Saint Alphonsus Medical Center - Nampa et al v St Luke's Health System Ltd

Plaintiff: Saint Alphonsus Health System Inc, Treasure Valley Hospital Limited Partnership, Saint Alphonsus Medical Center - Nampa Inc and Saint Alphonsus Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Defendant: St. Luke's Health System, LTD and St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00560
Filed: November 12, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Referring Judge: Ronald E Bush
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 115 Featured Case ORDER (Bench Trial RESET for 9/23/2013 09:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 3 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill; Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/22/2013 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill; The parties shall attempt to reach agreeme nt on the issues concerning the number of potential witnesses and the deposition limits by 5/3/13. If counsel cannot reach agreement, they shall file simultaneous briefs (limited to 10 pages ) on or before 5/7/13: Case Management deadline set for 5/7/2013). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 17, 2013 209 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 18, 2013 217 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE ADDITIONAL AEO DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 24, 2013 230 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion for partial summary judgment 144 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is granted to the extent it seeks to dismiss the claim for damages by the private plaint iffs St. Al's Health System Inc., St. Al's Regional Medical Center Inc., St. Al's Medical Center Nampa, Inc., and Treasure Valley Hospital Limited Partnership contained in the Amended Complaint (docket no. 63) at 153(C). It is denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 25, 2013 231 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. In accordance with the Memorandum Decision set forth above, NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion to bar thetestimony of Directors Armstrong and Deal 157 is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 30, 2013 238 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 15, 2013 338 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. In accordance with the Memorandum Decision above, NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Enthoven 158 is DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 18, 2013 356 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 172 Motion in Limine To excludetestimony of Ahern. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
October 18, 2013 357 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 250 Motion to Intervene and Request for Expedited Hearing for Immediate Access to Remaining Trial Proceedings, Unredacted Access to Trial Transcripts and Unredacted Videotaped Depositions and Exhibits as Used at Trial. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
November 15, 2013 445 Featured Case ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the Clerk re-designate thetranscripts (docket nos. 416 , 417 , 418 , 419 , 420 , 424 & 442 ) to remove the 90-day public release provision. These transcripts shall remain sealed until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
January 24, 2014 463 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
January 28, 2014 468 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. In accord with the Memorandum Decision set forth above, NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the objections (docket nos. 465 & 466) are OVERRULED, and the Clerk is directed to unseal the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 464 . Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
December 20, 2012 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
January 10, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER resolving protective order issues. Plaintiffs' counsel shall revise the proposed protective order in accord with this decision and provide it to the Court for approval and filing. In the meantime, the terms agreed to and those set forth in this order shall govern the parties' conduct going forward in the discovery process. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. ((kb)
March 19, 2013 92 Featured Case ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION in case 1:12-cv-00560-BLW-REB; granting (2) Sealed Motion; granting (3) Motion to Expedite in case 1:13-cv-00116-BLW. The lead case shall be St. Als v. St. Lukes 1:12-cv-560-BLW, and that all pleadings and other document s shall be filed in that lead case. The trial presently set for 7/29/2013, is VACATED, and that trial shall be reset for 9/16/2013, at 9:00 a.m. The telephone status conference now set for 4/2/2013, is VACATED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00560-BLW-REB, 1:13-cv-00116-BLW(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Saint Alphonsus Medical Center - Nampa et al v St Luke's Health System Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Alphonsus Health System Inc
Represented By: Bryan A Nickels
Represented By: Kevin J Scanlan
Represented By: David A Ettinger
Represented By: Peter E Boivin
Represented By: Keely E. Duke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treasure Valley Hospital Limited Partnership
Represented By: Portia L Rauer
Represented By: Raymond D Powers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Alphonsus Medical Center - Nampa Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Scanlan
Represented By: David A Ettinger
Represented By: Bryan A Nickels
Represented By: Keely E. Duke
Represented By: Peter E Boivin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Alphonsus Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J Scanlan
Represented By: Bryan A Nickels
Represented By: Keely E. Duke
Represented By: David A Ettinger
Represented By: Peter E Boivin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Luke's Health System, LTD
Represented By: Scott D Stein
Represented By: Ben J Keith
Represented By: J Walter Sinclair
Represented By: Tacy F Flint
Represented By: Jack R Bierig
Represented By: Sara Marie Berry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd
Represented By: J Walter Sinclair
Represented By: Scott D Stein
Represented By: Ben J Keith
Represented By: Tacy F Flint
Represented By: Jack R Bierig
Represented By: Sara Marie Berry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]