Pizzuto v. Blades

 
Case Number: 1:2005cv00516
Filed: December 19, 2005
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 92 Motion to Compel. Pet shall provide a supplemental response to Res's motion for production No. 1 no later than 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
October 12, 2010 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 126 Motion to Expand the Record ; denying 134 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying without prejudice 143 Second Motion to Expand the Record. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. The Clerk of Court shall substitute Randy Blades, Warden, as the proper Respondent in this matter. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
November 10, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, taken under advisement 154 MOTION in Limine re correspondence filed by Gerald Ross Pizzuto, Jr. Respondent may file a supplement brief, no longer than 5 pages, on or before 11/15/2010. Petitioner may file any additional relevant authority on or before 11/15/2010. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
January 3, 2011 188 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 154 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
July 9, 2011 221 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 184 Motion for Payment of Expert Fees. Petitioner is responsible for paying $4,916.84 either directly to Dr. Roger Moore, Ph.D., or to reimburse Respondent, whichever is applicable. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
January 10, 2012 228 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 1 Petitioner's Successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Seeking Relief Under Atkins v. Virginia. The Court issues a certificate of appealability over its decision to deny reliefon the merits on Petiti oners Atkins claim and over its 103 Memorandum Decision and Order granting Respondents Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 4, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER. 21 Motion for Summary Judgment - DENIED; 43 Motion to Strike -DENIED; 28 Motion for Discovery - GRANTED; 29 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing - DENIED without prejudice; 31 Motion to Remand -DENIED; 27 MOTION Additio nal Testing to Complete Neuropsychiatric Evaluation pending further information from petitioner; No Later than 90 days from the date of this order the petitioner shall submit proof in supprot of Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by sb)
September 4, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/15/2010 01:30 PM in Boise, ID before Judge B. Lynn Winmill.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
February 20, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion for access to pet by res's expert. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pizzuto v. Blades
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]