106 MOTION to Exclude The Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 7/2/2009. (ank)
June 30, 2009 114 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Further Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' 106 Motion To Exclude The Expert Report Of Kenneth D. Crews with Brief In Support by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Surreply, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 7/1/2009 in order to update docket text (ank).
June 25, 2009 113 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. of Service of Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rains, John)
June 24, 2009 112 REPLY BRIEF re 106 MOTION to Exclude The Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Krugman Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A Krugman, # 3 Exhibit B Krugman, # 4 Exhibit C Krugman, # 5 Exhibit D Krugman, # 6 Exhibit E Krugman, # 7 Larson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit A Larson, # 9 Exhibit B Larson, # 10 Exhibit C Larson, # 11 Exhibit D Larson, # 12 Exhibit E Larson, # 13 Exhibit F Larson, # 14 Exhibit G Larson, # 15 Exhibit H Larson)(Krugman, Edward)
June 22, 2009 111 Featured Case ORDER granting defendants' 87 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 6/19/2009. (ank)
June 22, 2009 Submission of 106 MOTION to Exclude The Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
June 22, 2009 Notification of Docket Correction re 110 Response in Opposition to Motion and 109 Notice of Appearance. Modified in order to update filer information. Katrina M. Quicker added as counsel for all defendants. (ank)
June 19, 2009 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re 106 MOTION to Exclude The Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews filed by Mark P. Becker, Ronald Henry, J.L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr., William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr., James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr., Eldridge McMillan, Wiiliam NeSmith, Jr., Doreen Stiles, Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr., Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr., Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Nancy Seamans (Attachments: # 1 Askew Declaration, # 2 Schaetzel Declaration, # 3 Gary Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I)(Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 6/22/2009 in order to update filer information (ank).
June 19, 2009 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina M. Quicker on behalf of Mark P. Becker, Ronald Henry, J.L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr., James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr., William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr., James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr., Eldridge McMillan, Wiiliam NeSmith, Jr., Doreen Stiles, Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr., Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr., Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Nancy Seamans (Quicker, Katrina) Modified on 6/22/2009 in order to update filer information (ank).
June 12, 2009 108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(Rains, John)
June 9, 2009 107 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Sheesley on behalf of Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans (Sheesley, John)
June 5, 2009 106 MOTION to Exclude The Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews with Brief In Support by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Edward Krugman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Krugman, Edward)
June 4, 2009 105 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Deposition Noticesby Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. re 72 Notice to Take Deposition, 65 Notice to Take Deposition, 67 Notice to Take Deposition, 76 Notice to Take Deposition, 69 Notice to Take Deposition, 103 Notice to Take Deposition (Rains, John) Modified on 6/5/2009 in order to update docket text (ank).
June 1, 2009 104 Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B (Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews), # 2 Appendix A (Appendix to Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews), # 3 Appendix B (Appendix to Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews), # 4 Appendix C (Appendix to Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews), # 5 Appendix D (Appendix to Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews), # 6 Appendix E (Appendix to Expert Report of Kenneth D. Crews))(Swift, Kristen)
May 29, 2009 103 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ann Kruger filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
May 29, 2009 102 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Reifler filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
May 29, 2009 101 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paula Christopher filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
May 29, 2009 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Suzanne Johnson on behalf of Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans (Johnson, Courtney)
May 27, 2009 99 REPLY BRIEF re 87 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Swift, Kristen)
May 22, 2009 Submission of 87 MOTION for Protective Order, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
May 21, 2009 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re 87 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Edward Krugman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R)(Krugman, Edward)
May 21, 2009 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Elisabeth Gary on behalf of Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans (Gary, Laura)
May 21, 2009 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Third Requests for the Production of Documents from Defendants by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans.(Swift, Kristen)
May 21, 2009 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Amended and Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans.(Swift, Kristen)
May 20, 2009 94 Withdrawal of Motion 78 MOTION to Take Additional Depositions filed by Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc., Cambridge University Press. (Rains, John) Modified on 5/21/2009 in order to update docket text (ank).
May 18, 2009 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Second Requests for the Production of Documents from Defendants by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans.(Swift, Kristen)
May 18, 2009 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans.(Swift, Kristen)
May 8, 2009 91 NOTICE to Take Deposition of SAGE Publications, Inc. filed by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans (Swift, Kristen)
May 8, 2009 90 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Oxford University Press, Inc. filed by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans (Swift, Kristen)
May 8, 2009 89 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cambridge University Press filed by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans (Swift, Kristen)
May 6, 2009 Submission of 78 MOTION to Take Additional Depositions, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
May 5, 2009 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re 78 MOTION to Take Additional Depositions filed by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Swift, Kristen)
May 4, 2009 87 MOTION for Protective Order with Brief In Support by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Swift, Kristen)
May 1, 2009 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans.(Swift, Kristen)
May 1, 2009 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans.(Swift, Kristen)
April 30, 2009 84 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. of Service of Discovery (Rains, John)
April 27, 2009 83 Featured Case ORDER dismissing 58 Motion for Protective Order without prejudice. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 4/27/2009. (ank)
April 22, 2009 82 Featured Case ORDER extending time to schedule and take depositions until June 30, 2009. All other discovery must be completed by May 25, 2009. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 4/22/2009. (ank)
April 22, 2009 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(Rains, John)
April 22, 2009 80 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rains, John)
April 21, 2009 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(Rains, John)
April 21, 2009 78 MOTION to Take Additional Depositions with Brief In Support by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Rains, John)
April 16, 2009 77 REPLY BRIEF re 58 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Swift, Kristen)
April 15, 2009 76 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Marni Davis filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 15, 2009 75 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dianne Belcher filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 15, 2009 74 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paula Christopher filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 13, 2009 73 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. of Service of Discovery (Krugman, Edward)
April 13, 2009 72 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeffrey Lazarus filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 10, 2009 71 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 58 MOTION for Protective Order Nunc Pro Tunc Certificate of Good Faith Negotiation by Kristen A. Swift on behalf of Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans (Swift, Kristen)
April 10, 2009 70 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Reifler filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 10, 2009 69 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patricia Dixon filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 10, 2009 68 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Marian Meyers filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 10, 2009 67 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Downs filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 10, 2009 66 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jodi Kaufmann filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 6, 2009 65 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Corey Scholtzhauer filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 6, 2009 64 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Denise Dimsdale filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 6, 2009 63 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Palmour filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 6, 2009 62 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Laura Burtle filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
April 6, 2009 Submission of 58 MOTION for Protective Order, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ank)
April 3, 2009 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Edward Krugman, # 2 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Declatation Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit N Part 1, # 16 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit N Part 2, # 17 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit N Part 3, # 18 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit Q)(Krugman, Edward)
March 31, 2009 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Request for the Production of Documents by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans.(Swift, Kristen)
March 31, 2009 59 NOTICE by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans of Service of Subpoena to Copyright Clearance Center, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Swift, Kristen)
March 17, 2009 58 MOTION for Protective Order with Brief In Support by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans. (Swift, Kristen) Modified on 3/19/2009 in order to update docket text (ank).
March 5, 2009 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Second Request for the Production of Documents from Defendants by Ronald Henry, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, Mark P. Becker, Nancy Seamans.(Swift, Kristen)
March 5, 2009 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' First Requests for the Production of Documents from the Board of Regents Defendants by Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil.(Swift, Kristen)
March 5, 2009 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to the Board of Regents Defendants by Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil.(Swift, Kristen)
February 26, 2009 54 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nancy Seamans filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
February 26, 2009 53 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Potter filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
February 25, 2009 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Randi W. Singer re 52 Order (ank)
February 24, 2009 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion to Extend Time to Complete Discovery by 2 months. Discovery ends on 5/25/2009. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 2/24/2009. (ank)
February 20, 2009 51 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cory Schlotzhauer filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
February 20, 2009 50 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Denise Dimsdale filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
February 17, 2009 49 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Attachment)(Rains, John)
February 13, 2009 48 NOTICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. Notice of Automatic Substitution of Defendants (Rains, John)
February 9, 2009 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(Rains, John)
February 5, 2009 Notification of Docket Correction re 46 Initial Disclosures. Modified in order to correct filer information. (ank)
February 4, 2009 46 Initial Disclosures by Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil.(Swift, Kristen) Modified on 2/5/2009 in order to correct filer information (ank).
January 30, 2009 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(Rains, John)
January 16, 2009 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Service of Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(Rains, John)
January 12, 2009 43 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Krugman, Edward)
January 2, 2009 42 Defendants' ANSWER to 39 Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief by Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil.(Swift, Kristen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 23, 2008 41 Summons Issued as to Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil. (ekb)
December 22, 2008 40 Second Certificate of Interested Persons by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John)
December 15, 2008 39 First AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert, Kenneth R. Bernard, Jr, James A. Bishop, Hugh A. Carter, Jr, William H. Cleveland, Robert F. Hatcher, Felton Jenkins, W. Mansfield Jennings, Jr, James R. Jolly, Donald M. Leebern, Jr, Eldridge McMillan, William NeSmith, Jr, Doreen Stiles Poitevint, Willis J. Potts, Jr, Wanda Yancey Rodwell, Kessel Stelling, Jr, Benjamin J. Tarbutton, III, Richard L. Tucker, Allan Vigil, filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Rains, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 11, 2008 38 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and dismissing in part 29 Motion to Amend the Complaint to Add Additional Defendants. Plaintiffs' motion is granted in part as to the individual defendants. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend to add the Board of Regents as a defendant is dismissed in part. If they so desire, Plaintiffs may seek leave to amend the complaint to add the Board of Regents as a defendant at a later time. The parties' arguments regarding sovereign immunity and whether the Board of Regents is a necessary party will be considered when and if such a motion is filed. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 12/11/08. (ekb)
November 20, 2008 37 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 11/20/08. (ekb)
November 17, 2008 36 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Stipulated Protective Order. (Swift, Kristen)
October 27, 2008 35 REPLY BRIEF re 29 MOTION for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Add Additional Defendants filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Rains, John)
October 16, 2008 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Krugman, Edward) Modified on 10/16/2008 to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ekb).
October 9, 2008 Submission of 29 MOTION for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Add Additional Defendants, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (ekb)
October 9, 2008 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Add Additional Defendants filed by Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert. (Swift, Kristen) Modified on 10/9/2008 to remove duplicative text from entry (ekb).
October 2, 2008 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Corey Fleming Hirokawa terminated. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 10/2/08. (ekb)
September 29, 2008 31 MOTION to Withdraw Corey Fleming Hirokawa as Attorneyby Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Hirokawa, Corey)
September 23, 2008 30 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Rains, IV on behalf of Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Rains, John)
September 22, 2008 29 MOTION for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Add Additional Defendants with Brief In Support by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Krugman, Edward) Modified on 9/23/2008 to correct event type (ekb).
September 16, 2008 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs by Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert.(Swift, Kristen)
September 16, 2008 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendants' First Request for the Production of Documents by Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert.(Swift, Kristen)
August 27, 2008 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants by Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert.(Swift, Kristen)
August 27, 2008 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' First Requests for the Production of Documents by Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert.(Swift, Kristen)
August 25, 2008 24 Certificate of Interested Persons by Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert. (Swift, Kristen) Modified on 8/25/2008 to correct docket text (ekb).
July 31, 2008 23 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER approving 16 Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is set for an 8 months' discovery limit. Discovery ends on 3/21/2009. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 7/30/08. (ekb)
July 30, 2008 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony B. Askew on behalf of Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert (Askew, Anthony)
July 30, 2008 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen A. Swift on behalf of Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert (Swift, Kristen)
July 29, 2008 20 Initial Disclosures by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(Krugman, Edward)
July 28, 2008 19 First Initial Disclosures by Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert.(Volkert, Mary Josephine)
July 28, 2008 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc..(Krugman, Edward)
July 28, 2008 Notification of Docket Correction re 15 Initial Disclosures. Docket text corrected to accurately reflect e-filed pleading as a Certificate of Interested Persons. (ekb)
July 28, 2008 17 Corrected Certificate of Interested Persons by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc. (Krugman, Edward) Modified on 7/28/2008 to correct docket text and filer information (ekb).
July 25, 2008 16 Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Cambridge University Press, J. L. Albert, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, Oxford University Press, Inc., Carl V. Patton, Sage Publications, Inc. (Krugman, Edward) Modified on 7/28/2008 to correct filer information (ekb).
July 25, 2008 15 Certificate of Interested Persons by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.(Krugman, Edward) Modified on 7/28/2008 to accurately reflect e-filed pleading (ekb). Modified on 7/28/2008 to correct filer information (ekb).
June 24, 2008 14 ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief by Carl V. Patton, Ronald Henry, Charlene Hurt, J. L. Albert. Discovery ends on 11/21/2008.(Volkert, Mary Josephine) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 18, 2008 13 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER Extending Time For Defendants to File an Answer until 6/24/2008. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 6/18/08. (ekb)
June 16, 2008 12 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendants to File an Answer re: 1 Complaint. (Volkert, Mary Josephine) Modified on 6/16/2008 to remove duplicative text from entry (ekb).
May 16, 2008 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J. L. Albert. J. L. Albert waiver mailed on 4/18/2008, answer due 6/17/2008. (Hirokawa, Corey)
May 16, 2008 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charlene Hurt. Charlene Hurt waiver mailed on 4/18/2008, answer due 6/17/2008. (Hirokawa, Corey)
May 16, 2008 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronald Henry. Ronald Henry waiver mailed on 4/18/2008, answer due 6/17/2008. (Hirokawa, Corey)
May 16, 2008 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carl V. Patton. Carl V. Patton waiver mailed on 4/18/2008, answer due 6/17/2008. (Hirokawa, Corey)
April 22, 2008 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Randi W. Singer. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 4/21/2008. (alc)
April 22, 2008 6 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Todd D. Larson. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 4/21/2008. (alc)
April 22, 2008 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for R. Bruce Rich. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 4/21/2008. (alc)
April 18, 2008 Notification of Docket Correction re 1 Complaint. Clear pdf attachments to Exhibits 2 and 3 attached to complaint. (fmm)
April 18, 2008 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Randi W. Singer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001616057) 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Todd D. Larson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001616043) 2 APPLICATION for Admission of R. Bruce Rich Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001616018). Attorney R. Bruce Rich for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Randi W. Singer for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc., Todd D. Larson for Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc. added. (pb)
April 17, 2008 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Randi W. Singer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001616057)by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Krugman, Edward)
April 17, 2008 3 APPLICATION for Admission of Todd D. Larson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001616043)by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Krugman, Edward)
April 17, 2008 2 APPLICATION for Admission of R. Bruce Rich Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E0000000001616018)by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc., Sage Publications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Krugman, Edward)
April 15, 2008 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cambridge University Press, Oxford University Press, Inc. and Sage Publications, Inc.. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 576545.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Incorrect PDF, # 3 Incorrect PDF, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2008: # 5 Correct Exhibit 2, # 6 Correct Exhibit 3) (fmm). (epm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cambridge University Press et al v. Patton et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oxford University Press, Inc.
Represented By: Randi W. Singer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cambridge University Press
Represented By: Randi W. Singer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sage Publications, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Fleming Hirokawa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Hurt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. L. Albert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl V. Patton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]