Navistar, Inc. et al v. Pure Power, LLC

Plaintiff: Pure Power Technologies, LLC, International Engine Intellectual Property Company LLC and Navistar, Inc.
Defendant: Pure Power, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00013
Filed: January 12, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bingham - Eastern
Presiding Judge: B. Lynn Winmill
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
November 9, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ( Discovery due by 3/19/2013, Dispositive Motions due by 4/18/2013). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ja)
March 25, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting 30 MOTION for Attorney Fees <. Plaintiffs shall have from defendant the sum of $9,920 representing an award of attorney fees. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
June 13, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 7/18/2013 11:00 AM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Show Cause Response due by 6/28/2013. Any reply brief by plaintiffs due by 7/10/2013. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Navistar, Inc. et al v. Pure Power, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Power Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Howard D Burnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Engine Intellectual Property Company LLC
Represented By: Howard D Burnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Howard D Burnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pure Power, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]