United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. PCS Edventures!.com, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: PCS Edventures!.com, Inc., Anthony A Maher and Shannon M Stith
Case Number: 1:2010cv00433
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 19 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Strike, 15 MOTION to Strike 4 Amended Complaint, 16 MOTION to Dismiss, 20 MOTION to Dismiss ( Responses due by 12/30/2010). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
January 27, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER finding as moot 42 Motion to Supplement; denying 15 Motion to Strike; denying 16 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
January 3, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 66 Consent MOTION for Entry of Judgment as to Defendants Anthony A. Maher and PCS Edventures!.com, Inc. Defendant Maher shall pay a civil penalty in the amount of $100,000 pursuant to Section 21(d)(3) of the ExchangeAct. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. PCS Edventures!.com, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Thomas M Melton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCS Edventures!.com, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony A Maher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon M Stith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]