Moore et al v. Deer Valley Trucking, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shawn A. Moore and DeDe Jardine
Defendant: Deer Valley Trucking, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00046
Filed: January 25, 2013
 
Court: Idaho District Court
Office: Pocatello - Eastern Office
County: Bonneville - Eastern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ( Discovery due by 1/24/2014.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
March 26, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Mediation Deadline, re 17 Stipulation filed by Deer Valley Trucking, Inc., ( Mediation shall take place by 5/28/2014.) Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
May 29, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL, ( Jury Trial set for 10/6/2014 01:30 PM in Pocatello - District Courtroom before Judge B. Lynn Winmill, Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2014 03:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 2, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (Dkt. 39 ) is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 2, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER : Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (Dkt. 32 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moore et al v. Deer Valley Trucking, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn A. Moore
Represented By: James D Holman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeDe Jardine
Represented By: James D Holman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deer Valley Trucking, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]