KING-INDIANA FORGE, INC. v. MILLENNIUM FORGE, INC.

Plaintiff: KING-INDIANA FORGE, INC.
Defendant: MILLENNIUM FORGE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2007cv00341
Filed: March 14, 2007
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
County: Delaware
Referring Judge: William T. Lawrence
Presiding Judge: John Daniel Tinder
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Summary Judgment-Granting in part as to Count III but denied in all other respects Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/18/2009. (CBU)
September 29, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's 106 Motion in Limine Regarding Portions of the Expert Testimony of Thomas J. Sponsel (S.O.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/29/2009. (MAC)
September 30, 2009 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant's 110 Motion in Limine Regarding the Expert Testimony of Harold James Henning (S.O.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/30/2009. (MAC)
October 9, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court Entry Correcting previous Order and ORDER denying plaintiff's 141 Motion for Order under Rule 56(d)(1)(S.O.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/9/2009. (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KING-INDIANA FORGE, INC. v. MILLENNIUM FORGE, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KING-INDIANA FORGE, INC.
Represented By: Thomas J. Collin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLENNIUM FORGE, INC.
Represented By: James L. Petersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]