Wonderland Nurserygoods Co., Ltd. v. Kids II, Inc.

Defendant: Kids II, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wonderland Nurserygoods Co., Ltd.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01114
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: Georgia Northern District Court
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Thomas W. Thrash
 
Nature of Suit: Patent

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 8/15/2014. (ss)
May 20, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing the disputed terms. (See Order for Details). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/20/2014. (ss)
May 27, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. RE43,919. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/27/2014. (ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wonderland Nurserygoods Co., Ltd. v. Kids II, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kids II, Inc.
Represented By: Scott P. Amy
Represented By: Norman Andrew Crain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wonderland Nurserygoods Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel A. Tallitsch
Represented By: David I. Roche
Represented By: Shattuck Ely
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]