General Conference of the Evangelical Methodist Church v. New Heart Community Fellowship, Inc.

Defendant: New Heart Community Fellowship,Inc.
Plaintiff: General Conference of the Evangelical Methodist Church
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00643
Filed: December 19, 2011
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2012 20 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 4 Motion to Compel; denying 5 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
March 8, 2013 45 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order to Disallow Further Discovery granting 37 Motion for Protective Order to Disallow Further Discovery. Plaintiff is not required to respond to Defendants written discovery served 2/8/2013. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
June 3, 2013 49 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Both New Heartand Crossing sha ll participate in the alternative dispute resolution process(es) identified within section 701 of the Discipline. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: General Conference of the Evangelical Methodist Church v. New Heart Community Fellowship, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Heart Community Fellowship,Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Peters, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Conference of the Evangelical Methodist Church
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]