Scentsy, Inc. v. Performance Manufacturing, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Scentsy, Inc.
Defendant: Performance Manufacturing, Inc, Rimports(USA), LLC, Jeffery W. Palmer and Mike Duff
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00553
Filed: December 22, 2008
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 101 Motion to Expedite Rule 34 Inspection; denying 101 Motion to Stay; denying 123 Motion to Enforce Agreement for Rule 34 Inspection; denying 124 Motion to Shorten Time for Response. Parties are to confer to schedul e the inspection to occur by 5/8/2009. If no agreement is reached, the inspection shall occur at 3:00 PM on 5/6/2009. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jlg)
January 8, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER This TRO will expire by the terms of Rule 65(b) within 10 days from the date of this Order. A hearing on preliminary injunction is set for 1/15/2009 at 10:30 am in Boise, ID before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Each party shall file a brief not to exceed 15 pages on the preliminary injunction matter by 1/12/2009. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jlg)
February 9, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 32 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot 51 Motion to Amend; finding as moot 55 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Plaintif f shall immediately file with the Clerk of the Court a security in the sum of $40,000. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jlg)
March 18, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER denying 85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Litigation Plan; vacating the telephonic scheduling conference set for 3/24/2009. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2009. Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2009. Discovery due by 7/31/200 9. Pre-Trial Motions due by 6/30/2009. Jury Trial set for 12/1/2009 09:30 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Edward J. Lodge. All non-dispositive pretrial matters are referred to Judge Ronald E. Bush. Parties to participate in a Settlement Conference before Judge Mikel H. Williams by 6/30/2009. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jlg)
April 16, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 65 Motion for Reconsideration. The 56 Preliminary Injunction Order is Vacated as to Defendant Performance Manufacturing Inc. and Mike Duff. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Scentsy, Inc. v. Performance Manufacturing, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scentsy, Inc.
Represented By: Shelly H Cozakos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Manufacturing, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rimports(USA), LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery W. Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Duff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]