Clarke v. USA

Petitioner: David Clarke
Respondent: USA
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00342
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Clarke's 28 U.S.C. 2255 petition and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 10/30/13. (klh, )
October 30, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Approved by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 10/30/2013. (slj)
April 11, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the United States to respond to the petition. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 4/11/13. (klh, )
May 13, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying at this time 5 Motion to Copy. Signed by Chief Judge David R. Herndon on 5/13/13. (klh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Clarke v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Clarke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Daniel T. Kapsak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]