Smith Optics, Inc. v. Oakley, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Smith Optics, Inc.
Defendant: Oakley, Inc. and Eye Safety Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00120
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Now therefore it is hereby ordered, that unless all parties file awritten agreement on or before 7/31/2012, that the Court need not recuse itselfpursuant to Canons 3(C)(1) & (D), the Court will recuse itself and direct the Clerk to reassign this case to another Judge. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
August 9, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS granting 27 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
September 3, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 29 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
November 20, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Eye Safety Systems, Inc. Only With Prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ja)
June 13, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE ONLY CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS RELATED TO U.S. PATENT NO. D581,450 PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) re 36 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that all claims, counterclaims, and defens es currently pending in the above-captioned action involving Oakley's United States Design Patent No. D581,450 are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
June 17, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND FACTUAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE granting 40 Joint Motion to Extend Factual Discovery Deadline. The factual discovery deadline is extended to 10/11/13. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith Optics, Inc. v. Oakley, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Optics, Inc.
Represented By: Steven F Schossberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakley, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eye Safety Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]