MIDWEST TITLE LOANS, INC. v. RIPLEY

Plaintiff: MIDWEST TITLE LOANS, INC.
Defendant: JUDITH J. RIPLEY
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv01479
Filed: November 16, 2007
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: William T. Lawrence
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction ; denying Defendant's 38 Motion for Summary Judgment (S.O.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/24/2009. (MAC)
April 3, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (CORRECTED) re 56 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction (S.O.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/3/2009.(MAC)
March 30, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 71 Motion for Attorney Fees; withdrawing 71 Motion for Bill of Costs, without prejudice to the right of Plaintiff to refile a new motion seeking costs and attorneys fees in accordance with the time frame established in Magistrate Judge Lynchs February 8, 2010, ruling at Docket No. 76. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/30/2010. (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MIDWEST TITLE LOANS, INC. v. RIPLEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIDWEST TITLE LOANS, INC.
Represented By: John R. Maley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDITH J. RIPLEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]