Matera v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Dona Matera
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00227
Filed: April 30, 2007
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: SAMUEL P KING
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES 29 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 9/3/09. ~ The Court FINDS AND RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs Motion be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Co urt recommends that the district judge award Plaintiff $7,071.88 in attorneys' fees. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 2, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER 35 29 40 . Signed by JUDGE SAMUEL P KING. (eps ) -- A total EAJA fee award of $7,071.88 is appropriate. Accordingly, the objections are OVERRULED and the September 3, 2009, Report of Special Mast er is ADOPTED as the order and opinion of this Court CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications are served by first class mail
November 23, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO § 206(B)(1) 35 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 11/23/09. ~ The Court FINDS and RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs Motion be G RANTED. Plaintiffs counsel is entitled to § 406(b) attorneys fees in the gross amount of $8,741.75, to be paid out of the sums withheld by the SSA. Counsel shall reimburse Plaintiff in the amount of $7,071.88, that was previously paid by Defendant under the EAJA award. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 25, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER ON PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES PURSUANT TO § 206(B)(1). Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 11/24/09. 43 35 ~ The Court FINDS and RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs Motion be GRANTED. Pl aintiffs counsel is entitled to § 406(b) attorneys fees in the gross amount of $8,741.75, to be paid out of the sums withheld by the SSA. Counsel shall reimburse Plaintiff in the amount of $7,071.88, that was previously paid by Defenda nt under the EAJA award. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 21, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 44 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by JUDGE SAMUEL P KING on 12/21/2009. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Matera v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dona Matera
Represented By: Carl M. Varady
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]