LAWSON v. SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.

Defendant: SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff: DAVID R. LAWSON
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00196
Filed: February 15, 2007
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
County: Hamilton
Referring Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2009 101 Featured Case ORDER Following In Camera Review (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 2/26/2009.*** PLEASE DISREGARD - CORRECT EXHIBIT ATTACHED *** (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit C (Redacted))(SWM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2009: # 4 Exhibit A (Redacted A)) (SWM). Modified on 2/26/2009 (SWM).
February 8, 2010 161 Featured Case ENTRY. For the reasons set forth within (see Entry), the court SUSTAINS Hoover Hull LLPs Objection to the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation on Defendants Motion for Sanctions 150 . The Report and Recommendation is hereby MODIFIED to reflect that Mr. Burke and Mr. Hull should not be sanctioned pursuant to the courts inherent power. In addition, the court DENIES as MOOT Hoover Hull LLPs Request for Oral Argumentt 151 . Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/8/2010.(PG)
February 8, 2010 162 Featured Case ORDER on Defendant's re 152 Objection to the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/8/2010.(PG)
February 8, 2010 163 Featured Case ORDER on Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/8/2010.(PG)
December 14, 2012 311 Featured Case ENTRY granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Renewed 307 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Specifically, the court GRANTS Defendant's Motion with respect to Plaintiff's claim for unpaid wages under Indiana's Wage Claim Statute, and DENIES Defendants' Motion with respect to Plaintiff's claim for breach of contract. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/14/2012. (PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: LAWSON v. SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Kim F. Ebert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID R. LAWSON
Represented By: Daniel K. Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]