Alamar Ranch, LLC v. County of Boise

Plaintiff: Alamar Ranch, LLC
Defendant: County of Boise
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00004
Filed: January 8, 2009
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Accommodations Office
County: Boise - Southern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2010 169 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER on Motions in Limine Re: Defendant's Experts Peter Butler and Michael Jones, and Plaintiffs' Expert Charles Wilhoite, granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 3, 2010 174 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification granting 102 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 4, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Evidence Defendant Claimed as Privileged in McNeese and Burke Depositions, granting and deferring 100 Motion in Limine; granting 105 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 5, 2010 176 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER on Defendant's Motions in Limine, granting in part and denying in part and reserving in part 113 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 5, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER on Plaintiff's Motions to Exclude, reserving 90 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 5, 2010 178 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER on Plaintiff's Motions in Limine, denying 95 Motion in Limine; granting 96 Motion in Limine; denying 97 Motion in Limine; denying 98 Motion in Limine; denying 99 Motion in Limine; granting in part and reserving in part 101 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 12, 2010 186 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER on Plaintiff's Motions to Exclude Argument and Evidence denying 89 Motion in Limine; denying 90 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
December 12, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER on Plaintiff's Motions to Exclude Evidence granting 91 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
November 2, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 15 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 18 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
November 2, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 32 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to return privileged documents. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
January 5, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 23 Motion to Clarify the applicability of Idaho Law; it is further order that I.C. 6-1604 would not apply to a claim of punitive damages in this case. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
April 27, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 72 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alamar Ranch, LLC v. County of Boise
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alamar Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Thomas A. Banducci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Boise
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]