Cornelius et al v. Deluca et al

Defendant: Nimbus Nutrition, LLC, Bryna Matthews Deluca, Unique Nutrition, Inc., Engineered Sports Technology, LLC, Palo Alto Laboratories, Inc., SNS Nutrition, Ergopharm, Inc., Betancourt Nutrition, Inc., ISS Research, LLC, Scientifically Advanced Nutrition, Ryan Deluca, Molecular Nutrition, LLC, M.A.N. Sports, Inc., Designer Supplements, Inc., Gaspari Nutrition, Inc. and Thermolife International, LLC
Plaintiff: SI03, Inc. and Derek W. Cornelius
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00027
Filed: January 22, 2010
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2010 192 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion to Dismiss; granting with prejudice 165 Motion to Dismiss; granting with prejudice 168 Motion to Dismiss; granting with prejudice 169 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
June 23, 2010 200 Featured Case ORDER granting 199 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debora K Kristensen terminated for dft Gaspari and Palo Alto. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
September 9, 2010 211 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 203 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 205 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
November 29, 2010 225 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Dkt. 210 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Bodybuilding.com's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 218 ) is DENIED. Defendant Bodybuilding.com's Alternative Motio n for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 218 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' request to discover the identity of forum posters (Dkt. 217 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs may discover the identity of INGENIUM but no other forum posters. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
June 2, 2009 24 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Court, sua sponte, transfers this case to the Southeastern Division of the Eastern District of Missouri. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer this cause of action, in its entirety, to the United States District Court, Eastern District of Missouri, Southeastern Division. Signed by Honorable Stephen N Limbaugh, Jr on 6/2/09. (LAH, )
March 15, 2011 250 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 231 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
March 25, 2011 253 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 248 Motion for Discovery. Completion of discovery with respect to the claims against Bodybuilding.com will be completed by 4/15/2011. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
June 1, 2011 264 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 242 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 243 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 258 Motion to Strike; finding as moot 260 Motion to Take Deposition. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
August 18, 2009 40 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 5 MOTION to Dismiss Party Ryan DeLuca d/b/a Bodybuilding.com, Bryna Matthews DeLuca d/b/a Bodybuilding.com and Bodybuilding.com, LLC without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen N Limbaugh, Jr on 8/18/09. (MRS)
August 19, 2009 43 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss (#11) is GRANTED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their complaint against defendant Molecular only to further address the issue of personal jurisdiction, and thefailure to so amend this complaint shall result in a dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen N Limbaugh, Jr on 08/19/2009. (JMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cornelius et al v. Deluca et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nimbus Nutrition, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryna Matthews Deluca
Represented By: Christopher D Olszyk, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unique Nutrition, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engineered Sports Technology, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Alto Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: William C Cole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNS Nutrition
Represented By: Aubrey D Lyon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergopharm, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betancourt Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R. Swift
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISS Research, LLC
Represented By: Jason Emerson Prince
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scientifically Advanced Nutrition
Represented By: Robert A Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Deluca
Represented By: Christopher D Olszyk, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molecular Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: Leslie Miller Greenspan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A.N. Sports, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Designer Supplements, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaspari Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: William C Cole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermolife International, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SI03, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek W. Cornelius
Represented By: Jonathan E. Fortman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]