FIRST FINANCIAL BANK, N.A. v. CITIBANK, N.A. et al

Counter Claimant: MISTY Y. McDONALD
Defendant: MISTY Y. McDONALD and CITIBANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: FIRST FINANCIAL BANK, N.A.
Counter Defendant: FIRST FINANCIAL BANK, N.A.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00226
Filed: February 14, 2011
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
 
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2012 130 Featured Case ENTRY ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: For the reasons set forth above, McDonald's motion for partial summary judgment (79) is GRANTED and summary judgment is entered in favor of McDonald and against First Financial on Count Four of First Financial's Complaint ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/17/2012. (DW)
July 27, 2012 131 Featured Case ENTRY granting in part and denying in part Pltf's 82 Motion for Summary Judgment (see Entry for details). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/27/2012. (SWM)
July 27, 2012 132 Featured Case ENTRY granting in part and denying in part Pltf's 86 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (see Entry for details). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/27/2012. (SWM)
January 17, 2012 68 Featured Case ORDER - FFB's 65 motion to compel Misty McDonald to produce the documents she withheld as attorney-client communications between her and Mr. Burger or Alliance Machining Technologies is GRANTED. She must produce these documents no later than January 23, 2012. (See Order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/17/2012. (TMA)
February 24, 2012 72 Featured Case ENTRY ON DEFENDANT MCDONALD'S MOTION TO COMPEL - Ms. McDonald's motion to compel 54 is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. FFB must produce within 10 days of this entry all of the emails except FFB-000149 and those portions of FFB-000144 and FFB-000148 described in this entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/24/2012. (JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: FIRST FINANCIAL BANK, N.A. v. CITIBANK, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MISTY Y. McDONALD
Represented By: Michael E. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISTY Y. McDONALD
Represented By: Michael E. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIBANK, N.A.
Represented By: William J. Beggs
Represented By: Samuel R. Ardery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST FINANCIAL BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. Weddle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: FIRST FINANCIAL BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Quinn
Represented By: Robert G. Weddle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]