Blumhorst v. Pierce Manufacturing Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ervin E Blumhorst
Defendant: Pierce Manufacturing Inc. and Akron Brass Company
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv00573
Filed: November 18, 2010
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2012 116 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: Defendant Pierce Manufacturing, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
March 8, 2013 249 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Re: Defendant Pierce's Motion for Directed Verdict denying 234 First MOTION for Directed Verdict. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
March 8, 2013 250 Featured Case ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend to Add a Claim for Punitive Damages at the Close of Plaintiff's Case in Chief denying 223 MOTION to Amend/Correct to Add Claim for Punitive Damages. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
March 28, 2014 266 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Blumhorst's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial (Docket No. 255 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Blumhorst's request for judgment as a matter of law is denied while Blumhorst& #039;s request for a new trial is granted. Pierce's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Pierce Manufacturing Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial Filed on 3/27/13 (Docket No. 259 ) is DENIED as moot. A separate Notice/Order will be forthcoming, speaking to the procedural logistics of this action's progression forward. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
June 7, 2012 83 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT WATEROUS COMPANYS MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR SECOND DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, ERVIN E. BLUMHORST AND FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO DESIGNATE EXPERT WITNESSES granting 64 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Ronald E Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Blumhorst v. Pierce Manufacturing Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin E Blumhorst
Represented By: Richard A Hearn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce Manufacturing Inc.
Represented By: Gary Lee Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akron Brass Company
Represented By: Michael W Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]