Idaho Wool Growers Association et al v. Vilsack et al

Defendant: Tom Tidwell, Keith Lannom, United States Forest Service and Tom Vilsack
Plaintiff: Colorado Wool Growers Association, Idaho Wool Growers Association, American Sheep Industry Association, Public Lands Council, Wyoming Wool Growers Association, Carlson Company, Inc. and Shirts Brothers Sheep
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00469
Filed: September 13, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ( Motions due by 1/18/2013.) The Government shall file any response also -limited to 8 pages- on or before January 28, 2013; Plaintiffs shall file their reply brief - limited to 3 pages on or before February 4, 2013.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
February 21, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 9 MOTION to Intervene filed by Western Watersheds Project, Hells Canyon Preservation Council, The Wilderness Society. The Wilderness Society, Western Watersheds Project, and Hells Canyon Prese rvation Council are granted the right to intervene pursuant to Rule 24(a)(2). With regard to the pending motion to expand the administrative record (doc 26), the intervenors may file a response brief, limited to 3 pages, on or before 2/27/13. The pla intiffs may file a reply brief, limited to 2 pages, to the intervenors' brief on or before 3/6/13. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 25, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 26 Motion. The Court shall allow the plaintiffs to submit declarations from Drs. Donald P. Knowles, Margaret A. Highland, and Mark C. Thurmond. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 1, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A STAY OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN LIGHT OF LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Federal Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Stay of Briefing Schedule 41 is GRANTED, an d all time limits and deadlines in this case with the one exception listed below -- are extended for a period of time equal to the duration of the lapse in appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 29, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO AMEND LITIGATION PLAN SCHEDULE IN LIGHT OF LAPSE IN APPROPRIATIONS re {43] Stipulation. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Idaho Wool Growers Association et al v. Vilsack et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Tidwell
Represented By: David Bernard Glazer
Represented By: Syrena Case Hargrove
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Lannom
Represented By: David Bernard Glazer
Represented By: Syrena Case Hargrove
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: David Bernard Glazer
Represented By: Syrena Case Hargrove
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: David Bernard Glazer
Represented By: Syrena Case Hargrove
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Wool Growers Association
Represented By: Murray D Feldman
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Wool Growers Association
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Represented By: Murray D Feldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Sheep Industry Association
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Represented By: Murray D Feldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Lands Council
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Represented By: Murray D Feldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming Wool Growers Association
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Represented By: Murray D Feldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlson Company, Inc.
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Represented By: Murray D Feldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirts Brothers Sheep
Represented By: Murray D Feldman
Represented By: William Gerry Myers, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]