Melaleuca, Inc. v. Hansen Featured Case

Plaintiff: Melaleuca, Inc.
Defendant: Daryl Hansen
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00553
Filed: November 10, 2010
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15:7706 Enforcement generally
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference reset for 3/30/2011 09:30 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. (dks)
January 27, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion to postpone litigation order deadlines; Telephonic staus conference reset for 3/30/11 9:30 AM and the Litigation Plan Form due 3/14/11. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
January 27, 2011 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File certain Litigation Order Deadlines D. John Ashby appearing for Plaintiff Melaleuca, Inc.. Responses due by 2/22/2011
November 24, 2010 5 SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED as to Ariana Reed served on 11/15/2010.
November 16, 2010 4 Featured Case LITIGATION ORDER- Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2011 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing
November 14, 2010 3 Summons Issued as to Daryl Hansen. (Print attached Summons for service.)
November 10, 2010 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Melaleuca, Inc..
November 10, 2010 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Daryl Hansen ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0976-675137.), filed by Melaleuca, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Cover Sheet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Melaleuca, Inc. v. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melaleuca, Inc.
Represented By: D. John Ashby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]