Anderson v. Thompson Creek Mining Co. et al

Plaintiff: Sherman Anderson
Defendant: Thompson Creek Mining Co. and Psychemedics Corporation
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00639
Filed: December 16, 2011
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Custer - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re 25 Stipulation. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
January 23, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Psychemedics Corporation re 33 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Psychemedics Corporation. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
May 2, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION re: 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thompson Creek Mining Co. The Court will grant the motion for summary judgment filed by Thompson Creek Mining, and deny the motion filed by Anderson. Thus, all claims have been resolved and the Court will enter a separate Judgment as required by Rule 58(a). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 12, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motion for attorney fees 57 is GRANTED, and that defendant Thompson Creek be awarded $41,324.76 in attorney fees from plaintiff Sherman Anderson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED , that the motion for reconsideration 59 and the motion to amend complaint 66 are DENIED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Anderson v. Thompson Creek Mining Co. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Anderson
Represented By: Bryan Nikkilas Henrie
Represented By: Bron M Rammell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Creek Mining Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Psychemedics Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]