Hoskins v. Board of Corrections et al

Defendant: Corizon Medical and Board of Corrections
Plaintiff: David Hoskins
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00264
Filed: June 17, 2013
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Boise - Southern Office
County: Ada - Southern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E. Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2014 61 Featured Case ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that unless all parties file a written agreement on or before 2/24/2014 that the Court need not recuse itself pursuant to Canons 3(C)(1) & (D), the Court will recuse itself and direct the Clerk to reassign this case to another Judge. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 5, 2014 65 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 31 Plaintiff's Single Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Inform This Court (construed as another motion for injunctive relief); striking 38 Plaintiff's Motion to request This Court as This D.O.R. Affidavit; striking 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave and Amend to Correct the Name on the Complaint; denying 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Request This Court to Reconsider That Pro Se Hoskins Be Able to H ave Counsel; striking 54 Case Action File Affidavit (construed as motion to depose); striking 55 Civil Action File Response (construed as motion to depose); granting 58 Plaintiff's Motion for This Court To Overrule Dismissing Defendant Req uest To Dismiss and to Allow Hoskins to Put These Documents of Facts and of Evidence to Hoskins Claims. Plaintiff is advised that if he continues to violate the Courts orders, including the three-motion limit, the Court may dismiss this case and ente r judgment against Plaintiff without further notice. The parties shall have a period of 60 days after entry of this Order to conduct limited discovery, as set forth above. All requests for discovery must be made within 30 days after entry of this Ord er. Discovery is exchanged between parties only and should not be filed with the Court. Defendants shall file a supplement to Docket No. 47 (which the Court will treat as a motion for summary judgment) or a new motion for summary judgment, < b>within 90 days after entry of this Order. Plaintiff shall file his response to the motions, including the supplement filed by the IDOC Defendants, within 30 days after service of the supplement or other motion for summary judgment. Defen dants optional reply shall be filed within 14 days after service of Plaintiffs response.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
August 15, 2014 95 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 47 IDOC Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); finding as moot 66 Plaintiffs Motion To Court Clerk To Serve John Burke with Subpoenas for Defendants; noting 68 Plaintiffs Motion To Inform Court That Previous Court Order Denied theDefendants Motion to Dismiss So the Motion for Summary JudgmentShould Be Denied as the Same and Motion for Courts Help; denying 70 Plaintiffs Motion To Request All Electronic Emails To and About Hoskinsfrom Shell Fisher; denying 72 Plaintiffs Request for Production of Documents; denying 74 Plaintiffs Motion to Request This Court To Provide a Pro Bono Attorney for Discovery; striking 76 Plaintiffs Motion to Have Courts Help in Discovery Process; finding as moot 77 Plaintiffs Second Motion To Court Clerk To Serve John Burke with Subpoenas for Defendants; granting 79 Defendants Fishers and Siegerts Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 83 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave of Court To Amend Com plaint and Dismiss Some Defendants and Add New Corizon Defendants; finding as moot 84 Plaintiffs Motion To Compel Corizon John Burke Elam to Provide Requested Addresses of Former Employees; noting 88 Plaintiffs Motion for Denying Defendants Summa ry Judgment; striking 89 Plaintiffs Motion for Court to Order Corizon or IDOC To Have Hoskins See a Specialist; finding as moot 93 Plaintiffs Motion to Reassign Judge B. Lynn Winmill from This Case; striking 94 Plaintiffs Pleading to Attorney G enerals Office to Get All Documents. This entire action is dismissed. All claims against Defendants Smith, Siegert, Fisher, and Whittington are DISMISSED with prejudice. All claims against the remaining Defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hoskins v. Board of Corrections et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hoskins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]