Johnson v. Conway et al

Plaintiff: Vance R. Johnson
Defendant: R.L. Butch Conway, Christopher Revels, Robert Bailey, Tochi Davis, Corizon Medical Services Inc., M.E. Campbell and Sue Fajarado
Case Number: 1:2013cv00524
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
County: Gwinnett
Presiding Judge: Richard W. Story
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Leave to Amend. Medical Defendants' 28 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Defendants motion is granted as to the following claims: First Amendment retaliation claim agai nst Defendant Campbell; First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendant Fajardo insofar as it is based on conspiracy to use force in retaliation for protected speech; Fourteenth Amendment excessive force claim against Defendant Fajardo; State- Law battery claim against Defendant Fajardo insofar as it is based on an alleged conspiracy to commit battery; and Negligence claim against Defendant Campbell. The remaining claims are: First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendant Fajardo i nsofar as it is based on administration of the PPD test; State-law battery claim against Defendant Fajardo insofar as it is based on administration of the PPD test; Negligence claim against Defendant Fajardo insofar as it is based on administration of the PPD test; and Respondeat Superior claim against Corizon to the extent state-law tort claims remain against Defendant Fajardo. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/30/2013. (cem)
May 2, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, 41 Motion to Amend the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/2/2014. (cem)
February 18, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants Corizon Health, Inc. and Susan Fajardo's 69 Motion to Amend Answer to Assert Statute of Limitations Defense. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 2/18/2015. (cem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Conway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance R. Johnson
Represented By: Craig Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. Butch Conway
Represented By: Scott James Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Revels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tochi Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.E. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Fajarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.