Chemence Medical Products, Inc. v. Medline Industries, Inc.

Plaintiff: Chemence Medical Products, Inc.
Defendant: Medline Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00500
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
County: Forsyth
Presiding Judge: Thomas W. Thrash
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2015 213 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 148 Motion to Seal, granting in part and denying in part 151 Motion to Seal Document, granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion to Seal Document, granting in part and denying in pa rt 166 Motion to Seal Document, granting in part and denying in part 175 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion to Seal, granting in part and denying in part 188 Motion to Seal, granting 195 Motion to Seal, granting 209 Motion to Seal, granting 212 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/12/15. (dr)
February 12, 2015 254 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 103 Motion to Compel, denying as moot 131 Motion for Extension of Time, granting 134 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 167 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, denying as moot 196 Motion for Leave to File, denying 197 Motion for Leave to File, denying as moot 210 Motion to Exclude, denying as moot 230 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/11/15. (dr)
December 5, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 12/4/2013. (ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chemence Medical Products, Inc. v. Medline Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chemence Medical Products, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medline Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Henry D. Fellows, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin P. Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.