Loper v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Ralph L. Loper
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00408
Filed: September 9, 2008
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2009 21 Featured Case FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS THAT DEFENDANT'S 17 MOTION FOR REMAND BE GRANTED. ( Objections to F&R due by 2/17/2009). Signed by Magistrate Judge BARRY M. KURREN on February 2, 2009. (bbb, )
March 4, 2009 23 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 21 MAGISTRATE'S FINDING AND RECOMMENDATION THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR REMAND BE GRANTED. Signed by Chief JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on March 4, 2009. (bbb, )
March 21, 2012 30 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 29 . Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 3/21/2012. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Loper v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph L. Loper
Represented By: Harvey P. Sackett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]