BEYERS et al v. PEPPERIDGE FARM, INC.

 
Case Number: 1:2006cv00954
Filed: June 16, 2006
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2008 244 Featured Case ORDER denying plaintiff Dennis McGuire's 222 Motion for TRO (S.E.) cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/15/08. (MAC)
October 24, 2008 248 Featured Case ORDER granting 172 Motion for Summary Judgment in favor of Pepperidge Farm on McMillen's deception claim. No partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claim resolved in this Entry (S.O.) cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/24/08. (MAC)
March 3, 2009 264 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 169 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 170 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 172 Motion for Summary Judgment. No partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claims resolved in this Entry. The plaintiffs shall have through March 26, 2009, in which to notify the court in writing whether they seek the courts assistance in recruiting counsel to represent them in this matter (S.E.) cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/3/2009. (MAC)
August 10, 2010 313 Featured Case ORDER denying 295 Motion for Relief from Judgment; denying 298 Motion to Vacate and set aside stipulation to dismiss with prejudice ; denying 300 Motion for Leave to File Response to defendant's renewed and revised Motion for Summary Judgment (S.O.) cm. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/10/2010. (MAC)
June 10, 2011 392 Featured Case ORDER granting 379 Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an Affidavit of William Holden (Dkt. 379-1) as evidence to support the plaintiffs' separate motion for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/10/2011. (TMA)
June 20, 2011 403 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 387 Defendant Pepperidge Farm's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/20/2011. (PGS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: BEYERS et al v. PEPPERIDGE FARM, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]