RS-ANB Fund, LP v. KMS SPE LLC et al

Plaintiff: RS-ANB Fund, LP
Defendant: KMS SPE LLC, Liz Air 6, LLC, Jerald M Spilsbury, Kingston Properties, LP, Mike Kingston, Paul E Avery, Bert Boeckmann, Andary Investments 2 LLC, RGRCM LLC and Jane Boeckmann
Case Number: 4:2011cv00175
Filed: April 21, 2011
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 80 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
November 7, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss; granting 68 Joinder. RS will have until 11/21/2011 to file an amended complaint. Defendant David Kingstons Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Dkt. 11), filed in the related action, Adversary No. 11-08044-JDP, is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file this decision in this case and in Adversary No. 11-08044-JDP. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)(Emailed to JDP, dj, and dh at Bankruptcy Court by cjm.)
February 1, 2012 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 84 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 91 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 95 Motion for Discovery; granting 106 Motion for Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 111 Moti on for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment andTemporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)(Emailed this Order to bf and jd in Finance regarding Court's registry fund by cjm.)
April 16, 2012 165 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion to Dismiss; granting 142 Joinder and Memorandum in Support; granting 143 Motion to Dismiss. RS shall file a Second Amended Complaint asserting only claims not dismissed herein so that the complaint conforms to this decision by 5/1/2012. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
June 6, 2012 174 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 159 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
June 27, 2012 179 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 171 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
September 7, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting docket 10 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed in consolidated action 4:11-CV-179-BLW; finding as moot docket 4 Motion to Deposit Funds filed in consolidated action 4:11-CV-179-BLW. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RS-ANB Fund, LP v. KMS SPE LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RS-ANB Fund, LP
Represented By: Stacy J McNeill
Represented By: Mark A Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMS SPE LLC
Represented By: Frederick J Hahn, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Air 6, LLC
Represented By: Marvin Marion Smith
Represented By: Jeffery Wayne Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerald M Spilsbury
Represented By: Marvin Marion Smith
Represented By: Jeffery Wayne Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Properties, LP
Represented By: Amy J Kingston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kingston
Represented By: Marvin Marion Smith
Represented By: Jeffery Wayne Banks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E Avery
Represented By: Jeffery Wayne Banks
Represented By: Marvin Marion Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Boeckmann
Represented By: Jeffery Wayne Banks
Represented By: Marvin Marion Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andary Investments 2 LLC
Represented By: Jeffery Wayne Banks
Represented By: Marvin Marion Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGRCM LLC
Represented By: Jeffery Wayne Banks
Represented By: Marvin Marion Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Boeckmann
Represented By: Jeffery Wayne Banks
Represented By: Marvin Marion Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]