Bauscher v. Brookstone Securities, Inc.

Defendant: Does 1-10, Brookstone Securities, Inc. and Jesse Krapf
Plaintiff: Randy A Bauscher
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00028
Filed: January 20, 2012
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Minidoka - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Mikel H. Williams
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 4 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
July 27, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME approving 27 Stipulation. Amended Complaint due by 10/1/2012. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
July 30, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 16 Motion to Compel; granting 16 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)(Case stayed)
January 10, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendants Brookstone Securities, Inc. and Jesse Krapf 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Theodore Clarke Peters terminated. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bauscher v. Brookstone Securities, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookstone Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Clarke Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Krapf
Represented By: Theodore Clarke Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy A Bauscher
Represented By: Briane Nelson Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]