ROCKIES EXPRESS PIPELINE LLC v. INDIANA STATE NATURAL RESOURCES COMMISSION

Plaintiff: ROCKIES EXPRESS PIPELINE LLC
Defendant: INDIANA STATE NATURAL RESOURCES COMMISSION
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv01651
Filed: December 10, 2008
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Condemnation Office
County: Delaware
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:717 Natural Gas Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2009 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion to Intervene (see Order). Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/17/2009. (PG)
September 23, 2009 53 Featured Case ENTRY denying Hoosier Hills' 40 Motion to Dismiss; denying 24 NRC's Motion to Dismiss (see Entry). Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/23/2009. (PG)
May 7, 2010 88 Featured Case ORDER denying Intervenor-Defendant Elrod Water Company d/b/a Hoosier Hills Regional Water District's 72 Motion to Compel (see Order for details). Consistent with the Court's previous scheduling order, [dkt. 82], Defendants shall file their response to REX's pending summary judgment motion within thirty days. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/7/2010. (SWM)
September 28, 2010 99 Featured Case ENTRY granting Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Summary Judgment (see Entry). Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/28/2010. (PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ROCKIES EXPRESS PIPELINE LLC v. INDIANA STATE NATURAL RESOURCES COMMISSION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCKIES EXPRESS PIPELINE LLC
Represented By: Anthony Seaton Ridolfo, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA STATE NATURAL RESOURCES COMMISSION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]